Readd et al v. 3M Company et al
Minnesota District Court | |
Judge: | Joan N Ericksen |
Referred: | David T Schultz |
Case #: | 0:17-cv-03875 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332-pip-Diversity-Personal Injury, Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Aug 22, 2017 |
Last checked: Sunday Feb 18, 2018 3:15 AM CST |
Defendant
3M Company
|
|
Defendant
Arizant Healthcare, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Elizabeth Readd
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ronald Readd
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Tuesday, August 06, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
order
Judgment (Clerk's Office Only)
Tue 08/06 12:15 PM
JUDGMENT(kt) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Notice - appeal | ||
Thursday, August 09, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice to Attorney - FLN Case Reassigned
Thu 08/09 9:03 AM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Due to the retirement of Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel, this case is reassigned to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel no longer assigned to the case. NOTE: the new case number is 17-cv-03875-JNE-DTS . Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. (JAT) |
|
Tuesday, August 22, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 08/22 3:04 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY. COUNSEL PLEASE NOTE: This docket contains pleadings and orders pertaining to this case only and some, but not all, orders from the master case file In re: Bair Hugger Forced Air Warming Devices Products Liability Litigation, 0:15-md-2666 (JNE/FLN). Counsel shall read and comply with all Pretrial Orders filed in this master case. Pleadings filed and orders issued in the master case may be accessed through the master docket sheet at 0:15-md-2666-JNE-FLN. Additionally, access to Pretrial Orders, minutes, transcripts, and other documents issued in the master case may be found on the Bair Hugger MDL website at:[LINK:www.mnd.uscourts.gov/MDL-Bair-Hugger/index.shtml] .(lmb) |
|
4 | 4
order
Pretrial Order
Tue 08/22 3:04 PM
PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 1: Establishing Procedures. Signed by Judge Joan N. Ericksen on 1/13/2016. (lmb) |
|
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Tue 08/22 3:03 PM
Summons Issued as to 3M Company, Arizant Healthcare, Inc. (lmb) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Initial Case Assignment
Tue 08/22 3:03 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Joan N. Ericksen per MDL List and referred to Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel. Please use case number 17-cv-3875 (JNE/FLN). (lmb) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 08/22 12:43 PM
COMPLAINT against 3M Company, Arizant Healthcare, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AMNDC-5680106.) filed by Elizabeth Readd, Ronald Readd. Filer requests summons issued. (Webb, Seth) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |