Campagna v. Bradstreet & Associates, LLC et al
Minnesota District Court | |
Judge: | Richard H Kyle |
Referred: | Steven E Rau |
Case #: | 0:14-cv-00115 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act |
Case Filed: | Jan 10, 2014 |
Terminated: | Feb 06, 2014 |
Last checked: Saturday Dec 06, 2014 7:29 AM CST |
Defendant
Justin Balfany
|
|
Defendant
Bradstreet & Associates, LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Jasmine Campagna
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Wednesday, February 05, 2014 | ||
6 | 6 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR-DUPLICATE FILING. NOTICE by Jasmine Campagna of Dismissal under Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i. (Bland, David) Modified text on 2/5/2014 (lmb). (Entered: 02/05/2014) | |
5 | 5 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL by Jasmine Campagna Under Rule 31(a)(1)(A)(i). (Bland, David) Modified text on 2/5/2014 (lmb). | |
Tuesday, January 14, 2014 | ||
4 | 4 ORDER regarding Judge Richard H. Kyle's dispositive motion procedure. Signed by Judge Richard H. Kyle on 01/14/14. (KLL) Modified text on 1/14/2014 (lmb). | |
Friday, January 10, 2014 | ||
3 | 3 Summons Issued as to Justin Balfany, Bradstreet & Associates, LLC. (lmb) | |
2 | 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Richard H. Kyle per Master List referred to Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau. Please use case number 14-cv-00115 (RHK/SER). (lmb) | |
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against Justin Balfany, Bradstreet & Associate, LLC. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0864-3828011.) Filed by Jasmine Campagna. Filer requests summons issued.. (Bland, David) Modified text on 1/10/2014 (lmb). | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |