Principis Capital, LLC v. Hutton
North Carolina Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | W Earl Britt |
Case #: | 4:17-cv-00116 |
Nature of Suit | 422 Bankruptcy - Appeal 28 USC 158 |
Cause | 28:0158 Bankruptcy Appeal from Judgment/Order |
Case Filed: | Aug 23, 2017 |
Terminated: | Dec 11, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Feb 19, 2018 3:42 AM EST |
Appellant
Principis Capital, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Appellee
Clifford Earl Hutton
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Clerk of Court Stephanie Butler
United States Bankruptcy Court Century Station 300 Fayetteville Street Room 445
Raleigh, NC 27601 |
|
Interested Party
Onslow County Sheriff's Department
|
Represented By
|
Trustee
Joseph A. Bledsoe, III
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Friday, December 08, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Fri 12/08 12:27 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal of Appeal by Principis Capital, LLC (Bircher, John) |
|
Tuesday, September 12, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Withdrawal of Motion
Tue 09/12 11:35 AM
WITHDRAWAL of Motion by Principis Capital, LLC. regarding9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Principis Capital, LLC (Bircher, John) |
|
Monday, September 11, 2017 | ||
notice
Notice of Deficiency
Mon 09/11 1:38 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding:9 Motion to Dismiss. A memorandum in support should be filed pursuant to Local Civil Rule 7.1(e). (Edwards, S.) |
||
Wednesday, September 06, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Dismiss
Wed 09/06 4:46 PM
MOTION to Dismiss filed by Principis Capital, LLC. (Bircher, John) |
|
8 | 8
2
pgs
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 09/06 11:55 AM
Notice of Appearance filed by Blake Younger Boyette on behalf of Clifford Earl Hutton. (Boyette, Blake) |
|
Monday, August 28, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Financial Disclosure Statement
Mon 08/28 4:48 PM
Financial Disclosure Statement by Onslow County Sheriff's Department (Oliver, George) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 08/28 4:45 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by George Mason Oliver on behalf of Onslow County Sheriff's Department. (Oliver, George) |
|
Thursday, August 24, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Financial Disclosure Statement
Thu 08/24 12:49 PM
Financial Disclosure Statement by Clifford Earl Hutton (Stubbs, Trawick) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 08/24 12:48 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Trawick H. Stubbs, Jr on behalf of Clifford Earl Hutton. (Stubbs, Trawick) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 08/24 12:46 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Joseph Z. Frost on behalf of Clifford Earl Hutton. (Frost, Joseph) |
|
Wednesday, August 23, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice-other
Wed 08/23 3:18 PM
Notice of Docketing and Briefing Deadline regarding1 Bankruptcy Appeal. (Rudd, D.) |
|
1 | 1
3
pgs
appeal
Bankruptcy Appeal
Wed 08/23 3:00 PM
Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 17-03343 5-DMW. (Donleycott, S.) |
|
Att: 1 Judge David M. Warren's Order of July 19, 2017 |