Pennant v. Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Sidney H Stein |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-06305 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1981 Equal Rights Under the Law |
Case Filed: | Aug 20, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 19, 2017 |
Last checked: Friday Feb 16, 2018 4:00 AM EST |
Defendant
Narendra Patel
|
|
Defendant
Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
John and Hane Doe 1 through 20
|
|
Defendant
John and Jane Doe 1 through 20
|
|
Plaintiff
Delroy Pennant
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, September 19, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
order
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - Signed
Tue 09/19 4:46 PM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL: HEREBY NOTICE IS GIVEN that the above-captioned action is dismissed in its entirety, with prejudice, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 9/19/2017) (ama) |
|
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Tue 09/19 4:06 PM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, WITH prejudice against the defendant(s) John and Hane Doe 1 through 20, John and Jane Doe 1 through 20, Narendra Patel, Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.. Document filed by Delroy Pennant. (Stancati, Joseph) |
|
12 | 12
2
pgs
order
Order
Tue 09/19 2:55 PM
ORDER: The Court accordingly declines to sign the proposed order of dismissal. If the parties wish to preserve the Court's ancillary jurisdiction to enforce a settlement, they may submit a stipulation of dismissal to that effect signed by counsel for all parties pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). "Absent such action, however, enforcement of the settlement agreement is for state courts." Kokkonen v. Guardian Life Ins. Co., 511 U.S. 375, 382 (1994). In the alternative, plaintiff remains free to unilaterally file an unconditional notice of dismissal pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i). The initial pretrial conference in this action shall occur on October 25, 2017 at 2:30 pm (Doc. 9) unless a proper stipulation of dismissal is filed prior to October 25. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 9/19/2017) (ama) Modified on 9/19/2017 (ama) |
|
Friday, September 15, 2017 | ||
misc
Note to Attorney to E-Mail PDF
Fri 09/15 4:19 PM
***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO E-MAIL PDF. Note to Attorney Joseph Stancati for noncompliance with Section 18.3 of the S.D.N.Y. Electronic Case Filing Rules & Instructions. E-MAIL the PDF for Document 11 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, to: judgments@nysd.uscourts.gov. (tro) |
||
Wednesday, September 13, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Wed 09/13 4:15 PM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, WITH prejudice against the defendant(s) John and Hane Doe 1 through 20, John and Jane Doe 1 through 20, Narendra Patel, Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.. Document filed by Delroy Pennant. (Stancati, Joseph) |
|
Monday, September 11, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
service
Affidavit of Service Complaints
Mon 09/11 9:02 AM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. served on 8/30/2017, answer due 9/20/2017. Service was accepted by Mayra Vasquez, Administrative Assistant. Document filed by Delroy Pennant. (Stancati, Joseph) |
|
Tuesday, September 05, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
1
pgs
order
Order for Initial Pretrial Conference
Tue 09/05 10:49 AM
ORDER SCHEDULING INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 10/25/2017 at 2:30 PM in Courtroom 23A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Sidney H. Stein, and as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 9/1/2017) (ap) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Hearings
Wed 10/04 12:48 PM
Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Conference set for 11/16/2017 at 2:30 PM in Courtroom 23A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Sidney H. Stein. (ap) |
||
Wednesday, August 30, 2017 | ||
notice
Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment
Wed 08/30 10:51 AM
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Sidney H. Stein. Judge Analisa Torres is no longer assigned to the case. (bcu) |
||
Friday, August 25, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued
Fri 08/25 12:55 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.. (laq) |
|
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification
Fri 08/25 12:58 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Joseph Michael Stancati. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: John and Jane Does 1-20 and JOHN AND JANE DOES 1 THROUGH 20. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party text was omitted; party text contained a typographical error. (laq) |
||
Tuesday, August 22, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Tue 08/22 1:47 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Delroy Pennant. (Stancati, Joseph) |
|
utility
Add Party for Pleading
Tue 08/22 1:11 PM
ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Defendants/Respondents JOHN and JANE DOE 1 through 20 added. Party added pursuant to1 Complaint.Document filed by Delroy Pennant. Related document:1 Complaint.(Stancati, Joseph) |
||
Monday, August 21, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order for Initial Pretrial Conference
Mon 08/21 5:22 PM
INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Initial Conference set for 10/25/2017 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 15D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Analisa Torres. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 8/21/2017) (cf) |
|
5 | 5
order
Order
Mon 08/21 5:21 PM
ORDER: To conserve resources, to promote judicial efficiency, and in an effort to achieve a faster disposition of this matter, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties discuss whether they are willing to consent, under 28 U.S.C. § 636(c), to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge. If any party does not consent to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge, the parties must file a joint letter, by October 20, 2017, advising the Court that the parties do not consent, but without disclosing the identity of the party or parties who do not consent. The parties are free to withhold consent without negative consequences. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 8/21/2017) (cf) |
|
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Pleading
Mon 08/21 3:23 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Joseph Michael Stancati re: Document No. 1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF. PLEASE ENTER PARTY JOHN and JANEDOE 1 through 20 WITH PARTY TEXT "IN THEIR OFFICIAL CAPACITIES" Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents. (kl) |
||
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Mon 08/21 3:24 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Analisa Torres. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php] . (kl) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Mon 08/21 3:25 PM
Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php] . (kl) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Mon 08/21 3:25 PM
Case Designated ECF. (kl) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Request for Issuance of Summons
Mon 08/21 3:26 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Joseph Michael Stancati to RE-FILE Document No. 3 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): PLEASE FILL OUT THE ATTORNEY ADDRESS/INFORMATION FIELD ON THE SUMMONS REQUEST. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (kl) |
||
Sunday, August 20, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Change of Address
Sun 08/20 3:59 PM
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Joseph Michael Stancati on behalf of Delroy Pennant. New Address: Law Office of Joe Stancati, 305 Broadway, 9th Floor, New York, NY, U.S.A. 10007, 212-822-1456. (Stancati, Joseph) |
|
3 | 3
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Sun 08/20 3:36 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Delroy Pennant. (Stancati, Joseph) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Sun 08/20 3:31 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Stancati, Joseph) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Sun 08/20 3:30 PM
COMPLAINT against John and Jane Doe #1-20, Narendra Patel, Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-14034456)Document filed by Delroy Pennant.(Stancati, Joseph) |