New Jersey District Court
Judge:Claire C Cecchi
Referred: Mark Falk
Case #: 2:17-cv-05932
Nature of Suit367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Aug 09, 2017
Last checked: Monday Feb 05, 2018 3:48 AM EST
Defendant
TAKEDA CALIFORNIA, INC.
Represented By
EBEN SCOTT FLASTER
Goodell Devries Leech & Dann LLP
contact info
Craig A Thompson
Venable LLP
contact info
Jason C Rose
Venable LLP
contact info
Defendant
TAKEDA DEVELOPMENT CENTER AMERICAS, INC.
Represented By
EBEN SCOTT FLASTER
Goodell Devries Leech & Dann LLP
contact info
Craig A Thompson
Venable LLP
contact info
Jason C Rose
Venable LLP
contact info
Defendant
TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED
Defendant
TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS AMERICA, INC
Represented By
EBEN SCOTT FLASTER
Goodell Devries Leech & Dann LLP
contact info
Craig A Thompson
Venable LLP
contact info
Jason C Rose
Venable LLP
contact info
Defendant
TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS LLC
Represented By
EBEN SCOTT FLASTER
Goodell Devries Leech & Dann LLP
contact info
Craig A Thompson
Venable LLP
contact info
Jason C Rose
Venable LLP
contact info
Defendant
TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS U.S.A., INC
Represented By
EBEN SCOTT FLASTER
Goodell Devries Leech & Dann LLP
contact info
Craig A Thompson
Venable LLP
contact info
Jason C Rose
Venable LLP
contact info
Defendant
TAKEDA RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT CENTER, INC.
Defendant
TAP PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS INC.
Represented By
EBEN SCOTT FLASTER
Goodell Devries Leech & Dann LLP
contact info
Craig A Thompson
Venable LLP
contact info
Jason C Rose
Venable LLP
contact info
Defendant
Takeda Pharmaceuticals International Inc
Represented By
EBEN SCOTT FLASTER
Goodell Devries Leech & Dann LLP
contact info
Craig A Thompson
Venable LLP
contact info
Jason C Rose
Venable LLP
contact info
In Re
PROTON-PUMP INHIBITOR PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION (No. II)
Interested Party
TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED
Notice Only
JUDICIAL PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION
CLERK OF THE PANEL ONE COLUMBUS CIRCLE, NE THURGOOD MARSHALL FEDERAL JUDICIARY BUIDLING ROOM G-255 - NORTH LOBBY
WASHINGTON, DC 20002
Plaintiff
KAREN VERTREES
Represented By
SOL H. WEISS
Anapol Weiss
contact info
TRACY A. FINKEN
Anapol, Weiss
contact info
Plaintiff
MARK VERTREES
Represented By
SOL H. WEISS
Anapol Weiss
contact info
TRACY A. FINKEN
Anapol, Weiss
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/12/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, January 26, 2023
26 26 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Thu 01/26 1:14 PM
Short Form ANSWER to Amended Complaint with Certificate of Service by TAKEDA DEVELOPMENT CENTER AMERICAS, INC., TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS AMERICA, INC, TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS U.S.A., INC.(ROSE, BETH)
Related: [-]
25 25 misc Substitution of Attorney Thu 01/26 1:07 PM
Substitution of Attorney - Attorney JEFFREY R. LILLY terminated. Attorney BETH S. ROSE for TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED added.. (ROSE, BETH)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 30, 2021
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 09/30 11:15 AM
Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. Magistrate Judge Mark Falk no longer assigned to the case. (jc, )
Related: [-]
Friday, October 12, 2018
24 24 order Stipulation and Order Fri 10/12 10:01 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF NAMED DEFENDANTS ONLY. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 10/11/18. (gh, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 18, 2018
23 23 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Wed 04/18 3:17 PM
ANSWER to Amended Complaint by TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED.(LILLY, JEFFREY)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 10, 2017
22 22 mdl MDL Notice to Counsel Thu 08/10 1:57 PM
Clerk's Notice to Counsel. (ek)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 09, 2017
21 21 transfer Case Transferred In - District Court Transfer Wed 08/09 11:56 AM
Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number 2:17-cv-00079. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Wed 08/09 12:12 PM
Judge Claire C. Cecchi and Magistrate Judge Mark Falk added. (ek)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 07, 2017
20 20 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER THAT THE ACTIONS LISTED ON SCHEDULE A AND PENDING OUTSIDE THE DISTRICT OF NEW JERSEY ARE TRANSFERRED TO THE DISTRICT OF NEW JERSEY, AND, WITH THE CONSENT OF THAT COURT, ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE CLAIRE C. CECCHI FOR COORDINATED OR CONSOLIDATED PRETRIAL PROCEEDINGS.(sg, )
Related: [-]
Friday, June 02, 2017
19 19 1 pgs ORDER THAT THE MOTIONS TO DISMISS FILED BY THE TAKEDA ENTITIES ARE DEEMED MOOT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 6/2/2017. 6/2/2017 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (SEE DOC. NO. 49 IN 17-CV-1817) (aeg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 30, 2017
18 18 AFFIDAVIT of Service by DEPUTY CLERK re: served SUMMONS upon TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED by INTERNATIONAL REGISTERED MAIL RETURN RECEIPT REQUESTED (sg, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 23, 2017
17 17 AMENDED COMPLAINT against TAKEDA CALIFORNIA, INC., TAKEDA DEVELOPMENT CENTER AMERICAS, INC., TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED, TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS AMERICA, INC., TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, INC., TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS U.S.A., INC., TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC, TAKEDA RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT CENTER, INC., TAP PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS, INC., filed by MARK VERTREES, KAREN VERTREES. CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE.(sg, )
Related: [-]
Friday, May 12, 2017
16 16 AMENDED AFFIDAVIT: On 5/12/2017, Kenneth Duvak, Deputy Clerk mailed a copy of the Complaint and Summons upon Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited by registered mail, return receipt requested. (jaa, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 11, 2017
15 15 AFFIDAVIT RE: On 5/11/2017, Kenneth Duvak, Deputy Clerk mailed a copy of the Complaint and Summons upon Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited by registered mail, return receipt requested. (jaa, )
Related: [-]
14 14 Letter dated 05/11/2017 from Tracy A. Finken requesting that the summons and complaint be served by registered mail upon Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited in accordance with F.R.C.P. 4(F)(C)(ii). (jaa, )
Related: [-]
13 13 PRAECIPE to Issue Alias Summons Filed by KAREN VERTREES, MARK VERTREES. (FINKEN, TRACY) Modified on 5/11/2017 (lisad, ).
Related: [-]
1 Summons Issued as to TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED. Forwarded To: COUNSEL on 5/11/17 (jaa, )
Related: [-]
Monday, May 01, 2017
12 12 1 pgs ORDER THAT THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO MARK THE ABOVE REFERENCED CASES FOR INCLUSION IN THE IN RE: PROTON PUMP INHIBITORS PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION, CIVIL ACTION NO. 17-1817 AND THE ABOVE REFERENCED CASES ARE REFERRED TO THE CALENDAR OF THE HONORABLE GENE E.K.PRATTER FOR ALL DISCOVERY AND PRETRIAL PURPOSES ONLY. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE PETRESE B. TUCKER ON 4/28/17. 5/2/17 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREP, EMAILED.(rf)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 11, 2017
11 11 1 pgs ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF CRAIG A. THOMPSON FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 4/11/2017.4/12/2017 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. MAILED TO UNREP. ECF APP MAILED.(sg, )
Related: [-]
10 10 1 pgs ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE OF JASON C. ROSE IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 4/11/2017. 4/12/2017 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREP AND E-MAILED.(sg, )
Related: [-]
9 9 1 pgs ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS' MTOION TO EXTEND THE TIME FOR SERVICE OF THE COMPLAINT UPON DEFENDANT TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED (DOC.3 ) IS GRANTED. PLAINTIFFS SHALL SERVE COPIES OF THE SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT UPON DEFENDANT TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED NO LATER THAN 7/5/2017. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 4/11/2017. 4/12/2017 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREP AND E-MAILED.(sg, )
Related: [-]
Friday, April 07, 2017
8 8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Craig A. Thompson ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-11988700.) filed by TAKEDA CALIFORNIA, INC., TAKEDA DEVELOPMENT CENTER AMERICAS, INC., TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS AMERICA, INC., TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, INC., TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS U.S.A., INC., TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC, TAP PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS, INC..Declaration and Cert. of Service.(FLASTER, EBEN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration Thompson Declaration in Support of Pro Hac Vice
Thursday, April 06, 2017
7 7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Jason C. Rose ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-11986154.) filed by TAKEDA CALIFORNIA, INC., TAKEDA DEVELOPMENT CENTER AMERICAS, INC., TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS AMERICA, INC., TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, INC., TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS U.S.A., INC., TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC, TAP PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS, INC..Declaration and Cert. of Service.(FLASTER, EBEN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration Rose Declaration in Support of Pro Hac Vice
Tuesday, April 04, 2017
6 6 NOTICE of Appearance by TRACY A FINKEN on behalf of KAREN VERTREES, MARK VERTREES with Certificate of Service(FINKEN, TRACY)
Related: [-]
5 5 NOTICE of Appearance by EBEN SCOTT FLASTER on behalf of TAKEDA CALIFORNIA, INC., TAKEDA DEVELOPMENT CENTER AMERICAS, INC., TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS AMERICA, INC., TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, INC., TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS U.S.A., INC., TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC, TAP PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS, INC. with Cert. of Service(FLASTER, EBEN)
Related: [-]
4 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by MARK VERTREES, KAREN VERTREES. TAKEDA CALIFORNIA, INC. waiver sent on 3/9/2017, answer due 5/8/2017; TAKEDA DEVELOPMENT CENTER AMERICAS, INC. waiver sent on 3/9/2017, answer due 5/8/2017; TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS AMERICA, INC. waiver sent on 3/9/2017, answer due 5/8/2017; TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, INC. waiver sent on 3/9/2017, answer due 5/8/2017; TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS U.S.A., INC. waiver sent on 3/9/2017, answer due 5/8/2017; TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC waiver sent on 3/9/2017, answer due 5/8/2017; TAKEDA RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT CENTER, INC. waiver sent on 3/9/2017, answer due 5/8/2017; TAP PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS, INC. waiver sent on 3/9/2017, answer due 5/8/2017. (WEISS, SOL)
Related: [-]
3 3 MOTION Extend Time for Service of Complaint filed by KAREN VERTREES, MARK VERTREES.Memorandum.(WEISS, SOL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, March 29, 2017
2 2 PRAECIPE to Issue Alias Summons by KAREN VERTREES, MARK VERTREES. (WEISS, SOL) Modified on 3/29/2017 (lisad, ).
Related: [-]
Summons Issued as to TAKEDA CALIFORNIA, INC., TAKEDA DEVELOPMENT CENTER AMERICAS, INC., TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS AMERICA, INC., TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, INC., TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS U.S.A., INC., TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC, TAKEDA RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT CENTER, INC., TAP PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS, INC.. 8 Forwarded To: PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL on 3/29/2017 (sg, ) Modified on 3/30/2017 (lisad, ).
Related: [-]
Monday, January 09, 2017
Summons Issued as to TAKEDA CALIFORNIA, INC., TAKEDA DEVELOPMENT CENTER AMERICAS, INC., TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED, TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS AMERICA, INC., TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, INC., TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS U.S.A., INC., TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC, TAKEDA RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT CENTER, INC., TAP PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS, INC.. Nine Forwarded To: Counsel on 1/9/17 (jwl, )
Related: [-]
Friday, January 06, 2017
1 1 COMPLAINT against TAKEDA CALIFORNIA, INC., TAKEDA DEVELOPMENT CENTER AMERICAS, INC., TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED, TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS AMERICA, INC., TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS INTERNATIONAL, INC., TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS U.S.A., INC., TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC, TAKEDA RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT CENTER, INC., TAP PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS, INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 152885.), filed by MARK VERTREES, KAREN VERTREES.(jwl, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by KAREN VERTREES, MARK VERTREES. (jwl, )
Related: [-]