Baker Ready Mix LLC
Louisiana Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Meredith S Grabill |
Case #: | 2:17-bk-12166 |
Case Filed: | Aug 15, 2017 |
Dismissed: | May 08, 2018 |
Terminated: | Aug 22, 2022 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 50-99 |
Est. Assets | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Est. Liabilities | $100,000,001 to $500 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Baker Ready Mix LLC
PO Box 52182
New Orleans, LA 70152-2182 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee
400 Poydras Street Suite 2110
New Orleans, LA 70130 |
Docket last updated: 08/14/2017 7:00 PM CDT |
Tuesday, August 15, 2017 | ||
crditcrd
none
Tue 08/15 7:29 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 17-12166 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt number 5952025, amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
1 | 1
13
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Tue 08/15 7:28 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual . Fee Amount $1717. Filed by Baker Ready Mix LLC. Chapter 11 Plan due by 12/13/2017. Disclosure Statement due by 12/13/2017. Declaration Regarding Electronic Filing due by 08/22/2017. Employee Income Record Due:08/29/2017. Schedule B due 08/29/2017. Schedule A/B due 08/29/2017. Schedule D due 08/29/2017. Schedule F due 08/29/2017. Schedule E/F due 08/29/2017. Schedule G due 08/29/2017. Schedule H due 08/29/2017. Statement of Financial Affairs due 08/29/2017. Summary of Assets and Liabilities due 08/29/2017. Incomplete Filings due by 08/29/2017. Chapter 11 Plan due by 12/13/2017. Disclosure Statement due by 12/13/2017. (Shorty, Edwin) |