Solomon, Nick et al v. John Cabot University, Inc., et al
Wisconsin Western District Court | |
Judge: | James D Peterson |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00621 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Wrongful Death |
Case Filed: | Aug 14, 2017 |
Terminated: | Feb 12, 2019 |
Last checked: Saturday Feb 10, 2018 3:27 AM CST |
Defendant
ACE American Insurance Company
436 Walnut Street
Philadelphia, PA 19106 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
John Cabot University, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Estate of Beau Jordan Solomon
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jodi Solomon
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Nick Solomon
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Chubb Group of Insurance
Terminated: 10/25/2017
|
Represented By
|
1. | Parents of U-W Madison student file lawsuit against John Cabot University after son found dead in Italian River (nbc15.com) |
Submitted Thu 08/17/2017 | |