Zean et al v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Minnesota District Court | |
Judge: | Nancy E Brasel |
Referred: | Hildy Bowbeer |
Case #: | 0:17-cv-03817 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act |
Case Filed: | Aug 18, 2017 |
Terminated: | Feb 12, 2019 |
Last checked: Wednesday Feb 14, 2018 2:35 AM CST |
Defendant
Equifax Information Services, LLC,
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Trans Union, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Eunice Zean
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Samuel Zean
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Tuesday, February 12, 2019 | ||
168 | 168
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Tue 02/12 4:46 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Nancy E. Brasel on 2/12/2019. (KMW) |
|
Monday, February 11, 2019 | ||
167 | 167
misc
Proposed Order to Judge re Stipulation
Mon 02/11 2:43 PM
PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re166 Stipulation of Dismissal. (Savran, Jessica) |
|
166 | 166
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Mon 02/11 2:42 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Jointly Signed by Samuel Zean and Eunice Zean. (Savran, Jessica) |