California Central District Court
Judge:George H Wu
Referred: Frederick F Mumm
Case #: 2:17-cv-05923
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Aug 09, 2017
Last checked: Thursday Aug 10, 2017 1:38 AM PDT
Defendant
Nintendo Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Nintendo of America, Inc.
Plaintiff
Gamevice, Inc.
Represented By
Christopher A Mathews
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart And Sullivan LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 08/22/2017 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, August 16, 2017
14 14 order Transfer Pursuant to Patent Pilot Program (CV-128) Wed 1:58 PM
ORDER TO TRANSFER CASE TO THE PATENT PILOT PROGRAM by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. Case transferred from Judge Stephen V. Wilson to Judge George H. Wu for all further proceedings. Case number now reads 2:17-cv-05923 GW(FFMx). (rn)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 14, 2017
13 13 cs_rasgn Reassign Case - Self -Recusal --pursuant GO 16-05 (CV-52) Mon 3:40 PM
ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to General Order 16-05 by Judge Manuel L. Real. Case transferred from Judge Manuel L. Real to the calendar of Judge Stephen V. Wilson for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as 2:17-cv-05923 SVW (FFMx). (esa)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Mon 3:20 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Ali Moghaddas counsel for Plaintiff Gamevice, Inc.. Adding Ali Moghaddas as counsel of record for Gamevice, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Gamevice, Inc.. (Moghaddas, Ali)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Mon 2:56 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance10 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal G123. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 11, 2017
10 10 notice Appearance Fri 2:29 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Ali Moghaddas on behalf of Plaintiff Gamevice, Inc. (Attorney Ali Moghaddas added to party Gamevice, Inc.(pty:pla))(Moghaddas, Ali)
Related: [-]
9 9 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Fri 12:53 PM
ORDER RE: NOTICE TO COUNSEL upon filing of the complaint by Judge Manuel L. Real. READ CAREFULLY - FAILURE TO COMPLY MAY LEAD TO SANCTIONS. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (cch)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 10, 2017
8 8 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 3:06 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Nintendo of America, Inc. (ghap)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Thu 2:50 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Manuel L. Real and Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. (ghap)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 09, 2017
6 6 misc Report on Filing of Patent/Trademark Action (Initial Notification) (AO 120) Wed 5:26 PM
REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Gamevice, Inc.. (Mathews, Christopher)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 5:25 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Gamevice, Inc. identifying None as Corporate Parent. (Mathews, Christopher)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Wed 5:21 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Gamevice, Inc., (Mathews, Christopher)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Summons Request Wed 5:19 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by plaintiff Gamevice, Inc.. (Mathews, Christopher)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Wed 5:16 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Gamevice, Inc.. (Mathews, Christopher)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 5:10 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-20326990 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Gamevice, Inc.. (Attorney Christopher A Mathews added to party Gamevice, Inc.(pty:pla))(Mathews, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - U.S. Patent 9,126,119