Formosa Plantation, LLC
Louisiana Western Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Jeffrey P Norman |
Case #: | 3:17-bk-31294 |
Case Filed: | Aug 09, 2017 |
Dismissed: | Aug 25, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 29, 2017 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Formosa Plantation, LLC
PO Box 747
Golden Meadow, LA 70357-0747 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
DIP
|
|
U.S. Trustee
Office of U. S. Trustee
300 Fannin St., Suite 3196
Shreveport, LA 71101 |
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Friday, September 29, 2017 | ||
33 | 33
court
Final Decree
Fri 09/29 8:19 AM
Final Decree (pame) |
|
court
Close Bankruptcy Case
Fri 09/29 8:20 AM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (pame) |
||
Sunday, August 27, 2017 | ||
32 | 32
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Mon 08/28 12:08 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. . Notice Date 08/27/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, August 25, 2017 | ||
31 | 31
order
Dismissing Case
Fri 08/25 3:27 PM
Order Striking Petition and Dismissing Case in regard to Debtor. Filed on 8/25/2017 (lada) |
|
Thursday, August 24, 2017 | ||
30 | 30
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Fri 08/25 12:08 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. . Notice Date 08/24/2017. (Admin.) |
|
court
Hearing Held - Other
Thu 08/24 3:36 PM
Hearing Held on . Present: Gillmore. O-Court. (lada) |
||
Wednesday, August 23, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
misc
Exhibit
Wed 08/23 12:01 PM
Exhibit(s) , Email from counsel dated August 22, 2017 and attachment, Joint Stipulation Filed by Leo D. Congeni on behalf of South Lafourche Bank & Trust Company (Congeni, Leo) |
|
Tuesday, August 22, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
order
Reconsider
Tue 08/22 3:27 PM
Order Denying (pame) |
|
27 | 27
motion
Expedite Hearing
Tue 08/22 3:14 PM
Ex Parte Motion to Expedite Hearing Exparte Motion to Set Emergency Motion on Expedited Basis with Certificate of Service Filed by Leo D. Congeni on behalf of South Lafourche Bank & Trust Company (Congeni, Leo) |
|
26 | 26
misc
Certificate of Service
Tue 08/22 12:55 PM
Certificate of Service (Emergency) Order on Motion for Entry of Order Annulling Authomatic Stay, Nunc Pro Tunc, Declaring Bankruptcy Filing Null and Void, Validating Foreclosure Sale and Dismissing Bankruptcy Case with Prejudice Filed by Leo D. Congeni on behalf of South Lafourche Bank & Trust Company (Congeni, Leo) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A-Mail Matrix | ||
25 | 25
motion
Reconsider
Tue 08/22 12:45 PM
Emergency Motion to Reconsider Filed by Leo D. Congeni on behalf of South Lafourche Bank & Trust Company (Congeni, Leo) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A-Joint Stipulation | ||
24 | 24
order
Dismiss Case
Tue 08/22 11:27 AM
Order Denying (lada) |
|
Wednesday, August 16, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Thu 08/17 12:08 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. . Notice Date 08/16/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, August 15, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
misc
Certificate of Service
Tue 08/15 11:10 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Leo D. Congeni on behalf of South Lafourche Bank & Trust Company (Congeni, Leo) |
|
Sunday, August 13, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Mon 08/14 12:00 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. . Notice Date 08/13/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Saturday, August 12, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
order
Show Cause
Mon 08/14 7:25 AM
Order to Appear and Show Cause why case should not be dismissed due to the corporate debtor not being represented by legal counsel Filed on 8/12/2017 Show Cause hearing to be held on 8/24/2017 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom, Monroe. (pame) |
|
Friday, August 11, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to DIP
Sat 08/12 12:05 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to DIP. . Notice Date 08/11/2017. (Admin.) |
|
18 | 18
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Deficient Filing(s)
Sat 08/12 12:05 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Deficient Filing(s). . Notice Date 08/11/2017. (Admin.) |
|
17 | 17
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Deficient Filing(s)
Sat 08/12 12:05 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Deficient Filing(s). . Notice Date 08/11/2017. (Admin.) |
|
16 | 16
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - First Meeting of Creditors
Sat 08/12 12:05 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors. . Notice Date 08/11/2017. (Admin.) |
|
15 | 15
order
Expedite Hearing
Fri 08/11 12:06 PM
Order Granting . Hearing scheduled for 8/24/2017 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom, Monroe. Response deadline is August 21, 2017. (lada) |
|
Thursday, August 10, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Certificate of Service
Thu 08/10 4:21 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Leo D. Congeni on behalf of South Lafourche Bank & Trust Company (Congeni, Leo) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A-Service List | ||
13 | 13
notice
Appearance and Request Notice
Thu 08/10 4:03 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice United States Trustee's Notice of Appearance And Request For Notices, with Certificate of Service . Filed by Frances Ellen Hewitt on behalf of Office of U. S. Trustee (Hewitt, Frances) |
|
Att: 1 Matrix | ||
12 | 12
motion
Expedite Hearing
Thu 08/10 3:56 PM
Ex Parte Motion to Expedite Hearing Ex Parte Motion to Expedite Hearing on Emergency Motion for Entry of Order Annulling Automatic Stay, Nunc Pro Tunc, Declaring Bankruptcy Filing Null and Void, Validating Foreclosure Sale and Dismissing Bankruptcy Case with Prejudice Filed by Leo D. Congeni on behalf of South Lafourche Bank & Trust Company (Congeni, Leo) |
|
11 | 11
motion
Dismiss Case
Thu 08/10 3:47 PM
Emergency Motion for Relief from Stay (Motion for Entry of Order Annulling Automatic Stay . Fee Amount Due $181,, and Motion to Dismiss Case with Prejudice Filed by Leo D. Congeni on behalf of South Lafourche Bank & Trust Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Excerpt of the Transcript of the Court's Ruling #2 Exhibit 2-Order of Dismissal) (Congeni, Leo) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Appearance and Request Notice
Thu 08/10 10:16 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice with Certificate of Service . Filed by Mark A. Begnaud on behalf of Louisiana Federal Land Bank Association (Begnaud, Mark) |
|
crditcrd
Autodocket US Treasury Receipt
Thu 08/10 3:48 PM
Receipt of Filing Fee for Motion for Relief From Stay 17-31294 [motion,mrlfsty] ( 181.00) . Receipt Number 18054712, in the Amount of $ 181.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
Wednesday, August 09, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
court
First Meeting of Creditors Set - Chapter 11
Wed 08/09 3:27 PM
Meeting of Creditors. Meeting of Creditors to be held on 9/14/2017 at 12:00 PM at 341 Meeting Room, Monroe, Rm 116B, 201 Jackson. (jrro) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Appearance and Request Notice
Wed 08/09 1:06 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice . Filed by Leo D. Congeni on behalf of South Lafourche Bank & Trust Company (Congeni, Leo) |
|
7 | 7
order
Order to Debtor in Possession and Status Conference Option
Wed 08/09 12:43 PM
Order to Debtor in Possession and Setting Status Conference. Status Conference Hearing to be held on 12/21/2017 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom, Monroe. Filed on 8/9/2017 (jrro) |
|
6 | 6
court
Notice of Deficiency/Required Documents
Wed 08/09 12:37 PM
Notice of Required Documents . Schedules A-H, Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Indviduals, Statement of Financial Affairs, Picture ID, and an Amended Declaration of Electronic Filing to include Tax ID number. (jrro) |
|
5 | 5
court
Notice of Required Filings Chapter 11
Wed 08/09 12:25 PM
Notice of Required Filing(s) (jrro) |
|
4 | 4
court
Document
Wed 08/09 9:46 AM
Authorization and Consent of the Members filed by Formosa Plantation. LLC. (shar) |
|
3 | 3
2
pgs
petdoc
20 Largest Unsecured Creditors
Wed 08/09 9:43 AM
List of Creditors who have 20 Largest Unsecured Claims against you and are Not Insiders for Non-Individual Chapter 11 Cases Filed by Formosa Plantation, LLC. (shar) |
|
2 | 2
petdoc
Declaration Re Electronic Filing - Statement of SSN
Wed 08/09 9:39 AM
Declaration Re Electronic Filing and Statement of SSN Filed by Formosa Plantation, LLC. (shar) |
|
1 | 1
7
pgs
petdoc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) (Fee)
Wed 08/09 9:37 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Receipt Number 0, Fee Amount Due $1717 Filed by Formosa Plantation, LLC. List of Equity Security Holders due by 8/23/2017. Chapter 11 Statement of Your Current Monthly Income Form 122B due by 8/23/2017. Inventory of Property due by 8/23/2017. Schedule A/B due by 8/23/2017. Schedule D due by 8/23/2017. Schedule E/F due by 8/23/2017. Schedule G due by 8/23/2017. Schedule H due by 8/23/2017. Statement of Financial Affairs due by 8/23/2017. Summary of Assets and Liabilities due by 8/23/2017. Incomplete Filings due by 8/23/2017. Disclosure Statement Chapter 11 due by 12/7/2017. Chapter 11 Plan due by 12/7/2017. (shar) |
|
court
Receipt Number and Filing Fee Payment - Bankruptcy Case (New)
Wed 08/09 5:46 PM
Filing Fee Paid. Receipt Number 80074566, Amount Paid $1717.00. (adiuser) |