Condom Revolution, Inc.
Member Case
Lead case is: 1:17-bk-11722
Lead case is: 1:17-bk-11722
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Brendan Linehan Shannon |
Case #: | 1:17-bk-11728 |
Case Filed: | Aug 10, 2017 |
Terminated: | Oct 10, 2018 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 200-999 |
Est. Assets | $10,000,001 to $50 million |
Est. Liabilities | $50,000,001 to $100 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Condom Revolution, Inc., Debtor
901 W Main St Ste A
Auburn, WA 98001-5280 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
Docket last updated: 18 minutes ago |
Wednesday, October 10, 2018 | ||
court
Close Bankruptcy Case
Wed 10/10 9:08 AM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (SJS) |
||
Tuesday, October 09, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
claims
Claims Register
Tue 10/09 6:54 PM
Final Claims Register in Numerical and Alphabetical Order . Filed by Rust Consulting/Omni Bankruptcy. (Osborne, Brian) |
|
Att: 1 Alphabetical Order | ||
12 | 12
order
Final Decree
Tue 10/09 1:21 PM
Final Decree Closing Chapter 11 Cases and Terminating the Engagement of the Claims Agent. Signed on 10/9/2018 (LCN) |
|
Thursday, October 26, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
claims
Claims Register
Thu 10/26 6:25 PM
Claims Register (Claim Nos. 1-2) in Numerical and Alphabetical Order . Filed by Rust Consulting/Omni Bankruptcy. (Osborne, Brian) |
|
Att: 1 Alphabetical Order | ||
Tuesday, October 10, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Amended Schedules/Statements - Jointly Administered Entity
Tue 10/10 8:37 PM
Amended Schedules/Statements - Jointly Administered Entity filed: Sch A-B, Sch D, Sch E-F, Sch G, Sch H, , Sum of Assets and Liabilities, Decl Concerning Debtors Schs,. Filed by Condom Revolution, Inc.. (McGuire, Matthew) |
|
Monday, October 09, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Amended Schedules/Statements - Jointly Administered Entity
Mon 10/09 4:44 PM
Amended Schedules/Statements - Jointly Administered Entity filed: , Stmt of Financial Affairs,. Filed by Condom Revolution, Inc.. (McGuire, Matthew) |
|
Wednesday, September 06, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Exhibit
Wed 09/06 1:55 PM
Exhibit(s) (Global Notes Regarding Schedules of Assets and Liabilities and Statements of Financial Affairs) Filed by Condom Revolution, Inc.. (McGuire, Matthew) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Schedules/Statements
Wed 09/06 10:36 AM
Schedules/Statements filed: , Stmt of Financial Affairs,. Filed by Condom Revolution, Inc.. (McGuire, Matthew) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Schedules/Statements
Wed 09/06 10:35 AM
Schedules/Statements filed: Sch A-B, Sch D, Sch E-F, Sch G, Sch H, , Sum of Assets and Liabilities, Decl Concerning Debtors Schs,. Filed by Condom Revolution, Inc.. (McGuire, Matthew) |
|
Friday, August 11, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order-Joint Admin
Fri 08/11 1:00 PM
Order Granting Motion of the Debtors for Entry of an Order Directing Joint Administration of Related Chapter 11 Cases. An order has been entered in this case directing the procedural consolidation and joint administration of the chapter 11 cases of Peekay Acquisition, LLC, Case No. 17-11772 (BLS); Peekay, Inc., Case No. 17-11723 (BLS); Peekay Boutiques, Inc., Case No. 17-11724 (BLS); Christals Acquisition, LLC, Case No. 17-11725 (BLS); Peekay Spa, LLC, Case No. 17-11726 (BLS); Conrev, Inc., Case No. 17-11727 (BLS); Condom Revolution, Inc., Case No. 17-11728 (BLS); Charter Smith Sanhueza Retail, Inc., Case No. 17-11729 (BLS); ZJ Gifts F-2, L.L.C., Case No. 17-11730 (BLS); ZJ Gifts F-3, L.L.C., Case No. 17-11731 (BLS); ZJ Gifts F-4, L.L.C., Case No. 17-11732 (BLS); ZJ Gifts F-5, L.L.C., Case No. 17-11733 (BLS); ZJ Gifts F-6, L.L.C., Case No. 17-11734 (BLS); ZJ Gifts I-1, L.L.C., Case No. 17-11735 (BLS); ZJ Gifts M-3, L.L.C., Case No. 17-11738 (BLS); ZJ Gifts M-1, L.L.C., Case No. 17-11736 (BLS); ZJ Gifts M-2, L.L.C., Case No. 17-11737 (BLS). The docket in the chapter 11 case of Peekay Acquisition, LLC, Case No. 17-11772 (BLS), should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. Signed on 8/11/2017 (SJS) |
|
Thursday, August 10, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
court
Case Reassigned
Thu 08/10 10:33 AM
Judge Brendan Linehan Shannon added to case. Involvement of Judge Kevin J. Carey Terminated (LCo) |
|
3 | 3
crditcrd
none
Thu 08/10 8:59 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 17-11728 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt Number 89503, amount $1717.00. (COH) |
|
2 | 2
9
pgs
motion
Joint Administration - Motion (Multi)
Thu 08/10 7:32 AM
Motion for Joint Administration Filed by Peekay Acquisition, LLC. (McGuire, Matthew) |
|
1 | 1
18
pgs
misc
RETIRED - Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Thu 08/10 5:58 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1717. Filed by Condom Revolution, Inc.. (Landis, Adam) |
|
court
Case Assigned
Thu 08/10 8:00 AM
Judge Kevin J. Carey added to case (LCo) |