Brazas v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Minnesota District Court | |
Judge: | Joan N Ericksen |
Referred: | Steven E Rau |
Case #: | 0:17-cv-03604 |
Nature of Suit | 791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act |
Cause | 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits |
Case Filed: | Aug 07, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jan 11, 2018 |
Last checked: Saturday Feb 03, 2018 4:08 AM CST |
Defendant
Life Insurance Company of North America
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Nancy Brazas
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Thursday, January 11, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Thu 01/11 9:26 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Joan N. Ericksen on January 11, 2018. (CBC) |
|
Tuesday, January 09, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Proposed Order to Judge re Stipulation
Tue 01/09 9:24 AM
PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re16 Stipulation of Dismissal. (Santos, Margaret) |
|
16 | 16
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Tue 01/09 9:23 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Life Insurance Company of North America. Jointly Signed by Nancy Brazas. (Santos, Margaret) |
|
Friday, December 01, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
order
Scheduling Order
Mon 12/04 1:58 PM
PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 12/15/2017. Motions (non-disp) due 2/15/2018. Motions (disp) due by 8/1/2018. Ready for trial due by 12/1/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 12/1/17. (kt) |
|
Tuesday, November 28, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice to Attorney
Tue 11/28 3:43 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY: NOTICE to Attorneys: By agreement of the parties and the Court, the November 29, 2017 pretrial conference is CANCELED. The Pretrial Scheduling Order will be issued upon the parties' written submissions. (KMH) |
|
Wednesday, November 15, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Rule 26(f) Report
Wed 11/15 12:13 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by Life Insurance Company of North America. Jointly Signed by Nancy Brazas.(Santos, Margaret) |
|
Monday, November 13, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Cancelation/Rescheduling of Hearing/Deadline
Mon 11/13 11:18 AM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY: NOTICE REGARDING Hearing:10 ORDER/NOTICE OF PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Pretrial Conference set for 11/29/2017 02:00 PM in Judge's Chambers, Suite 348 (STP) before Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau. HAS MOVED TO in Judge's Chambers 9E (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. THIS IS A LOCATION AND JUDGE CHANGE ONLY.(MME) |
|
Wednesday, October 18, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 10/18 9:34 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kyle Alan Eidsness on behalf of Life Insurance Company of North America. (Eidsness, Kyle) |
|
Tuesday, October 17, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
9
pgs
order
Order
Tue 10/17 1:27 PM
ORDER/NOTICE OF PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Pretrial Conference set for 11/29/2017 02:00 PM in Judge's Chambers, Suite 348 (STP) before Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau on 10/17/17.(LPH) |
|
Att: 1 Consent Form | ||
Tuesday, October 10, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
discov
Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement
Tue 10/10 11:45 AM
RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Life Insurance Company of North America is a wholly-owned subsidiary of Connecticut General Corporation. (Santos, Margaret) Modified on 10/10/2017 (lmb) |
|
8 | 8
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 10/10 11:44 AM
ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses filed by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Santos, Margaret) |
|
Monday, August 21, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice
Mon 08/21 9:30 AM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting5 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Daniel Keenan Ryan for Life Insurance Company of North America. Approved by Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau on 8/21/17. (MAM) |
|
Friday, August 18, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Fri 08/18 8:53 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Life Insurance Company of North America. Life Insurance Company of North America waiver sent on 8/8/2017, answer due 10/10/2017. (Santos, Margaret) |
|
5 | 5
motion
Pro Hac Vice (Filing Attorney is a Minnesota Resident)
Fri 08/18 8:51 AM
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Daniel K. Ryan. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-5674580 filed by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Santos, Margaret) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 08/18 8:48 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Margaret Ann Santos on behalf of Life Insurance Company of North America. (Santos, Margaret) |
|
Monday, August 07, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Mon 08/07 3:16 PM
Summons Issued as to Life Insurance Company of North America. (LPH) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Initial Case Assignment
Mon 08/07 3:15 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Joan N. Ericksen per 3rd, 4th Master List and referred to Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau. Please use case number 17-cv-3604 JNE/SER. (LPH) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 08/07 3:02 PM
COMPLAINT against Life Insurance Company of North America ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AMNDC-5654710.) filed by Nancy Brazas. Filer requests summons issued. (Operana, Brandon) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s), | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |