PRITCHARD v. SECOND ROUND SUB, LLC et al
New Jersey District Court | |
Judge: | Michael A Hammer |
Referred: | Michael A Hammer |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-06334 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act |
Case Filed: | Aug 22, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 01, 2021 |
Last checked: Sunday Feb 18, 2018 4:15 AM EST |
Defendant
JOHN DOES 1 to 10
|
|
Defendant
SECOND ROUND SUB, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
SECOND ROUND, LP
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
LARRY VASBINDER
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
LISA A PRITCHARD
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Thursday, April 01, 2021 | ||
47 | 47
7
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Certify Class
Thu 04/01 1:17 PM
ORDER granting43 Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement Agreement; This action against the Defendants is dismissed with prejudice, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 4/1/2021. (ams, ) |
|
utility
Terminate Civil Case
Thu 04/01 1:19 PM
***Civil Case Terminated pursuant to47 Order. (ams, ) |
||
minutes
Settlement Conference
Thu 04/01 8:23 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer: Final Approval Hearing held on 4/1/2021. (ECR) (jqb, ) |
||
Wednesday, March 31, 2021 | ||
46 | 46
order
Order
Wed 03/31 1:54 PM
TEXT ORDER: Tomorrow's Final Approval Hearing will be held at 11:00 a.m. via zoom. The Court will provide the parties with a new zoom invite via email. Please mark your calendar accordingly. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 3/31/2021. (jqb, ) |
|
Monday, March 15, 2021 | ||
45 | 45
respm
Response in Support of Motion
Mon 03/15 3:10 PM
RESPONSE in Support filed by SECOND ROUND SUB, LLC, SECOND ROUND, LP re43 MOTION to Certify Class and for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and for Attorney's Fees and Costs (DIMURO, DANIEL) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D | ||
Friday, February 19, 2021 | ||
44 | 44
order
Order
Fri 02/19 11:08 AM
TEXT ORDER: The Final Fairness Hearing will be held on 4/1/2021 at 10:00 a.m. via zoom. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 2/19/2021. (jqb, ) |
|
Monday, February 08, 2021 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Mon 02/08 4:20 PM
Set Deadlines as to43 MOTION to Certify Class and for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and for Attorney's Fees and Costs . Motion set for 3/15/2021 before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (JB, ) |
||
Friday, February 05, 2021 | ||
43 | 43
2
pgs
motion
Certify Class
Sat 02/06 12:02 AM
MOTION to Certify Class and for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and for Attorney's Fees and Costs by LISA A PRITCHARD.(KIM, YONGMOON) |
|
Att: 1 35 pgs Brief, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration of Yongmoon Kim, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 7 Declaration of Jeffrey Pirrung, | ||
Att: 8 Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 9 Certificate of Service | ||
Friday, October 23, 2020 | ||
42 | 42
11
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Certify Class
Fri 10/23 10:55 AM
ORDER granting41 Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 10/23/2020. (ams, ) |
|
42 | 42
11
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Certify Class
Fri 10/23 10:55 AM
ORDER granting41 Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 10/23/2020. (ams, ) |
|
Wednesday, October 07, 2020 | ||
41 | 41
2
pgs
motion
Certify Class
Wed 10/07 9:56 PM
MOTION to Certify Class and Grant Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement by LISA A PRITCHARD.(KIM, YONGMOON) |
|
Att: 1 Brief, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration of Yongmoon Kim, | ||
Att: 3 11 pgs Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 4 Certificate of Service | ||
utility
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Wed 10/07 11:23 PM
Set Deadlines as to41 MOTION to Certify Class and Grant Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement . Motion set for 11/2/2020 before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (lag, ) |
||
Thursday, October 01, 2020 | ||
40 | 40
1
pgs
order
Order
Thu 10/01 2:26 PM
ORDER granting39 Letter requesting a one-week extension to file Plaintiff's motion for preliminary approval. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 10/1/2020. (ams, ) |
|
Wednesday, September 30, 2020 | ||
39 | 39
misc
Letter
Wed 09/30 3:38 PM
Letter from Plaintiff re 38 Order. (KIM, YONGMOON) |
|
Thursday, August 20, 2020 | ||
38 | 38
order
Order
Thu 08/20 9:27 AM
TEXT ORDER: Plaintiff's motion for preliminary approval of the class action settlement shall be filed by September 30, 2020. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 8/20/2020. (TAD) |
|
Wednesday, August 19, 2020 | ||
37 | 37
misc
Letter
Wed 08/19 3:59 PM
Letter from Ronald A. Giller. (GILLER, RONALD) |
|
Thursday, April 09, 2020 | ||
36 | 36
misc
Status Report
Thu 04/09 5:28 PM
STATUS REPORT by SECOND ROUND SUB, LLC, SECOND ROUND, LP. (GILLER, RONALD) |
|
Friday, February 21, 2020 | ||
35 | 35
order
Order
Fri 02/21 5:26 PM
TEXT ORDER: The Court has reviewed the parties' February 19, 2020 report [D.E. 34]. By April 9, 2020, the parties will file either (1) a motion for preliminary approval of the settlement, or (2) a status report on this matter. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 2/21/2020. (MAH) |
|
Wednesday, February 19, 2020 | ||
34 | 34
misc
Status Report
Wed 02/19 4:56 PM
STATUS REPORT by SECOND ROUND SUB, LLC, SECOND ROUND, LP. (DIMURO, DANIEL) |
|
Tuesday, February 11, 2020 | ||
33 | 33
order
Order
Tue 02/11 5:36 PM
TEXT ORDER: The parties are directed to file a joint status report by February 19, 2020. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 2/11/2020. (TAD) |
|
Monday, August 19, 2019 | ||
32 | 32
misc
Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge
Mon 08/19 3:56 PM
CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by LISA A PRITCHARD, SECOND ROUND SUB, LLC, SECOND ROUND, LP. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. (dam, ) |
|
Wednesday, July 31, 2019 | ||
31 | 31
misc
Letter
Wed 07/31 4:09 PM
Letter from Plaintiff enclosing Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge. (KIM, YONGMOON) |
|
Tuesday, July 30, 2019 | ||
30 | 30
misc
Status Report
Tue 07/30 11:30 AM
STATUS REPORT by SECOND ROUND SUB, LLC, SECOND ROUND, LP. (GILLER, RONALD) |
|
Friday, June 14, 2019 | ||
29 | 29
1
pgs
order
Order
Fri 06/14 12:05 PM
ORDER re28 Status Report; *Report back within 45 days. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 6/13/2019. (sms) |
|
Wednesday, June 12, 2019 | ||
28 | 28
misc
Status Report
Wed 06/12 3:34 PM
STATUS REPORT by SECOND ROUND SUB, LLC, SECOND ROUND, LP. (GILLER, RONALD) |
|
Wednesday, May 22, 2019 | ||
27 | 27
order
Order
Wed 05/22 4:13 PM
TEXT ORDER directing the parties to submit a joint status letter by June 12, 2019. So Ordered by Judge Kevin McNulty on 5/22/19. (nic, ) |
|
Thursday, January 24, 2019 | ||
26 | 26
order
Order
Thu 01/24 12:20 PM
TEXT ORDER: In light of plaintiff's letter25 , the settlement conference set for 1/28/2019 is cancelled without a new date. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 1/24/2019. (jqb, ) |
|
Monday, January 21, 2019 | ||
25 | 25
misc
Letter
Mon 01/21 3:50 PM
Letter from the Parties re: settlement. (KIM, YONGMOON) |
|
Monday, January 07, 2019 | ||
24 | 24
1
pgs
order
Order
Mon 01/07 1:26 PM
ORDER granting23 Plaintiff's Letter requesting that the deadline to raise written discovery disputes be extended to 1/31/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 1/2/2019. (dam, ) |
|
Friday, December 28, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
misc
Letter
Fri 12/28 1:45 PM
Letter from the Parties re19 Scheduling Order,. (KIM, YONGMOON) |
|
Thursday, November 29, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
order
Order
Thu 11/29 10:06 AM
TEXT ORDER: The settlement conference set for December 7, 2018 is adjourned to January 28, 2019 at 11:00 a.m. Clients must appear in person, with no exceptions. Any scheduling conflict shall be brought to the Courts attention by December 7, 2018. Each party may submit a confidential settlement memorandum, limited to five pages, on or before January 24, 2019. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 11/29/18. (TAD) |
|
Thursday, October 25, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
order
Stipulation and Order
Thu 10/25 11:49 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal without prejudice as to Defendant LARRY VASBINDER. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 10/24/2018. (tf, ) |
|
Tuesday, October 23, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Tue 10/23 8:59 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal without prejudice only as to Defendant Larry Vasbinder by LISA A PRITCHARD. (KIM, YONGMOON) |
|
19 | 19
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 10/23 5:25 PM
AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: In-Person Settlement Conference set for 12/7/2018 11:00 AM before Judge Kevin McNulty. Amended Pleadings due by 11/30/2018. Joinder of Parties due by 11/30/2018. Written Discovery due by 12/31/2018. ETC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 10/22/2018. (dam, ) |
|
minutes
Status Conference
Thu 10/25 4:16 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer: Telephone Status Conference held on 10/23/2018. (jqb, ) |
||
Thursday, October 18, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Substitution of Attorney
Thu 10/18 6:46 PM
Substitution of Attorney - Attorney THOMAS R. DOMINCZYK terminated.. (GILLER, RONALD) |
|
17 | 17
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 10/18 6:11 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by RONALD A. GILLER on behalf of SECOND ROUND SUB, LLC, SECOND ROUND, LP, LARRY VASBINDER (GILLER, RONALD) |
|
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 10/18 6:02 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by DANIEL JASON DIMURO on behalf of SECOND ROUND SUB, LLC, SECOND ROUND, LP, LARRY VASBINDER (DIMURO, DANIEL) |
|
Tuesday, September 25, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 09/25 1:13 PM
NOTICE by LISA A PRITCHARD Withdrawing Eva M. Pitts as counsel for Plaintiff (PITTS, EVA) |
|
Monday, July 23, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
order
Order ~Util - Set Hearings
Mon 07/23 3:14 PM
TEXT ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 10/23/2018 at 12:00 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 7/23/2018. (jqb, ) |
|
minutes
Status Conference
Mon 07/23 3:12 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer: Telephone Status Conference held on 7/23/2018. (jqb, ) |
||
Monday, June 11, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 06/12 9:38 AM
PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: A Telephone Conference is set for 7/23/2018 at 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. Amended Pleadings due by 10/31/2018. Fact Discovery due by 12/31/2018. Joinder of Parties due by 10/31/2018, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 6/11/18. (cm, ) |
|
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 06/11 2:42 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by EVA M. PITTS on behalf of All Plaintiffs (PITTS, EVA) |
|
minutes
Status Conference
Tue 06/12 11:36 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer: Telephone Status Conference held on 6/11/2018. (jqb, ) |
||
Thursday, April 26, 2018 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Hearings
Thu 04/26 12:51 PM
Reset Hearing: The Telephone Status Conference set for 5/1/2018 is adjourned to 6/11/2018 at 2:00 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. (jqb, ) |
||
Tuesday, April 10, 2018 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Hearings
Tue 04/10 5:45 PM
Reset Hearing: The Telephone Status Conference set for 4/16/2018 is adjourned to 5/1/2018 at 2:00 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. (jqb, ) |
||
Friday, March 09, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
order
Discovery Confidentiality Order
Fri 03/09 2:22 PM
Discovery Confidentiality Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 3/9/18. (sr, ) |
|
Thursday, March 08, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Affidavit
Thu 03/08 1:30 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Thomas R. Dominczyk Certification in support of discovery confidentiality order by SECOND ROUND SUB, LLC, SECOND ROUND, LP, LARRY VASBINDER.(DOMINCZYK, THOMAS) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, March 06, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order
Tue 03/06 11:37 AM
TEXT ORDER: There will be a telephone status conference in this matter on April 16, 2018, at 2:00 p.m. Plaintiff's counsel will kindly initiate the conference call. The parties will update the Court on their efforts to resolve this matter and, if necessary, be prepared to address scheduling deadlines. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 3/6/2018. (MAH) |
|
minutes
Scheduling Conference
Tue 03/06 1:39 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer: Scheduling Conference held on 3/6/2018. (jqb, ) |
||
Friday, March 02, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
discov
Joint Discovery Plan
Fri 03/02 1:01 PM
Joint Discovery Plan by LISA A PRITCHARD.(KIM, YONGMOON) |
|
Thursday, March 01, 2018 | ||
utility
Remark (public)
Thu 03/01 12:30 PM
Remark: The parties must electronically file a joint discovery plan by 3:00 p.m. on 3/2/2018. (jqb, ) |
||
Tuesday, January 23, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
6
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Hearings
Tue 01/23 4:18 PM
LETTER ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 3/6/2018 at 10:00 a.m. in Newark - Courtroom 2C before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 1/23/2018. (jqb, ) |
|
Friday, December 15, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 12/15 3:54 PM
Amended ANSWER to Complaint by SECOND ROUND SUB, LLC, SECOND ROUND, LP, LARRY VASBINDER.(DOMINCZYK, THOMAS) |
|
Monday, November 27, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 11/27 3:04 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by SECOND ROUND SUB, LLC, SECOND ROUND, LP, LARRY VASBINDER.(DOMINCZYK, THOMAS) |
|
Friday, November 03, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
order
Stipulation and Order
Fri 11/03 10:42 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER extending time for defendants to respond to the Complaint until 11/27/17. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 11/3/17. (sr, ) |
|
utility
Update Answer Due Deadline
Fri 11/03 10:43 AM
Answer Due Deadline Update - RE:4 Stipulation and Order as to deft, LARRY VASBINDER, SECOND ROUND, LP, SECOND ROUND SUB, LLC. The answer due date has been set for 11/27/17. (sr, ) |
||
Monday, October 23, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Stipulation
Mon 10/23 12:06 PM
STIPULATION re1 Complaint, Extending Time to Answer by SECOND ROUND SUB, LLC, SECOND ROUND, LP, LARRY VASBINDER. (DOMINCZYK, THOMAS) |
|
Thursday, August 24, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Thu 08/24 3:13 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to SECOND ROUND SUB, LLC, SECOND ROUND, LP, LARRY VASBINDER Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Issued By *Susan Miller* (sm, ) |
|
Tuesday, August 22, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 08/22 11:05 PM
COMPLAINT against JOHN DOES 1 to 10, SECOND ROUND SUB, LLC, SECOND ROUND, LP, LARRY VASBINDER ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-8042352) with JURY DEMAND, filed by LISA A PRITCHARD.(KIM, YONGMOON) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Wed 08/23 2:13 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Kevin McNulty and Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. (ak, ) |