Regan v. Equifax Information Services LLC et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Analisa Torres |
Referred: | Gabriel W Gorenstein |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-06157 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act |
Case Filed: | Aug 15, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 25, 2018 |
Last checked: Sunday Feb 11, 2018 4:14 AM EST |
ADR Provider
AR Holdings NYC LLC
351 Amersterdam Avenue
New York, NY 10024 |
|
Counter Claimant
Santander Consumer USA Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Brendan T. Regan
|
Represented By
|
Cross Claimant
Santander Consumer USA Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
Manhattan Jeep Chrysler Dodge, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Equifax Information Services LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Manhattan Jeep Chrysler Dodge, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jeffrey Monninger
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Santander Consumer USA Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Trans Union, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Valley National Bank
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brendan T. Regan
|
Represented By
|
ThirdParty Defendant
AR Holdings NYC LLC
351 Amersterdam Avenue
New York, NY 10024 |
|
ThirdParty Plaintiff
Santander Consumer USA Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, May 16, 2019 | ||
121 | 121
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Thu 05/16 11:55 AM
ORDER granting120 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. GRANTED. Motions due by 6/6/2019. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 5/16/2019) (cf) |
|
Wednesday, May 15, 2019 | ||
120 | 120
motion
Extension of Time
Wed 05/15 4:57 PM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Move to Re-Open Case, if Necessary, addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Evan S. Rothfarb dated May 15, 2019. Document filed by Brendan T. Regan.(Rothfarb, Evan) |