Ackers v. Brazile et al
Georgia Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Steve C Jones |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-03083 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1964 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Aug 14, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 25, 2017 |
Last checked: Saturday Feb 10, 2018 4:42 AM EST |
Defendant
Donna Brazile
|
|
Defendant
Cable News Network
|
|
Defendant
Hillary Rodman Clinton
|
|
Defendant
Democratic Services Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Jennifer Palmieri
|
|
Defendant
John Podesta
|
|
Defendant
Deborah Wasserman Schultz
|
|
Defendant
Time Warner Incorporated
|
|
Defendant
Turner Broadcasting System Incorporated
|
|
Defendant
Turner Services Incorporated
|
|
Plaintiff
Gregory Ackers
503 W. Olympic Bl.
Santa Monica, CA 90401 |
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Tuesday, November 14, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File
Tue 11/14 11:57 AM
ORDER denying6 Motion for Leave to File an amended complaint. This case remains closed. Signed by Judge Steve C Jones on 11/14/2017. (rjs) |
|
utility
Clerks Certificate of Mailing
Tue 11/14 11:58 AM
Clerks Certificate of Mailing as to Gregory Ackers re7 Order. (rjs) |
||
Monday, November 13, 2017 | ||
utility
Submission to District Judge
Mon 11/13 11:45 AM
Submission of6 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint to District Judge Steve C Jones. (rjs) |
||
Thursday, November 09, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Leave to File Document
Mon 11/13 11:44 AM
MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaintby Gregory Ackers. (rjs) |
|
Monday, September 25, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Judgment - Clerk
Mon 09/25 4:07 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT that this action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. (rjs) |
|
4 | 4
5
pgs
order
Order
Mon 09/25 4:00 PM
ORDER - Plaintiff's3 complaint is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The Court DIRECTS the Clerk to close this case. Signed by Judge Steve C Jones on 9/25/2017. (rjs) |
|
utility
Clerks Certificate of Mailing
Mon 09/25 4:08 PM
Clerks Certificate of Mailing as to Gregory Ackers re4 Order and5 Clerk's Judgment . (rjs) |
||
utility
Terminate Civil Case
Mon 09/25 4:16 PM
Civil Case Terminated. (rjs) |
||
Tuesday, August 22, 2017 | ||
utility
Clerks Certificate of Mailing
Tue 08/22 7:42 AM
Clerks Certificate of Mailing as to Gregory Ackers re2 Order. Notice of street name change for the Atlanta courthouse included. (jpa) |
||
utility
Submission to District Judge
Tue 08/22 7:43 AM
Submission of3 Complaint for frivolity determination, submitted to District Judge Steve C. Jones. (jpa) |
||
Monday, August 21, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
6
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Tue 08/22 7:41 AM
COMPLAINT filed by Gregory Ackers.(jpa) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
2 | 2
2
pgs
order
Order on Application for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 08/22 7:40 AM
ORDER granting1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk is DIRECTED to refrain from forwarding the Complaint to the United States Marshals Service for service until the District Judge orders otherwise. The Clerk is DIRECTED to submit this matter to the District Court for a frivolity determination under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2). Signed by Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand on 8/21/17. (jpa) |
|
Wednesday, August 16, 2017 | ||
utility
Submission to Magistrate Judge
Wed 08/16 3:32 PM
Submission of1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, submitted to Magistrate Judge Justin S Anand. (eop) |
||
Monday, August 14, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
motion
Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 08/16 3:09 PM
APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Gregory Ackers.(eop) |
|
Att: 1 Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |