Utah District Court
Judge:Robert J Shelby
Referred: Brooke C Wells
Case #: 2:17-cv-00905
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:0271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Aug 09, 2017
Last checked: Saturday Sep 23, 2017 4:27 AM MDT
Defendant
Apple
Represented By
Mark F James
Hatch James & Dodge
contact info
Brent O. Hatch
Hatch James & Dodge
contact info
Shaunda L. McNeill
Hatch James & Dodge
contact info
Mitchell A. Stephens
Hatch James & Dodge
contact info
Plaintiff
nCap Licensing
Represented By
Jason D. Cassady
Caldwell Cassady & Curry PC
contact info
Alexis F. Mosser
Caldwell Cassady & Curry PC
contact info
Kimberly Neville
Dorsey & Whitney
contact info
Bradley W. Caldwell
Caldwell Cassady & Curry PC
contact info
Bryon J. Benevento
Dorsey & Whitney
contact info
John Austin Curry
Caldwell Cassady & Curry PC
contact info
Plaintiff
nCap Medical
Represented By
Jason D. Cassady
Caldwell Cassady & Curry PC
contact info
Alexis F. Mosser
Caldwell Cassady & Curry PC
contact info
Kimberly Neville
Dorsey & Whitney
contact info
Bradley W. Caldwell
Caldwell Cassady & Curry PC
contact info
Bryon J. Benevento
Dorsey & Whitney
contact info
John Austin Curry
Caldwell Cassady & Curry PC
contact info
Plaintiff
nCap Telecommunications
Represented By
Jason D. Cassady
Caldwell Cassady & Curry PC
contact info
Alexis F. Mosser
Caldwell Cassady & Curry PC
contact info
Kimberly Neville
Dorsey & Whitney
contact info
Bradley W. Caldwell
Caldwell Cassady & Curry PC
contact info
Bryon J. Benevento
Dorsey & Whitney
contact info
John Austin Curry
Caldwell Cassady & Curry PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 01/15/2018 11:59 PM MST
Friday, January 12, 2018
63 63 misc Transcript Fri 8:50 AM
**RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Motion to Dismiss held on December 12, 2017 before Judge Robert J. Shelby. Court Reporter/Transcriber Kelly Brown, Hicken RPR, RMR, Telephone number 801-521-7238. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 7 business days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the parties intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. To redact additional information a Motion to Redact must be filed. The policy and forms are located on the court's website at www.utd.uscourts.gov. Please read this policy carefully. If no Notice of Intent to Redact is filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available on the date set forth below. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/2/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/12/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/12/2018. (jmr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 09, 2018
62 62 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Tue 4:36 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Memorandum in Support Count Two of Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Apple. (Hatch, Brent)
Related: [-]