Minnesota District Court
Judge:Joan N Ericksen
Referred: Franklin L Noel
Case #: 0:17-cv-03618
Nature of Suit791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act
Cause28:1132 E.R.I.S.A.
Case Filed:Aug 08, 2017
Terminated:Oct 20, 2017
Last checked: Sunday Feb 04, 2018 3:27 AM CST
Defendant
Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Represented By
Cristin Jeanette Mack
Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart, P.C.
contact info
David Paul McKinney
Ogletree Deakins
contact info
Plaintiff
Arianna Ismerio
Represented By
Brandon Operana
Operana Law Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Friday, October 20, 2017
10 10 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Fri 2:44 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Joan N. Ericksen on October 20, 2017. (CBC)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 19, 2017
9 9 misc Proposed Order to Judge re Stipluation Thu 12:08 PM
PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re8 Stipulation of Dismissal. (Mack, Cristin)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Thu 12:06 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. Jointly Signed by Arianna Ismerio and Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. (Mack, Cristin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 23, 2017
7 7 order Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice Wed 2:18 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Cristin Jeanette Mack for Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. Approved by Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel on 08/23/2017. (MMG)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 22, 2017
6 6 motion Pro Hac Vice (Filing Attorney is a Minnesota Resident) Tue 4:08 PM
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Cristin J. Mack. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-5680935 filed by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. (McKinney, David)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 4:00 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by David Paul McKinney on behalf of Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. (McKinney, David)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 11:11 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Arianna Ismerio. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company waiver sent on 8/8/2017, answer due 10/10/2017. (Operana, Brandon)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 08, 2017
3 3 service Summons Issued Tue 1:39 PM
Summons Issued as to Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. (ACH)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Initial Case Assignment Tue 1:38 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Joan N. Ericksen per 3rd, 4th Master List and referred to Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel. Please use case number 17-cv-3618 JNE/FLN. (ACH)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 12:34 PM
COMPLAINT against Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AMNDC-5656413.) filed by Arianna Ismerio. Filer requests summons issued. (Operana, Brandon)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s),
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet