Dakessian v. Schell et al
Delaware District Court | |
Judge: | Maryellen Noreika |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-01151 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Aug 16, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jan 25, 2019 |
Last checked: Monday Feb 12, 2018 3:18 AM EST |
Cross Claimant
World Championship Punkin' Chunkin' Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Cross Claimant
Discovery Communications, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Cross Claimant
State of Delaware
|
Represented By
|
Cross Claimant
State of Delaware Department of Natural Resources and Environmental Control
|
Represented By
|
Cross Claimant
Terry Brewster
|
Represented By
|
Cross Claimant
Dominick Daffner
|
Represented By
|
Cross Claimant
McCulley, Eastham, & Associates, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Cross Claimant
Frank Peyton
|
Represented By
|
Cross Claimant
Punkin Chunkin Association
|
Represented By
|
Cross Claimant
David Quigley
|
Represented By
|
Cross Claimant
William Schell, IV
|
Represented By
|
Cross Claimant
Frank Shade
|
Represented By
|
Cross Claimant
E. Dale Wheatley
|
Represented By
|
Cross Claimant
Jeffrey T. Wheatley
|
Represented By
|
Cross Claimant
Wheatley Farms, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
State of Delaware
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
Frank Shade
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
William Schell, IV
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
David Quigley
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
State of Delaware Department of Natural Resources and Environmental Control
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
Punkin Chunkin Association
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
Frank Peyton
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
McCulley, Eastham, & Associates, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
Discovery Communications, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
Dominick Daffner
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
Terry Brewster
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
E. Dale Wheatley
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
Jeffrey T. Wheatley
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
Wheatley Farms, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
World Championship Punkin' Chunkin' Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Dominick Daffner
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
World Championship Punkin' Chunkin' Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Terry Brewster
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Discovery Communications, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
McCulley, Eastham, & Associates, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Frank Peyton
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Punkin Chunkin Association
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
David Quigley
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
William Schell, IV
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Frank Shade
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
State of Delaware
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
State of Delaware Department of Natural Resources and Environmental Control
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
E. Dale Wheatley
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jeffrey T. Wheatley
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Wheatley Farms, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor Plaintiff
American Zurich Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Suzanne Dakessian
|
Represented By
|
1. | Woman files federal lawsuit over Punkin Chunkin accident after being critically injured (baltimoresun.com) |
Submitted Thu 08/17/2017 | |
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Friday, January 25, 2019 | ||
130 | 130
3
pgs
order
SO ORDERED ~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Fri 01/25 10:45 AM
SO ORDERED re129 Stipulation of Dismissal. ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 1/25/2019. (dlw) |
|
129 | 129
3
pgs
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Fri 01/25 9:29 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Terry Brewster, Frank Peyton, Punkin Chunkin Association, David Quigley, World Championship Punkin' Chunkin' Inc.. (Connors, Kevin) |