Booker et al v. 3M Company et al
Minnesota District Court | |
Judge: | Joan N Ericksen |
Referred: | David T Schultz |
Case #: | 0:17-cv-03845 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332-pip-Diversity-Personal Injury, Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Aug 21, 2017 |
Re-opened: | Nov 16, 2021 |
Last checked: Saturday Feb 17, 2018 3:15 AM CST |
Defendant
3M Company
|
|
Defendant
Arizant Healthcare, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Darrell Booker
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Yvonnda Booker
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Wednesday, November 16, 2022 | ||
18 | 18
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Substitute Party
Wed 11/16 6:45 PM
ORDER granting14 Motion to Substitute Party. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 11/16/2022. (TJB) |
|
Wednesday, November 09, 2022 | ||
17 | 17
respm
Proposed Order to Judge re Motion
Wed 11/09 10:17 AM
PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re14 MOTION to Substitute Party filed by Darrell Booker, Yvonnda Booker.(Webb, Seth) |
|
16 | 16
misc
Meet and Confer Statement
Wed 11/09 10:16 AM
MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re14 Motion to Substitute Party filed by Darrell Booker, Yvonnda Booker.(Webb, Seth) |
|
15 | 15
respm
Exhibit (Motions and Related Filings)
Wed 11/09 10:15 AM
EXHIBIT Exhibit 1 re14 MOTION to Substitute Party filed by Darrell Booker, Yvonnda Booker.(Webb, Seth) |
|
14 | 14
motion
Substitute Party
Wed 11/09 10:14 AM
MOTION to Substitute Party filed by Darrell Booker, Yvonnda Booker. (Webb, Seth) |
|
Thursday, August 11, 2022 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Proposed Order to Judge re Stipulation
Thu 08/11 4:32 PM
PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re12 Stipulation. (Webb, Seth) |
|
12 | 12
misc
Stipulation
Thu 08/11 4:31 PM
STIPULATION Amended by Darrell Booker, Yvonnda Booker. (Webb, Seth) |
|
11 | 11
1
pgs
order
Order on Stipulation
Thu 08/11 9:42 AM
ORDER on9 Stipulation. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 8/11/2022.(TJB) |
|
Wednesday, August 10, 2022 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Proposed Order to Judge re Stipulation
Wed 08/10 11:10 AM
PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re9 Stipulation. (Webb, Seth) |
|
9 | 9
misc
Stipulation
Wed 08/10 11:10 AM
STIPULATION by Darrell Booker, Yvonnda Booker. (Webb, Seth) |
|
Monday, May 16, 2022 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Suggestion of Death
Mon 05/16 11:24 AM
SUGGESTION OF DEATH Upon the Record by Darrell Booker, Yvonnda Booker. (Webb, Seth) |
|
Wednesday, August 07, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
order
Judgment (Clerk's Office Only)
Wed 08/07 1:20 PM
JUDGMENT(lmb) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Notice - appeal | ||
Thursday, August 09, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice to Attorney - FLN Case Reassigned
Thu 08/09 8:33 AM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Due to the retirement of Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel, this case is reassigned to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel no longer assigned to the case. NOTE: the new case number is 17-cv-03845-JNE-DTS . Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. (JAT) |
|
Monday, August 21, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 08/21 2:00 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY. COUNSEL PLEASE NOTE: This docket contains pleadings and orders pertaining to this case only and some, but not all, orders from the master case file In re: Bair Hugger Forced Air Warming Devices Products Liability Litigation, 0:15-md-2666 (JNE/FLN). Counsel shall read and comply with all Pretrial Orders filed in this master case. Pleadings filed and orders issued in the master case may be accessed through the master docket sheet at 0:15-md-2666-JNE-FLN. Additionally, access to Pretrial Orders, minutes, transcripts, and other documents issued in the master case may be found on the Bair Hugger MDL website at:[LINK:www.mnd.uscourts.gov/MDL-Bair-Hugger/index.shtml] .(lmb) |
|
4 | 4
order
Pretrial Order
Mon 08/21 2:00 PM
PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 1: Establishing Procedures. Signed by Judge Joan N. Ericksen on 1/13/2016. (lmb) |
|
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Mon 08/21 1:59 PM
Summons Issued as to 3M Company, Arizant Healthcare, Inc. (lmb) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Initial Case Assignment
Mon 08/21 1:59 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Joan N. Ericksen per MDL List and referred to Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel. Please use case number 17-cv-3845 (JNE/FLN). (lmb) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 08/21 12:28 PM
COMPLAINT against 3M Company, Arizant Healthcare, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AMNDC-5677639.) filed by Darrell Booker, Yvonnda Booker. Filer requests summons issued. (Webb, Seth) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |