ALLEN v. ORGANON USA, INC et al
New Jersey District Court | |
Judge: | Susan D Wigenton |
Referred: | Leda D Wettre |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-06144 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Aug 15, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 31, 2017 |
Last checked: Sunday Feb 11, 2018 3:40 AM EST |
Defendant
MERCK & CO., INC.
|
|
Defendant
MERCK SHARP & DOHME
|
|
Defendant
N.V. ORGANON
|
|
Defendant
ORGANON USA, INC
|
|
Defendant
SCHERING CORPORATION
|
|
Plaintiff
DONNA ALLEN
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, August 31, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
mdl
MDL Transfer Order (out)
Thu 08/31 4:01 PM
Order of MDL Panel transferring case to the Eastern District of Missouri. (gh, ) |
|
misc
Docket Annotation (public)
Fri 09/01 9:10 AM
Case transferred from New Jersey has been opened in Eastern District of Missouri as case 4:17-cv-02348, filed 08/31/2017. (mfr) |
||
Tuesday, August 15, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Tue 08/15 8:57 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to MERCK & CO., INC., MERCK SHARP & DOHME, N.V. ORGANON, ORGANON USA, INC, SCHERING CORPORATION Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Issued By *John Reilly* (jr) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 08/15 1:08 PM
COMPLAINT against MERCK & CO., INC., MERCK SHARP & DOHME, N.V. ORGANON, ORGANON USA, INC, SCHERING CORPORATION ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-8027502) with JURY DEMAND, filed by DONNA ALLEN.(KRANGLE, DAVID) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 08/15 8:56 PM
Case assigned to Judge Susan D. Wigenton and Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. (jr) |