Renner v. Sequans Communications S.A. et al
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Frederic Block |
Referred: | Sanket J Bulsara |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-04665 |
Nature of Suit | 850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange |
Cause | 15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act |
Case Filed: | Aug 09, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jan 26, 2021 |
Last checked: Monday Feb 05, 2018 3:53 AM EST |
Defendant
Deborah Choate
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Georges Karam
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Sequans Communications S.A.
|
Represented By
|
Movant
Boca Raton Police and Firefighters Retirement System
|
Represented By
|
Movant
Kulwant Johal
|
Represented By
|
Movant
Matthew McGee
|
Represented By
|
Movant
Jerry L. Searing
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Andrew Renner
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Tuesday, January 26, 2021 | ||
75 | 75
3
pgs
order
Order of Distribution of Funds
Tue 01/26 4:24 PM
ORDER: Granting unopposed motion for an order approving distribution of class settlement funds. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 1/26/2021. (Innelli, Michael) |
|
74 | 74
motion
Settlement
Tue 01/26 3:20 PM
Notice of MOTION for Settlement Unopposed Motion for Distribution of Class Settlement Fund by Kulwant Johal, Matthew McGee. (Jafri, Omar) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support Of Unopposed Motion for Distribution of Class Settlement Fund, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order Approving Distribution of Class Settlement Fund, | ||
Att: 3 Declaration In Support of Distribution of Class Settlement Fund, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit In Support of Distribution of Class Settlement Fund | ||
order
Order on Motion for Settlement
Tue 01/26 4:21 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER: Granting plaintiff's unopposed motion74 approving class settlement. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 1/26/2021. (Innelli, Michael) |
||
order
Order Dismissing Case
Tue 01/26 4:25 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER DISMISSING CASE: See entry75 . Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 1/26/2021. (Innelli, Michael) |