Brown v. Maricopa, County of et al
Arizona District Court | |
Judge: | Diane J Humetewa |
Referred: | Eileen S Willett |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02824 |
Nature of Suit | 555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Aug 21, 2017 |
Terminated: | Oct 15, 2018 |
Defendant
Maricopa, County of
|
|
Defendant
Paul Penzone
|
|
Plaintiff
McKinley Truein Brown III
|
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM MST |
Tuesday, October 30, 2018 | ||
31 | 31
misc
Filing Fee Received
Tue 10/30 1:44 PM
Filing fee: $ 323.00, receipt number PHX202053. Paid in full. (SLQ) |
|
Monday, October 15, 2018 | ||
30 | 30
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Mon 10/15 10:46 AM
ORDER approving the28 Stipulation and dismissing this action in its entirety, with prejudice, each party to bear its own attorneys' fees and costs. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED directing the Clerk of Court to terminate this action. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 10/15/2018. (LFIG) |
|
Wednesday, September 05, 2018 | ||
29 | 29
misc
Additional Attachments to Main Document
Wed 09/05 8:36 AM
Additional Attachments to Main Document re:28 Stipulation of Dismissal Proposed Order by Defendant Maricopa, County of. (Kiefer, Joseph) |
|
Tuesday, September 04, 2018 | ||
28 | 28
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Tue 09/04 4:50 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Maricopa, County of. (Kiefer, Joseph) |
|
Tuesday, August 14, 2018 | ||
27 | 27
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Continue
Tue 08/14 10:40 AM
ORDER: IT IS ORDERED granting the Motion to Continue Dispositive Motion Deadline26 and extending the dispositive motion deadline to September 27, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett on 8/14/2018. (REK) |
|
Monday, August 13, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
motion
Continue
Mon 08/13 2:30 PM
MOTION to Continue Dispositive Motion Deadline by Maricopa, County of.(Trullinger, Charles) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Friday, August 03, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
notice
Notice of Attorney Substitution (Within Firm Only)
Fri 08/03 4:30 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Substitution by Charles E Trullinger. (Trullinger, Charles) |
|
Tuesday, July 17, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
notice
Notice of Service of Discovery
Tue 07/17 10:38 AM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Maricopa, County of. (Trullinger, Charles) |
|
Monday, June 18, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 06/19 3:48 PM
Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories to Defendants by McKinley Truein Brown, III. (6 pages) (MSA) |
|
Monday, June 04, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
notice
Notice of Service of Discovery
Mon 06/04 11:55 AM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Maricopa, County of. (Trullinger, Charles) |
|
Tuesday, May 29, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel
Tue 05/29 12:27 PM
ORDER - IT IS ORDERED denying Plaintiff's "Motion for Appointment of Counsel" (Doc.16 ). (See document for complete details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett on 5/29/18. (SLQ) |
|
Friday, May 25, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Notice of Deposition
Fri 05/25 4:21 PM
NOTICE of Deposition of McKinley Truein Brown III, filed by Maricopa, County of. (Trullinger, Charles) |
|
Monday, May 21, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
notice
Notice of Service of Discovery
Tue 05/22 3:31 PM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by McKinley Truein Brown, III. (SLQ) (3 pages) |
|
Wednesday, May 16, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
notice
Notice of Deposition
Wed 05/16 12:51 PM
NOTICE of Deposition of McKinley Truein Brown, filed by Maricopa, County of. (Trullinger, Charles) |
|
Friday, May 04, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Notice of Service of Discovery
Fri 05/04 12:05 PM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Maricopa, County of. (Trullinger, Charles) |
|
Wednesday, April 18, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Appoint Counsel
Wed 04/18 4:17 PM
MOTION to Appoint Counsel by McKinley Truein Brown, III. (SLQ) (3 pages) |
|
Monday, April 02, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Service of Discovery
Tue 04/03 11:54 AM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by McKinley Truein Brown, III. (LAD) (2 pages) |
|
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Service of Discovery
Tue 04/03 11:53 AM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by McKinley Truein Brown, III. (LAD) (3 pages) |
|
Friday, March 23, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
4
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Reconsideration
Fri 03/23 10:36 AM
ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that Defendant Maricopa County's Motion for Reconsideration (Doc.9 ) is denied. (See document for further details). Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 3/23/18. (LAD) |
|
Wednesday, March 14, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Service of Discovery
Wed 03/14 4:00 PM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Maricopa, County of. (Trullinger, Charles) |
|
Tuesday, March 13, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Service of Discovery
Tue 03/13 10:04 AM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Maricopa, County of. (Trullinger, Charles) |
|
Tuesday, February 13, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 02/13 4:01 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 7/12/2018. Dispositive motions due by 8/13/2018. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 2/13/2019. (See document for further details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett on 2/13/18. (LAD) |
|
9 | 9
motion
Reconsideration
Tue 02/13 9:27 AM
MOTION for Reconsideration Motion To Reconsider Screening Order by Maricopa, County of. (Trullinger, Charles) |
|
8 | 8
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 02/13 9:26 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint with Jury Demand Answer Of Defendant Maricopa County by Maricopa, County of.(Trullinger, Charles) |
|
Monday, February 12, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
service
Service Executed
Mon 02/12 4:00 PM
SERVICE EXECUTED: USMS Process Receipt and Return re: summons/complaint/order upon Maricopa County Clerk of Board of Supervisors on 2/7/18. (LAD) |
|
Monday, November 27, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
2
pgs
order
Order Directing Prisoner Payment
Mon 11/27 11:45 AM
ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of McKinley Truein Brown, III(See document for full details). Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 11/27/17. (SLQ) |
|
5 | 5
7
pgs
order
Order (Service Packet) ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Set/Clear Flags ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties
Mon 11/27 11:44 AM
ORDER (Service Packet) - Plaintiff's Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Doc.2 ) is granted. As required by the accompanying Order to the appropriate government agency, Plaintiff must pay the $350.00 filing fee and is assessed an initial partial filing fee of $5.64. Count Two and Defendant Penzone are dismissed without prejudice. Defendant Maricopa County must answer Count One. The Clerk of Court must send Plaintiff a service packet including the Complaint (Doc.1 ), this Order, and both summons and request for waiver forms for Defendant Maricopa County. This matter is referred to Magistrate Judge Eileen S. Willett pursuant to Rules 72.1 and 72.2 of the Local Rules of Civil Procedure for all pretrial proceedings as authorized under 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1). (See document for complete details). Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 11/27/17. (SLQ) |
|
Monday, August 21, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Assignment
Tue 08/22 2:04 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT: (REK) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement
Tue 08/22 2:04 PM
Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by McKinley Truein Brown, III. (5 pages) (REK) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 08/22 2:03 PM
APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by McKinley Truein Brown, III. (2 pages) (REK) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 08/22 2:01 PM
PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed by McKinley Truein Brown, III. (15 pages)(REK) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope |