Padilla v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Arizona District Court | |
Judge: | Michael T Morrissey |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02737 |
Nature of Suit | 863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g)) |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC) |
Case Filed: | Aug 14, 2017 |
Terminated: | Oct 03, 2018 |
Defendant
Commissioner of Social Security Administration
|
|
Interested Party
SSA Office of General Counsel
|
|
Plaintiff
Dorothy Padilla
|
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM MST |
Thursday, May 27, 2021 | ||
31 | 31
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Attorney Fees
Thu 05/27 11:58 AM
ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney Fees Under 42 U.S.C. § 405(b) (doc.27 ) is granted. Plaintiff's attorney shall receive $7,439.00 in fees, payable from the past-due Title II benefits awarded in this case. Plaintiff's attorney shall promptly refund to Plaintiff $5,997.34, minus fees and costs as outlined in Plaintiff's contingency fee agreement (doc.28 -2, Ex. B at 2-3), to offset the award previously granted by this Court (doc.26 ) under the Equal Access to Justice Act. See document for complete details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T Morrissey on 05/27/2021. (MHW) |
|
30 | 30
respm
Response to Motion
Thu 05/27 10:46 AM
RESPONSE to Motion re:27 First MOTION for Attorney Fees Under 42 U.S.C. § 406(b) filed by Commissioner of Social Security Administration. (Lu, Ryan) |
|
Thursday, May 20, 2021 | ||
29 | 29
minute_ord
~Util - Add and Terminate Judges
Thu 05/20 12:22 PM
MINUTE ORDER: This case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Michael T Morrissey. All future filings shall reflect the following case number: CV 17-2737 PHX-MTM. Pending: Motion for Attorney Fees Under 42 U.S.C. § 406(b), Doc.27 . This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SJF) |
|
Thursday, May 13, 2021 | ||
28 | 28
misc
Memorandum
Thu 05/13 2:56 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support of 27 First MOTION for Attorney Fees Under 42 U.S.C. § 406(b) by Plaintiff Dorothy Padilla.(Caldwell, Mark) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Social Security Notice of Award, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Client Fee Agreement, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Itemization of Services | ||
27 | 27
motion
Attorney Fees
Thu 05/13 2:54 PM
First MOTION for Attorney Fees Under 42 U.S.C. § 406(b) by Dorothy Padilla.(Caldwell, Mark) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, January 15, 2019 | ||
26 | 26
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Attorney Fees
Tue 01/15 2:32 PM
ORDER: Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney's Fees under the Equal Access to Justice Act23 is GRANTED and Plaintiff is awarded $5,997.34. See document for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bridget S Bade on 1/15/2019. (REK) |
|
Monday, January 14, 2019 | ||
25 | 25
respm
Response to Motion
Mon 01/14 6:53 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re:23 First MOTION for Attorney Fees Under the Equal Access to Justice Act filed by Commissioner of Social Security Administration. (Lu, Ryan) |
|
Saturday, December 29, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
misc
Memorandum
Sat 12/29 3:05 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support of 23 First MOTION for Attorney Fees Under the Equal Access to Justice Act by Plaintiff Dorothy Padilla.(Caldwell, Mark) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Client Fee Agreement, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Itemization of Services, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Affidavit, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Meet & Confer Statement, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit USDC Order and Judgment | ||
23 | 23
motion
Attorney Fees
Sat 12/29 3:02 PM
First MOTION for Attorney Fees Under the Equal Access to Justice Act by Dorothy Padilla.(Caldwell, Mark) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, October 03, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
order
Clerks Judgment
Wed 10/03 2:58 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that pursuant to the Court's Order filed October 3, 2018, the decision of the Commissioner of Social Security is reversed and this case is remanded to the Social Security Administration for further proceedings consistent with the Order. (SLQ) |
|
21 | 21
16
pgs
order
Order
Wed 10/03 2:56 PM
ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the Commissioner's decision is REVERSED and this matter is remanded for a determination of benefits. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall enter judgment in favor of Plaintiff and terminate this case. (See document for complete details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Bridget S Bade on 10/3/18. (SLQ) |
|
Monday, April 30, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Brief - Reply
Mon 04/30 11:13 AM
REPLY BRIEF by Dorothy Padilla . (Caldwell, Mark) |
|
Friday, March 30, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Fri 03/30 2:01 PM
ORDER: The motion18 is GRANTED and the deadline for Plaintiff to file her reply brief is extended to and including April 29, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bridget S Bade on 3/30/2018. (REK) |
|
18 | 18
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Fri 03/30 6:58 AM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Dorothy Padilla.(Caldwell, Mark) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, March 14, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Brief - Response
Wed 03/14 2:02 PM
RESPONSE BRIEF by Commissioner of Social Security Administration re16 Brief - Opening . (Lu, Ryan) |
|
Monday, February 12, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Brief - Opening
Mon 02/12 7:52 AM
OPENING BRIEF by Dorothy Padilla . (Caldwell, Mark) |
|
Thursday, January 04, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney
Thu 01/04 9:56 AM
ORDER granting14 Motion to Substitute Attorney - Mark Caldwell is substituted as counsel of record for Plaintiff in this matter in place of Eric G. Slepian. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bridget S Bade on 1/3/18. (DXD) |
|
Wednesday, January 03, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Substitute Attorney
Wed 01/03 4:01 PM
MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Dorothy Padilla.(Caldwell, Mark) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Appendix | ||
Friday, December 15, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Filing - Soc. Sec. Admin. Transcript
Fri 12/15 11:10 AM
NOTICE of Filing Certified Copy of Administrative Transcript filed by Commissioner of Social Security Administration.(Lu, Ryan) |
|
Att: 1 001 Certification Page, | ||
Att: 2 002 Court Transcript Index, | ||
Att: 3 003 Documents Related to Administrative Process Including Transcript of Oral Hearing, if applicable, | ||
Att: 4 004 Payment Documents and Decisions, | ||
Att: 5 005 Jurisdictional Documents and Notices, | ||
Att: 6 006 Non Disability Related Development, | ||
Att: 7 007 Disability Related Development, | ||
Att: 8 008 Medical Records Part 1, | ||
Att: 9 009 Medical Records Part 2, | ||
Att: 10 010 Medical Records Part 3 | ||
12 | 12
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 12/15 11:01 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by Commissioner of Social Security Administration.(Lu, Ryan) |
|
Saturday, December 02, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance/Substitution - USA
Sat 12/02 2:23 PM
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Ryan Lu appearing for Commissioner of Social Security Administration. . (Lu, Ryan) |
|
Wednesday, November 22, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
Consent to Magistrate Judge Trial
Wed 11/22 9:29 AM
CONSENT TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE TRIAL. Magistrate Judge Bridget S Bade added. Judge G Murray Snow no longer assigned to case. All further pleadings shall list the following case number: CV 17-2737 PHX-BSB. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 11/21/17. (MAP) |
|
Monday, October 23, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
service
Service Executed
Mon 10/23 11:43 AM
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Dorothy Padilla: Notice of Service re: Complaint upon Elizabeth A. Strange of the U.S. Attorney's Office on 10-16-17; Office of Regional Chief Counsel on 10-17-17; and U.S. Attorney General on 10-16-17.(Slepian, Eric) |
|
Att: 1 Appendix | ||
Tuesday, August 15, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 08/15 2:52 PM
SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER: See order for details. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 8/15/2017. (LMR) |
|
7 | 7
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines
Tue 08/15 2:22 PM
ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on 11/13/2017. See order for additional details. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 8/15/2017. (LMR) |
|
Monday, August 14, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued as to USA
Mon 08/14 5:02 PM
Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (DXD) |
|
5 | 5
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 08/14 5:00 PM
ORDER granting2 Plaintiff's Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Plaintiff shall be responsible for service by waiver or of the summons and complaint. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 8/14/17.(DXD) |
|
4 | 4
misc
New Case Opened
Mon 08/14 3:06 PM
This case has been assigned to the Honorable G Murray Snow. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 17-02737 PHX-GMS. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (DXD) |
|
3 | 3
service
Summons Submitted
Mon 08/14 3:05 PM
SUMMONS Submitted by Dorothy Padilla (submitted by Eric Slepian). (DXD) |
|
Att: 1 Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Summons | ||
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 08/14 3:04 PM
APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Dorothy Padilla (submitted by Eric Slepian). (DXD) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 08/14 3:03 PM
COMPLAINT filed by Dorothy Padilla (submitted by Eric Slepian). (DXD) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |