2 Dogs Distribution LLC v. Cyberush Products Limited
Arizona District Court | |
Judge: | Diane J Humetewa |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02725 |
Nature of Suit | 830 Property Rights - Patent |
Cause | 35:271 Patent Infringement |
Case Filed: | Aug 11, 2017 |
Terminated: | Feb 23, 2018 |
Last checked: Wednesday Feb 07, 2018 2:15 AM MST |
Defendant
Cyberush Products Limited
|
|
Plaintiff
2 Dogs Distribution LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Friday, February 23, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Fri 02/23 3:25 PM
ORDER this action is DISMISSED, with prejudice, and without costs or attorneys' fees to any party. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 2/23/2018. (LFIG) |
|
Thursday, February 15, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - Entire Case/Action
Thu 02/15 12:07 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by 2 Dogs Distribution LLC. (Ahearn, Terry) |
|
Wednesday, January 03, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information
Wed 01/03 1:15 PM
NOTICE of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information filed by 2 Dogs Distribution LLC. (Ahearn, Terry) |
|
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information
Wed 01/03 1:07 PM
NOTICE of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information filed by 2 Dogs Distribution LLC. (Ahearn, Terry) |
|
Tuesday, January 02, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
minute_ord
~Util - Initial Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information
Tue 01/02 10:41 AM
MINUTE ORDER: SECOND Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. The Clerk's Office is required to provide information to the Patent and Trademark Office and/or Copyright Office regarding this case. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that must be completed. Plaintiff shall complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms. Within three (3) days , Plaintiff must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form. If neither form is required for this case, please file a notice indicating the reason the form is not necessary and use the event listed above. This form must be updated if additional patents, copyrights, or trademarks are alleged in a responsive pleading. (LFIG) |
|
Tuesday, November 28, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
1
pgs
order
Order
Tue 11/28 10:28 AM
ORDER that a Stipulation to Dismiss shall be filed on or before February 15, 2018. If a Stipulation to Dismiss has not been filed, the parties shall file a Status Report to the Court on that date. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 11/28/2017. (LFIG) |
|
Friday, November 24, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - Entire Case/Action
Fri 11/24 4:33 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by 2 Dogs Distribution LLC. (Ahearn, Terry) |
|
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Settlement
Fri 11/24 4:30 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by 2 Dogs Distribution LLC. (Ahearn, Terry) |
|
Tuesday, November 14, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
1
pgs
order
Order to Show Cause
Tue 11/14 2:24 PM
ORDER that this matter shall be dismissed without prejudice if Plaintiff fails to show good cause before Friday, November 24, 2017 for failure to serve the Summons and Complaint on Defendant. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED directing the Clerk of the Court to terminate this matter without further notice on Monday, November 27, 2017 if Plaintiff fails to comply. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 11/14/2017. (LFIG) |
|
Wednesday, October 11, 2017 | ||
misc
Remark (Public)
Wed 10/11 2:02 PM
Remark: Pro hac motion granted for Terry W Ahearn on behalf of plaintiff. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) |
||
Thursday, October 05, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Attorney Substitution (Within Firm Only)
Thu 10/05 11:50 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Substitution by Scott Kent Brown, II. (Brown, Scott) |
|
Monday, August 14, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order re Rule 12(b) Motions
Mon 08/14 3:56 PM
ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. ORDERED that Plaintiff serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant and file a notice of service. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 8/14/2017. (LFIG) |
|
7 | 7
minute_ord
Minute Order ~Util - Initial Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information
Mon 08/14 2:48 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. The Clerk's Office is required to provide information to the Patent and Trademark Office and/or Copyright Office regarding this case. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that must be completed. Plaintiff shall complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms. Within seven (7) days, Plaintiff must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form. If neither form is required for this case, please file a notice indicating the reason the form is not necessary and use the event listed above. This form must be updated if additional patents, copyrights, or trademarks are alleged in a responsive pleading (REK) |
|
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued
Mon 08/14 2:47 PM
Summons Issued as to Cyberush Products Limited. (REK) |
|
Friday, August 11, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice re Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP)
Mon 08/14 2:46 PM
NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (REK) |
|
4 | 4
misc
New Case Opened
Mon 08/14 2:45 PM
Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-14536777. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Diane J. Humetewa. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 17-02725 PHX-DJH. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (REK) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 08/14 2:43 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by 2 Dogs Distribution LLC. (submitted by Shane Olafson) (REK) |
|
2 | 2
service
Summons Submitted
Mon 08/14 2:42 PM
SUMMONS Submitted by 2 Dogs Distribution LLC. (submitted by Shane Olafson) (REK) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 08/14 2:41 PM
COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $400.00, receipt number 0970-14536777 filed by 2 Dogs Distribution LLC. (submitted by Shane Olafson)(REK) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |