TOHANCZYN v. GREYSTAR MANAGEMENT SERVICES, L.P. et al
Pennsylvania Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Michael M Baylson |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-03594 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act |
Case Filed: | Aug 10, 2017 |
Terminated: | Oct 26, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 06, 2018 3:57 AM EST |
Defendant
EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
GREYSTAR MANAGEMENT SERVICES, L.P.
|
|
Plaintiff
KATHERINE TOHANCZYN
|
Represented By
|
Unrepresented Party
GREYSTAR MANAGEMENT SERVICES, L.P.
1515 MARKET STREET
PHILADELPHIA, PA 19102 |
Docket last updated: 72 minutes ago |
Monday, July 09, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
1
pgs
order
Order
Tue 07/10 9:49 AM
ORDER THAT PURSUANT TO THE STIPULATION OF THE PARTIES THE ENTIRE CASE IS DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 7/9/18. 7/10/18 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREP AND E-MAILED.(ti, ) |
|
Friday, July 06, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Fri 07/06 2:51 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice by KATHERINE TOHANCZYN.(LEVIN, CYNTHIA) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order to dismiss | ||
Monday, October 30, 2017 | ||
utility
Returned Mail
Tue 10/31 10:01 AM
Copy of Order dated 10/20/17 and envelope returned from the U.S. Postal Service addressed to GREYSTAR MANAGEMENT SERVICES, L.P. for the following reason: Insufficient Address. (ti, ) |
||
Thursday, October 26, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case - 41(b)
Thu 10/26 1:59 PM
ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 41.1(b). SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 10/26/17. 10/26/17 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREP AND E-MAILED.(ti, ) |
|
Wednesday, October 25, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 10/25 6:29 PM
NOTICE by KATHERINE TOHANCZYN Of Settlement (LEVIN, CYNTHIA) |
|
Friday, October 20, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment)
Fri 10/20 1:42 PM
ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF MARK C. ZHENG, ESQUIRE, TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 10/19/17.10/20/17 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREP AND E-MAILED.(ti, ) |
|
Thursday, October 19, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment)
Thu 10/19 6:08 PM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Mark C. Zheng, Esq. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-12403091.) filed by EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC..certificate of counsel, certificate of service.(GHIASUDDIN, MOHAMMAD) |
|
Tuesday, October 10, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Hearing
Tue 10/10 4:26 PM
NOTICE of Hearing:TELEPHONE CONFERENCE REGARDING THE SCHEDULING OF A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR 10/26/2017 09:15 AM BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE. COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF IS DIRECTED TO INITIATE THE CALL. (CHAMBERS PH. 267-299-7790)(dp, ) |
|
Wednesday, October 04, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
minutes
Pretrial Conference - Initial
Wed 10/04 2:10 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON Pretrial Conference held on 10/4/17 (ti, ) |
|
7 | 7
order
Scheduling Order
Wed 10/04 2:04 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER THAT DISCOVERY DEADLINE IS 6/14/2018. MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE WILL CONTACT COUNSEL AS TO WHETHER SETTLEMENT DISCUSSIONS HAVE TAKEN PLACE AND TO SCHEDULE A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. DEADLINE FOR DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS ARE 7/16/2018. PRETRIAL MEMORANDA FILED AND SERVED PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.1(c), PLAINTIFF ON OR BEFORE 7/30/2018; DEFENDANT ON OR BEFORE 8/15/2018. DATE FOR TRIAL OR ENTRY INTO TRIAL POOL IS 9/17/2018, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 10/4/17. 10/4/17 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREP AND E-MAILED.(ti, ) Modified on 10/4/2017 (ti, ) |
|
Monday, August 28, 2017 | ||
utility
Returned Mail
Tue 08/29 10:35 AM
Copy of Order dated 8/14/17 and envelope returned from the U.S. Postal Service addressed to GREYSTAR MANAGEMENT SERVICES, L.P. for the following reason: Insufficient Address. (ti, ) Modified on 8/29/2017 (ti, ) |
||
utility
Returned Mail
Tue 08/29 10:35 AM
Copy of Notice dated 8/16/17 and envelope returned from the U.S. Postal Service addressed to GREYSTAR MANAGEMENT SERVICES, L.P. for the following reason: Insufficient Address. (ti, ) Modified on 8/29/2017 (ti, ) |
||
Thursday, August 17, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
misc
State Court Record - Attachment
Thu 08/17 4:54 PM
Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of Montgomery County.(ti, ) |
|
Att: 1 Notice of Removal, | ||
Att: 2 Entry of Apperance, | ||
Att: 3 Affidavit, | ||
Att: 4 Papers Forwarded | ||
Wednesday, August 16, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Hearing
Wed 08/16 11:49 AM
NOTICE of Hearing: PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL TELEPHONE CONFERENCE SET FOR 10/4/2017 11:45 AM BEFORE HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON. COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF WILL INITIATE THE TELEPHONE CONFERENCE AND WHEN ALL COUNSEL ARE ON THE LINE, CALL CHAMBERS AT 267-299-7520.(lds, ) |
|
Att: 1 Supplement, | ||
Att: 2 Supplement | ||
4 | 4
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 08/16 11:23 AM
ANSWER to Complaint together with affirmative defenses, certificate of service by EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC..(GHIASUDDIN, MOHAMMAD) |
|
Monday, August 14, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
order
Order
Mon 08/14 1:32 PM
ORDER THAT THE PROTHONOTARY OF THE COURT OF COMMON PLEASE OF MONTGOMERY COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA, MAY SUBMIT THE AFORESAID RECORDS TO THE CLERK OF COURT IN ELECTRONIC FORMAT, SO THAT THEY CAN BE FILED IN THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED MATTER. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 8/14/17. 8/14/17 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO CCP MONTCO, UNREP AND E-MAILED.(ti, ) |
|
Thursday, August 10, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
discov
Disclosure Statement Form 7.1 (COURT ONLY)
Thu 08/10 1:58 PM
Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 Identifying Corporate Parent EXPERIAN PLC, Corporate Parent OPT-OUT SERVICES LLC, Corporate Parent CENTRAL SOURCE LLC, Corporate Parent ONLINE DATA EXCHANGE LLC, Corporate Parent NEW MANAGEMENT SERVICES LLC, Corporate Parent VANTAGESCORE SOLUTIONS LLC for EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC.. by EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC..(tj, ) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Thu 08/10 1:55 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC. from Montgomery CCP, case number 1 7-9863 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 163995), Certificate of Service(tj, ) |