Lauve et al v. Winfrey et al
Michigan Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Mark A Goldsmith |
Referred: | Mona K Majzoub |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-12726 |
Nature of Suit | 950 Other Statutes - Constitutionality of State Statutes |
Cause | 28:2201 Constitutionality of State Statute(s) |
Case Filed: | Aug 20, 2017 |
Terminated: | Feb 19, 2020 |
Last checked: Friday Feb 16, 2018 4:08 AM EST |
Defendant
Daniel Baxter
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Detroit City Council
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Janice Winfrey
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Davis
180 Eason
Highland Park, MI 48203 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Lauve
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Movant
Lucinda Darrah
Terminated: 12/06/2017
492 Peterboro
Detroit, MI 48201 |
1. | Pair files lawsuit against Detroit's City Clerk in an effort to reverse Detroit arena funding (detroitnews.com) |
Submitted Mon 08/21/2017 | |