Baca et al v. Colorado Department of State
Colorado District Court | |
Judge: | Daniel D Domenico |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-01937 |
Nature of Suit | 441 Civil Rights - Voting |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Aug 10, 2017 |
Re-opened: | Oct 01, 2020 |
Terminated: | Nov 20, 2020 |
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 06, 2018 2:10 AM MST |
Defendant
Colorado Department of State
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Polly Baca
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Nemanich
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Micheal Baca
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Wayne W. Williams
Terminated: 10/25/2017
|
Represented By
|
1. | Federal judge tosses "faithless" presidential elector lawsuit against Colorado Secretary of State Wayne Williams (denverpost.com) |
Submitted Wed 04/11/2018 | |
2. | Two Colorado presidential electors file lawsuit against Secretary of State Wayne Williams (denverpost.com) |
Submitted Wed 08/16/2017 | |
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM MDT |
Friday, November 20, 2020 | ||
74 | 74
utility
Terminate Civil Case - PUBLIC
Fri 11/20 12:12 PM
Civil Case Terminated pursuant to the 73 Order filed in this case on 11/20/2020. Text Only Entry (athom, ) |
|
73 | 73
order
Order
Fri 11/20 10:39 AM
ORDER: In light of the parties'72 Joint Status Report and the Tenth Circuit's67 Order vacating its prior judgment that reversed the District Court's53 Order and54 Judgment dismissing this case, the court directs the Clerk of Court to terminate this case pursuant to the district court's prior54 Judgment. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 11/20/2020. Text Only Entry (dddlc3, ) |
|
Monday, November 16, 2020 | ||
72 | 72
misc
Status Report
Mon 11/16 3:43 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendants Colorado Department of State, Wayne W. Williams. (Sullivan, Grant) |