Aman Resorts Group Limited
Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | A Jay Cristol |
Case #: | 1:17-bk-20114 |
Case Filed: | Aug 09, 2017 |
Terminated: | Oct 16, 2017 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $0 to $50,000 |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Aman Resorts Group Limited
122 E 42nd St Rm 2100
New York, NY 10168-2199 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
Office of the US Trustee
51 S.W. 1st Ave. Suite 1204
Miami, FL 33130 |
Docket last updated: 12 minutes ago |
Monday, October 16, 2017 | ||
40 | 40
court
Close Bankruptcy Case
Mon 10/16 3:26 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed. (Cohen, Diana) |
|
39 | 39
court
Notice of Transfer of Case [with New Case Number]
Mon 10/16 3:25 PM
Acknowledgment of Receipt of Case Number: 17-12811 SCC to USBC Southern District of New York (Cohen, Diana) |
|
Wednesday, October 11, 2017 | ||
38 | 38
notice
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service
Wed 10/11 11:56 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service by Gregory S Grossman Esq Filed by Creditor Lightray Imaging Co.. (Grossman, Gregory) |
|
Wednesday, October 04, 2017 | ||
37 | 37
notice
Notice to Withdraw Document
Wed 10/04 9:51 AM
Notice to Withdraw Document Filed by Debtor Aman Resorts Group Limited . (Charbonneau, Robert) |
|
Wednesday, September 20, 2017 | ||
36 | 36
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Thu 09/21 12:21 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Notice Date 09/20/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, September 18, 2017 | ||
35 | 35
2
pgs
order
Order Transferring Case Out
Mon 09/18 12:30 PM
Order Signed by the Honorable Shelley C. Chapman Entered in Southern District of New York Case 16-10517 (SCC), Vacating Dismissal Order and Transferring Southern District of Florida Cases # 17-15041 AJC and 17-20114 AJC to the Southern District of New York . (Cohen, Diana) |
|
Wednesday, August 30, 2017 | ||
34 | 34
notice
Notice of Filing
Wed 08/30 4:32 PM
Notice of Filing Documents filed in the Southern District of New York Dismissed Case , Filed by Debtor Aman Resorts Group Limited. (Calderin, Jacqueline) |
|
Sunday, August 27, 2017 | ||
33 | 33
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Mon 08/28 12:17 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Notice Date 08/27/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, August 25, 2017 | ||
32 | 32
attydoc
Certificate of Service [Attorney]
Fri 08/25 3:28 PM
Certificate of Service by Attorney Robert P. Charbonneau Esq. . (Charbonneau, Robert) |
|
31 | 31
attydoc
Certificate of Service [Attorney]
Fri 08/25 3:27 PM
Certificate of Service by Attorney Robert P. Charbonneau Esq. . (Charbonneau, Robert) |
|
30 | 30
attydoc
Certificate of Service [Attorney]
Fri 08/25 3:25 PM
Certificate of Service by Attorney Robert P. Charbonneau Esq. . (Charbonneau, Robert) |
|
29 | 29
attydoc
Certificate of Service [Attorney]
Fri 08/25 3:23 PM
Certificate of Service by Attorney Robert P. Charbonneau Esq. . (Charbonneau, Robert) |
|
28 | 28
court
Notice of Cancellation of Hearing
Fri 08/25 3:08 PM
Clerk's Notice of Cancellation of Hearing (Gutierrez, Susan) |
|
27 | 27
2
pgs
order
Order (Generic)
Fri 08/25 3:04 PM
Interim Order from US Bankruptcy Court District of New York Case# 16-10517 (SCC) Directing All Parties in Later-filed Cases not to Proceed Further. (Gutierrez, Susan) |
|
26 | 26
court
Notice of Hearing (BK)
Fri 08/25 9:45 AM
Notice of Hearing Hearing scheduled for 09/06/2017 at 02:30 PM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 7 (AJC), Miami, FL 33128. (Gutierrez, Susan) |
|
Thursday, August 24, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
court
Notice of Hearing (BK)
Thu 08/24 12:31 PM
Notice of Hearing Hearing scheduled for 09/06/2017 at 02:30 PM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 7 (AJC), Miami, FL 33128. (Gutierrez, Susan) |
|
24 | 24
court
Notice of Hearing (BK)
Thu 08/24 12:28 PM
Notice of Hearing Hearing scheduled for 09/06/2017 at 02:30 PM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 7 (AJC), Miami, FL 33128. (Gutierrez, Susan) |
|
23 | 23
notice
Notice of Filing
Thu 08/24 11:32 AM
Notice of Filing Signature Page to the Funding Agreement , Filed by Debtor Aman Resorts Group Limited . (Charbonneau, Robert) |
|
22 | 22
order
Amend Order
Thu 08/24 7:42 AM
Order Granting Motion To Amend Petition. (Oriol-Bennett, Alexandra) |
|
Wednesday, August 23, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Schedules/Statements or Amended Schedules/Statements
Wed 08/23 7:11 PM
Initial Schedules Filed: [Summary of Your Assets/Liabilities,Schedule A/B,Schedule C,Schedule D,Schedule E/F,Schedule G,Schedule H,Statement of Financial Affairs,Declaration re Schedules,] List of 20 Largest Creditors Holding Unsecured Claims; List of Equity Security Holders and Verification of Creditor Matrix [Fee Amount $31] Filed by Debtor Aman Resorts Group Limited. (Charbonneau, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Local Form 4 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Payroll/Sales Tax Report
Wed 08/23 5:19 PM
Certified Payroll/Sales Tax Report and Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor Aman Resorts Group Limited. (Charbonneau, Robert) |
|
19 | 19
notice
Notice of Filing
Wed 08/23 3:54 PM
Notice of Filing /Notice of Telephonic Conference in Connection with the First-Filed Chapter 11 Case of Aman Resorts Group Limited Pending in the United States Bankruptcy Court for the Southern District of New York , Filed by Interested Party Tarek Investments Limited, Debtor Aman Resorts Group Limited. (Minsker, Jonathan) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A Transfer Motion | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B Declaration | ||
18 | 18
attydoc
Certificate of Service [Attorney]
Wed 08/23 3:47 PM
Certificate of Service by Attorney Robert P. Charbonneau Esq. . (Charbonneau, Robert) |
|
17 | 17
motion
Establish Procedures
Wed 08/23 12:00 PM
Motion to Establish Procedures for Interim Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses of Professionals Filed by Debtor Aman Resorts Group Limited. (Charbonneau, Robert) |
|
16 | 16
motion
Employ
Wed 08/23 9:37 AM
Application to Employ Gregory S. Grossman, Esq. and the Law Firm Sequor Law as as Special Litigation Counsel for the Debtor-In-Possession Nunc Pro Tunc to the Petition Date and Setting Final Hearing Date [Affidavit Attached] Filed by Debtor Aman Resorts Group Limited. (Charbonneau, Robert) |
|
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card
Wed 08/23 7:12 PM
Receipt of Schedules and Statements Filed 17-20114 AJC) [misc,schsia] ( 31.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 30490435. Fee amount 31.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
Monday, August 21, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
order
Order Setting Hearing
Mon 08/21 12:18 PM
Order Setting Hearing . Hearing scheduled for 09/06/2017 at 02:30 PM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 7 (AJC), Miami, FL 33128. (Oriol-Bennett, Alexandra) |
|
Sunday, August 20, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Mon 08/21 12:17 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 08/20/2017. (Admin.) |
|
13 | 13
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors
Mon 08/21 12:17 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 08/20/2017. (Admin.) |
|
12 | 12
motion
Approve
Sun 08/20 7:13 PM
Expedited Motion to Approve Initial Funding Agreement (Expedited Hearing Requested on or Before August 25, 2017) Filed by Debtor Aman Resorts Group Limited. (Charbonneau, Robert) |
|
Friday, August 18, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Amend
Fri 08/18 6:33 PM
Ex Parte Motion to Amend Re:1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) to Correct Debtor's Name Filed by Debtor Aman Resorts Group Limited. (Charbonneau, Robert) |
|
10 | 10
misc
Case Management Summary
Fri 08/18 6:31 PM
Ch 11 Case Management Summary Filed by Debtor Aman Resorts Group Limited. (Charbonneau, Robert) |
|
9 | 9
motion
Employ
Fri 08/18 6:31 PM
Application to Employ Robert P. Charbonneau, Esq. and the Law Firm of Ehrenstein Charbonneau Calderin as as General Bankruptcy Counsel for the Debtor in Possession Nunc Pro Tunc to the Petition Date [Affidavit Attached] Filed by Debtor Aman Resorts Group Limited. (Charbonneau, Robert) |
|
8 | 8
court
Meeting of Creditors 11
Fri 08/18 11:45 AM
Notice of Meeting of Creditors. Meeting of Creditors to be Held on 9/14/2017 at 02:00 PM at 51 SW First Ave Room 1021, Miami. Deadline to File a Complaint to Determine Dischargeability of Certain Debts is 11/13/2017. Proofs of Claim due by 12/13/2017. (Oriol-Bennett, Alexandra) |
|
7 | 7
court
Notice of Judge Reassignment (After Order) re: Recusal, Intra District Transfer
Fri 08/18 8:08 AM
Notice of Reassignment. Judge A Jay Cristol Assigned to Case. Judge Laurel M Isicoff Removed from Case. (Oriol-Bennett, Alexandra) |
|
6 | 6
order
Order of Reassignment/Recusal
Fri 08/18 8:07 AM
Order of Reassignment. Involvement of Laurel M Isicoff Terminated. Judge A. Jay Cristol Added to Case . (Oriol-Bennett, Alexandra) |
|
Wednesday, August 16, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Transfer Case (Intra-District)
Wed 08/16 4:47 PM
Ex Parte Motion to Transfer Case To Miami Division and Request for Intra-District Transfer and Judicial Reassignment of Bankruptcy Case to Judge Cristol Presiding Over First -Filed Case of Related Chapter 7 Case Filed by Debtor Aman Resorts Group Limited. (Petrie, Matthew) |
|
Saturday, August 12, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sun 08/13 12:15 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 08/12/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, August 10, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
court
Notice of Deficiency
Thu 08/10 4:03 PM
Notice of Incomplete Filings Due. List of Equity Security Holders due 8/23/2017. Summary of Your Assets and Liabilities and Certain Statistical Information due 8/23/2017. Schedule A/B due 8/23/2017. Schedule D due 8/23/2017. Schedule E/F due 8/23/2017. Schedule G due 8/23/2017. Schedule H due 8/23/2017.Statement of Financial Affairs Due 8/23/2017.Declaration Concerning Debtors Schedules Due: 8/23/2017. [Incomplete Filings due by 8/23/2017]. (Rodriguez, Olga) |
|
Wednesday, August 09, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
1
pgs
misc
Corporate Ownership Statement
Wed 08/09 2:29 PM
Corporate Ownership Statement Filed by Debtor Aman Resorts Group Limited. (Charbonneau, Robert) |
|
1 | 1
12
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition Ch 11 [ECF]
Wed 08/09 2:29 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . [Fee Amount $1717] (Charbonneau, Robert) |
|
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card
Wed 08/09 2:32 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 17-20114 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 30395239. Fee amount 1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) |