(HC) Ogunbanke v. Apker
California Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Lawrence J O'Neill |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-01085 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus |
Case Filed: | Aug 14, 2017 |
Terminated: | Oct 05, 2017 |
Petitioner
Tayo Olugboyega Ogunbanke
|
|
Respondent
Craig Apker
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Thursday, October 05, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Judgment
Thu 10/05 1:23 PM
JUDGMENT dated *10/5/2017* pursuant to8 order. (Sant Agata, S) |
|
8 | 8
2
pgs
order
Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations
Thu 10/05 1:23 PM
ORDER Adopting4 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS; ORDER DISMISSING Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus; ORDER DIRECTING Clerk of Court to Enter Judgment and CLOSE CASE; No Certificate of Appealability is Required signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 10/5/2017. CASE CLOSED. (Sant Agata, S) |
|
service
Service by Mail
Thu 10/05 1:24 PM
SERVICE BY MAIL:9 Judgment,8 Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations, served on Tayo Olugboyega Ogunbanke. (Sant Agata, S) |
||
Thursday, September 28, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
respoth
Objections to Findings and Recommendations
Fri 09/29 3:55 PM
OBJECTIONS to4 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS by Petitioner Tayo Olugboyega Ogunbanke. (Flores, E) |
|
Thursday, September 14, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Change of Address
Mon 09/18 12:42 PM
NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS to 425 Golden State Avenue, Bakersfield, CA 93301 by Tayo Olugboyega Ogunbanke. (Flores, E) |
|
Thursday, August 31, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Decline of Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge
Fri 09/01 3:00 PM
DECLINE to PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Tayo Olugboyega Ogunbanke. (Marrujo, C) |
|
4 | 4
motion
Findings and Recommendations
Thu 08/31 7:35 AM
ORDER Directing Clerk of Court to Assign District Judge; FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Dismiss Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/28/17. Objections to F&R Due Within Twenty One Days. This case is assigned to Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill and Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. The new case number is 1:17-cv-01085-LJO-JLT (HC). (Marrujo, C) |
|
service
Service by Mail
Thu 08/31 7:36 AM
SERVICE BY MAIL:4 Findings and Recommendations (Motion), served on Tayo Olugboyega Ogunbanke. (Marrujo, C) |
||
Thursday, August 17, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
order
Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider
Thu 08/17 9:47 AM
PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 9/21/2017. (Marrujo, C) |
|
Att: 1 Order re Consent | ||
2 | 2
order
05 - HC/Order Authorizing IFP
Thu 08/17 9:47 AM
ORDER AUTHORIZING IN FORMA PAUPERIS STATUS as to Tayo Ogunbanke, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/17/17. (Marrujo, C) |
|
service
Service by Mail
Thu 08/17 9:48 AM
SERVICE BY MAIL:3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider,2 Order Authorizing IFP Status served on Tayo Olugboyega Ogunbanke. (Marrujo, C) |
||
Monday, August 14, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Thu 08/17 9:45 AM
(2241) PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS against Craig Apker by Tayo Olugboyega Ogunbanke. (Marrujo, C) |