Iowa Public Employees' Retirement System et al v. Bank of America Corporation et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Katherine Polk Failla |
Referred: | Sarah L Cave |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-06221 |
Nature of Suit | 410 Other Statutes - Antitrust |
Cause | 15:2 Antitrust Litigation |
Case Filed: | Aug 16, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Feb 12, 2018 4:41 AM EST |
Defendant
UBS Americas Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Prime Dealer Services Corp.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Strategic Investments I, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
UBS AG
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
UBS Financial Services Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
UBS Securities LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Credit Suisse Prime Securities Services (USA) LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Merrill Lynch Professional Clearing Corp.
|
|
Defendant
Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Credit Suisse AG
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Credit Suisse First Boston Next Fund, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
EquiLend Europe Limited
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
EquiLend Holdings LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
EquiLend LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Goldman Sachs Execution & Clearing, L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
J.P. Morgan Prime, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
J.P. Morgan Securities LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
J.P. Morgan Strategic Securities Lending Corp.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Merrill Lynch L.P. Holdings, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Orange County Employees Retirement System
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Torus Capital, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Los Angeles County Employees Retirement Association
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sonoma County Employees' Retirement Association
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Iowa Public Employees' Retirement System
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Morgan Stanley
Terminated: 01/26/2018
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Morgan Stanley Capital Management, LLC
Terminated: 01/26/2018
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Bank of America Corporation
Terminated: 01/26/2018
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
UBS Fund Services (USA) LLC
Terminated: 01/05/2018
|
|
Defendant
The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc.
Terminated: 01/26/2018
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
UBS Group AG
Terminated: 01/26/2018
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
J.P. Morgan Institutional Investments Inc.
Terminated: 01/05/2018
|
|
Defendant
UBS Asset Management (US) Inc.
Terminated: 01/05/2018
|
|
Defendant
Morgan Stanley Distribution, Inc.
Terminated: 01/05/2018
|
|
Defendant
Credit Suisse Group AG
Terminated: 01/26/2018
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
UBS Investment Bank
Terminated: 01/05/2018
|
|
Defendant
J.P. Morgan Chase & Co.
Terminated: 01/26/2018
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 03/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, March 08, 2024 | ||
664 | 664
11
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Approve
Fri 03/08 2:56 PM
ORDER PROVIDING FOR NOTICE TO THE SETTLEMENT CLASSES AND PRELIMINARILY APPROVING THE PLANS OF ALLOCATION: granting660 Motion to Approve. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: Except for the terms expressly defined herein, the Court adopts and incorporates the definitions in the Settlement Agreements and the Preliminary Approval Orders. The terms of the Plans of Allocation are preliminarily approved as within the range of reasonableness, fairness, and adequacy. If they have not already done so, Settling Defendants shall comply with the notice requirements of the Class Action Fairness Act, 28 U.S.C. §1715, within 10 days of entry of this Order. The Court approves, in form and substance, the long-form notice, the summary notice, the claim form, and the website as described herein. and as set forth herein. A hearing will be held on September 4, 2024, at 3:00 p.m., in Courtroom 618 of the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York, before the undersigned, to consider the fairness, reasonableness, and adequacy of the Settlements (the "Fairness Hearing"). IT IS SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 3/08/2024) (ama) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Hearings
Fri 03/08 2:57 PM
Set/Reset Hearings: Fairness Hearing set for 9/4/2024 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 618, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Katherine Polk Failla. (ama) |