Home mark homes, inc.
New Jersey Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Michael B Kaplan |
Case #: | 3:17-bk-26564 |
Case Filed: | Aug 15, 2017 |
Dismissed: | Aug 30, 2017 |
Terminated: | Oct 23, 2017 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Home mark homes, inc.
509 Drum Point Rd
Brick, NJ 08723-6980 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee.
US Dept of Justice Office of the US Trustee One Newark Center Ste 2100
Newark, NJ 07102 |
Docket last updated: 30 minutes ago |
Monday, October 23, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
order
Final Decree
Mon 10/23 11:17 AM
Final Decree; The following parties were served: Trustee and US Trustee. (gan) |
|
utility
Close Bankruptcy Case
Mon 10/23 11:18 AM
Bankruptcy Case Closed. (gan) |
||
Saturday, September 23, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order
Sun 09/24 12:40 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 09/23/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, September 19, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
order
Prospective Relief
Thu 09/21 11:17 AM
Order Denying Motion For Relief From Stay re: 416 Vannote Place, Brick, New Jersey 08723. . Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice., Denying Motion for Prospective Relief.. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 9/19/2017. (kmf) |
|
Monday, September 18, 2017 | ||
court
Hearing Held
Mon 09/18 3:05 PM
Minute of 9/18/17; CASE DISMISSED ON 8/30/17 (kmf) |
||
court
Hearing Held
Mon 09/18 4:08 PM
Minute of 9/18/17; CASE DISMISSED 8/30/17 (kmf) |
||
court
Hearing Held
Tue 09/19 8:48 AM
AMENDED Minute of 9/18/17; DENIED AS MOOT (kmf) |
||
court
Hearing Held
Tue 09/19 8:50 AM
AMENDED Minute of 9/18/17; DENIED AS MOOT (kmf) |
||
Friday, September 01, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Substitution of Attorney
Tue 09/05 12:45 PM
Substitution of Attorney, terminating Amit Deshmukh and adding Joseph F. Ottino, Jr. for Home Mark Homes, Inc.. Joseph F. Ottino Jr. on behalf of Home Mark Homes, Inc.. (gan) |
|
18 | 18
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order
Sat 09/02 12:34 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 09/01/2017. (Admin.) |
|
17 | 17
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Dismissing Case
Sat 09/02 12:34 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Dismissing Case. No. of Notices: 10. Notice Date 09/01/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, August 30, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
order
Dismissing Case
Wed 08/30 10:45 AM
Order Dismissing Case for Debtor . re: Failure to File Missing Schedules. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 8/30/2017. (wir) |
|
Monday, August 28, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request
Mon 08/28 5:09 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by Alan R. Ostrowitz on behalf of Valley National Bank. (Ostrowitz, Alan) |
|
Thursday, August 24, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request
Thu 08/24 2:19 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by Lauren Bielskie on behalf of United States Trustee. (Bielskie, Lauren) |
|
13 | 13
motion
Prospective Relief
Thu 08/24 10:12 AM
Motion for Relief from Stay re: 416 Vannote Place, Brick, New Jersey 08723. Fee Amount $ 181., in addition to Motion for Prospective Relief Filed by Michael Kahme on behalf of Shore Community Bank. Hearing scheduled for 9/18/2017 at 10:00 AM at MBK - Courtroom 8, Trenton. (Kahme, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Brief | ||
Att: 2 Certification | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit B | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit C | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit D | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit E | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit F | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit G | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit H | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit I | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit J | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit K | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit L | ||
Att: 15 Exhibit M | ||
Att: 16 Exhibit N | ||
Att: 17 Exhibit O | ||
Att: 18 Exhibit P | ||
Att: 19 Exhibit Q | ||
Att: 20 Exhibit R | ||
Att: 21 Exhibit S | ||
Att: 22 Exhibit T | ||
Att: 23 Exhibit U | ||
Att: 24 Exhibit V | ||
Att: 25 Exhibit W | ||
Att: 26 Exhibit X | ||
Att: 27 Exhibit Y | ||
Att: 28 Exhibit Z | ||
Att: 29 Exhibit AA | ||
Att: 30 Exhibit BB | ||
Att: 31 Exhibit CC | ||
Att: 32 Exhibit DD | ||
Att: 33 Exhibit EE | ||
Att: 34 Exhibit FF | ||
Att: 35 Exhibit GG | ||
Att: 36 Exhibit HH | ||
Att: 37 Exhibit II | ||
Att: 38 Exhibit JJ | ||
Att: 39 Exhibit KK | ||
Att: 40 Exhibit LL | ||
Att: 41 Exhibit MM | ||
Att: 42 Proposed Order | ||
Att: 43 Certificate of Service | ||
crditcrd
Credit Card/Debit Card Receipt
Thu 08/24 10:14 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Motion for Relief From Stay([LINK 17-26564 MBK] ) [motion,mrlfsty] ( 181.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A34758761, fee amount $ 181.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
Monday, August 21, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request
Wed 08/23 10:50 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by Commercial Loan Investment VII, LLC. (wdr) |
|
11 | 11
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request
Mon 08/21 1:59 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by Alana R. Bartley on behalf of Commercial Loan Investment VII, LLC. (Bartley, Alana) |
|
Friday, August 18, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order
Sat 08/19 12:44 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 08/18/2017. (Admin.) |
|
9 | 9
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
Sat 08/19 12:44 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors. No. of Notices: 5. Notice Date 08/18/2017. (Admin.) |
|
8 | 8
court
BNC Certificate of Notice (generic)
Sat 08/19 12:44 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 08/18/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, August 17, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request
Thu 08/17 4:50 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by William F. Saldutti III on behalf of Santander Bank, N.A.. (Saldutti, William) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request
Thu 08/17 10:29 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by Elizabeth K. Holdren on behalf of Shore Community Bank. (Holdren, Elizabeth) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request
Thu 08/17 10:04 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by Michael Kahme on behalf of Shore Community Bank. (Kahme, Michael) |
|
Wednesday, August 16, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
court
Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11
Wed 08/16 3:01 PM
Meeting of Creditors - Chapter 11. 341(a) meeting to be held on 10/5/2017 at 10:00 AM at Room 129, Clarkson S. Fisher Courthouse. Proofs of Claim due by 1/3/2018. (mrg) |
|
3 | 3
court
Notice of Hearing - (Generic)
Wed 08/16 11:03 AM
CHAPTER 11 STATUS CONFERENCE HEARING: . The following parties were served: Debtor, Debtor's Attorney, Trustee, and US Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 9/18/2017 at 11:00 AM at MBK - Courtroom 8, Trenton. (wir) |
|
court
Notice of Docketing Error
Wed 08/16 7:43 AM
Correction Notice in Electronic Filing . Type of Error: CREDITORS NOT UPLOADED, filed by Amit Deshmukh. The Court has entered the creditors. Please UPLOAD creditors in ALL future cases. (mrg) |
||
Tuesday, August 15, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
court
Notice of Missing Documents
Wed 08/16 9:25 AM
Notice of Missing Documents. . Missing Documents: Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individuals, Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non Individual Debtors, Statement of Financial Affairs For Non-Individuals, Disclosure of Compensation of Bankruptcy Petition Preparer Form 2800, List of Equity Security Holders, Statement of Corporate Ownership, Schedules A/B,D,E/F,G,H. Incomplete Filings due by 8/29/2017. (gan) |
|
1 | 1
7
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Tue 08/15 2:31 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Filed by Amit Deshmukh on behalf of Home mark homes, inc.. Ch. 11 Small Business Balance Sheet due 08/29/2017. Ch. 11 Cash Flow Statement due 08/29/2017.Statement of Corporate Ownership due 08/29/2017. Disclosure of Compensation for Attorney For Debtor08/29/2017.Declaration About an Individuals Schedules due 08/29/2017. List of Equity Security Holders due 08/29/2017. List of all creditors due 08/29/2017.Chapter 11 Statement of Current Monthly Income (122B) due 08/29/2017. Schedule(s) due 08/29/2017. SSN/Tax ID due 08/29/2017.Statement About Your Social Security Number due 08/29/2017.Statement of Financial Affairs for Non-Individuals due 08/29/2017. Ch. 11 Statement of Operations due 08/29/2017.Summary of Your Assets and Liabilities and Certain Statistical Information for Individuals due 08/29/2017.Summary of Your Assets and Liabilities for Non Individuals due 08/29/2017.Attachment to Chapter 11 Petition for Non Individuals due 08/29/2017. Incomplete Filings due by 08/29/2017. Chapter 11 Debtors Exclusive Right to File a Plan Expires on 12/13/2017. (Deshmukh, Amit) |
|
crditcrd
Credit Card/Debit Card Receipt
Tue 08/15 2:37 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 17-26564 ) [misc,volp11a] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A34704382, fee amount $ 1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) |