Caramel Taxi LLC
Member Case
Lead case is: 2:17-bk-26678
Lead case is: 2:17-bk-26678
New Jersey Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Vincent F Papalia |
Case #: | 2:17-bk-26684 |
Case Filed: | Aug 17, 2017 |
Terminated: | Oct 31, 2017 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $100,001 to $500,000 |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Caramel Taxi LLC
25 E 86th St # 9F
New York, NY 10028-0553 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee.
US Dept of Justice Office of the US Trustee One Newark Center Ste 2100
Newark, NJ 07102 |
Docket last updated: 1 minutes ago |
Tuesday, October 31, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
Final Decree
Tue 10/31 1:16 PM
Final Decree; The following parties were served: Trustee and US Trustee. (dmc) |
|
court
Receipt of Case Information - Inter District Transfer
Tue 10/31 1:16 PM
Receipt of Case Information regarding case transferred to Eastern District of New York, Case Number 1745703 (dmc) |
||
utility
Close Bankruptcy Case
Tue 10/31 1:17 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed. (dmc) |
||
Monday, September 25, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request
Mon 09/25 4:52 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by Jay Samuels on behalf of ConnectOne Bank. (Samuels, Jay) |
|
11 | 11
misc
Missing Document(s) Filed
Mon 09/25 9:53 AM
Missing Document(s): Atty Disclosure Statement, Declaration Under Penalty For Non Individual Debtors, List of Equity Security Holders, Statement of Financial Affairs For Non-Individuals, Schedules, Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individuals A/B,D,E/F,G,H, filed by Joseph J. DiPasquale on behalf of Caramel Taxi LLC. (DiPasquale, Joseph) |
|
Friday, September 15, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order
Sat 09/16 12:37 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 09/15/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, September 05, 2017 | ||
utility
Terminate Deadline
Tue 09/05 1:11 PM
incomplete filings Deadline Terminated, Reason: case jointly administered/motion granting order to extend time to file schedules granted (axg) |
||
Monday, August 21, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Joint Administration
Wed 09/13 10:15 AM
Order Granting Motion For Joint Administration Lead Case: 17-26678 Member Cases: 17-26682 17-26684 17-26685 17-26686 17-26687 17-26689 17-26692 17-26693 17-26694 17-26695 17-26696 17-26702 . Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 8/21/2017. (jf) |
|
Sunday, August 20, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
Mon 08/21 12:36 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors. No. of Notices: 26. Notice Date 08/20/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Saturday, August 19, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
court
BNC Certificate of Notice (generic)
Sun 08/20 12:37 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 08/19/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, August 18, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request
Fri 08/18 2:52 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by Fran B. Steele on behalf of U.S. Trustee.. (Steele, Fran) |
|
5 | 5
court
Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11
Fri 08/18 1:07 PM
Meeting of Creditors - Chapter 11. 341(a) meeting to be held on 9/27/2017 at 10:00 AM at Suite 1401, One Newark Center. Proofs of Claim due by 12/26/2017. (sg) |
|
Thursday, August 17, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
court
Notice of Missing Documents
Thu 08/17 1:34 PM
Notice of Missing Documents. . Missing Documents: Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individuals, Statement of Financial Affairs For Non-Individuals, Statement of Your Current Monthly Income(122B), List of Equity Security Holders, Balance Sheet, Tax Return, Cash Flow Statement, Statement of Operations, Schedules A/B,D,E/F,G,H,. Incomplete Filings due by 8/31/2017. (axg) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Joint Administration
Thu 08/17 11:23 AM
Motion for Joint Administration for the following cases: 17-26678 (VFP); 17-26680 (VFP); 17-26682 (VFP); 17-26685 (VFP); 17-26686 (VFP); 17-26687 (VFP); 17-26689 (VFP); 17-26692 (VFP); 17-26693 (VFP); 17-26694 (VFP); 17-26695 (VFP); 17-26696 (VFP); 17-26702 (VFP) Filed by Thomas Michael Walsh on behalf of Caramel Taxi LLC. (Walsh, Thomas) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
2 | 2
utility
Case Assigned
Thu 08/17 10:31 AM
Case Assignment. Judge Vincent Papalia added to the case. (sg) |
|
1 | 1
17
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Thu 08/17 9:47 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Filed by Joseph J. DiPasquale on behalf of Caramel Taxi LLC. Disclosure of Compensation for Attorney For Debtor08/31/2017. List of Equity Security Holders due 08/31/2017. Schedule(s) due 08/31/2017.Statement of Financial Affairs for Non-Individuals due 08/31/2017.Summary of Your Assets and Liabilities for Non Individuals due 08/31/2017. Incomplete Filings due by 08/31/2017. Chapter 11 Debtors Exclusive Right to File a Plan Expires on 12/15/2017. (DiPasquale, Joseph) |
|
crditcrd
Credit Card/Debit Card Receipt
Thu 08/17 11:27 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 17-26684 ) [misc,volp11a] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A34719159, fee amount $ 1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
utility
Remark
Thu 08/17 1:31 PM
Location of principal assets, 301 Sylvan Avenue Englewood Cliffs, NJ 07632. (axg) |