HSBC Bank USA, National Association v. McKoy et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Robert W Sweet |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-06340 |
Nature of Suit | 370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question |
Case Filed: | Aug 21, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 20, 2017 |
Last checked: Saturday Feb 17, 2018 3:38 AM EST |
Defendant
Crystal Broadus
|
|
Defendant
Capital One Bank (USA) NA
|
|
Defendant
Criminal Court of the City of New York
|
|
Defendant
Yvette Jeffers
|
|
Defendant
James N. McKoy
3237 Tenbroeck Avenue
Bronx, NY 10469 |
|
Defendant
Mortgage Electronic Registrations Systems, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
NYC Parking Violations Bureau
|
|
Defendant
New Century Financial Services, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
New York City Environmenttal Control Board
|
|
Defendant
Jane Smith
|
|
Plaintiff
HSBC Bank USA, National Association
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, September 20, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
8
pgs
order
Order
Wed 09/20 2:19 PM
ORDER: The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order to McKoy, noting service on the docket. The Court remands this action to the New York State Supreme Court, Bronx County. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order to the New York Bronx Supreme Court, Bronx County, at the following address: 851 Grand Concourse, Bronx, NY 10451. The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 9/20/2017) (js) Modified on 9/20/2017 (js) |
|
misc
Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk
Wed 09/20 2:21 PM
Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk. Transmitted re:11 Order,,, to the Docket Assistant Clerk for case processing. (js) |
||
misc
Mail Order by Certified Mail
Wed 09/20 4:39 PM
Mailed a copy of11 Order to James N. McKoy, 3237 Tenbroeck Avenue, Bronx, NY 10469. (rro) |
||
transfer
Case Remanded Out - State Court
Thu 09/21 9:11 AM
CASE REMANDED OUT from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the State Court - Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Bronx. Sent certified copy of docket entries, remand order and copy of notice of removal. Mailed via UPS Tracking Number 1Z E22 E53 22 1002 385 0 on 9/21/2017. (js) |
||
Thursday, August 24, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
service
Affidavit of Service Other
Mon 08/28 1:34 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of NOTICE OF MOTION FOR REMOVAL UNDER 28 U.S.C. & 1441(a) & 1446 served on GERALD LEONESCU, Esq. on 8/22/2017. Service was accepted by GERALD SHEIOWITZ, Esq. Document filed by James N. McKoy. (vn) |
|
8 | 8
service
Affidavit of Service Other
Mon 08/28 1:25 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of NOTICE OF MOTION FOR REMOVAL UNDER 28 U.S.C. & 1441(a) & 1446 served on LEOPOLD & ASSOCIATES, PLLC, benamin Casolaro, Esq. on 8/22/2017. Service was accepted by JOSETTE MINNITI. Document filed by James N. McKoy. (vn) |
|
7 | 7
service
Affidavit of Service Other
Mon 08/28 1:14 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of NOTICE OF MOTION FOR REMOVAL UNDER 28 U.S.C. & 1441(a) & 1446 served on NYC ENVIRONMENTAL CONTROL BOARD on 8/23/2017. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by James N. McKoy. (vn) |
|
6 | 6
service
Affidavit of Service Other
Mon 08/28 12:48 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of NOTICE OF MOTION FOR REMOVAL UNDER 28 U.S.C. & 1441 (a) & 1446 served on CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) NA on 8/23/2017. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by James N. McKoy. (vn) |
|
5 | 5
service
Affidavit of Service Other
Mon 08/28 12:27 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of NOTICE OF MOTION FOR REMOVAL UNDER 28 U.S.C. & 1441(a) & 1446 served on NYC TRANSIT ADJUDICATION BUREAU on 8/23/2017. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by James N. McKoy. (vn) Modified on 8/28/2017 (vn) |
|
4 | 4
service
Affidavit of Service Other
Mon 08/28 12:14 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of NOTICE OF MOTION FOR REMOVAL UNDER 28 U.S.C. & 1441(a) & 1446 served on CRIMINAL COURT OF THE CITY OF NEW YORK on 8/23/2017. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by James N. McKoy. (vn) Modified on 8/28/2017 (vn) |
|
3 | 3
service
Affidavit of Service Other
Mon 08/28 11:30 AM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of NOTICE OF MOTION FOR REMOVAL UNDER 28 U.S.C. 1441 (a) & 1446 served on NYC PARKING VIOLATIONS BUREAU on August 23, 2017. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by James N. McKoy. (vn) |
|
Wednesday, August 23, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
service
Affidavit of Service Other
Mon 08/28 1:38 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of NOTICE OF MOTION FOR REMOVAL UNDER 28 U.S.C. & 1441(a) & 1446 served on MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATIONS SYSTEMS, INC. on 8/23/2017. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by James N. McKoy. (vn) |
|
Monday, August 21, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Tue 08/22 4:45 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court for the State of New York, County of Bronx. Case Number: 381635/2008. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 465407014827).Document filed by James N. McKoy.(rch) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A | ||
utility
Case Designation
Tue 08/22 4:50 PM
Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php] . (rch) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Tue 08/22 4:51 PM
Case Designated ECF. (rch) |