Morrow v. Ethicon, Inc. et al
West Virginia Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Joseph R Goodwin |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-03858 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Aug 22, 2017 |
Terminated: | Feb 22, 2019 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jun 19, 2019 10:10 PM EDT |
Defendant
Ethicon, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sharri Morrow
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Friday, February 22, 2019 | ||
16 | 16
18
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case ~Util - Set/Clear Flags
Fri 02/22 1:51 PM
ORDER (Dismissing the Ethicon Defendants with Prejudice) Directing that 1) the Joint Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice filed in MDL 2327 by Ethicon, Certain Plaintiffs is GRANTED; and 2) the Ethicon defendants are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE from the actions listed on the attached Exhibit A; and 3) if there are no remaining defendants in a civil action, then (a) that civil action is dismissed with prejudice and stricken from the docket and (b) any pending motions are DENIED as moot. The Clerk is DIRECTED to 1) dismiss the Ethicon defendants from the individual civil action(s) with prejudice; and 2) if no other defendants remain in an individual action, then (a) strike the action from the docket, and (b) close the case. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 2/22/2019. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (mek) |
|
Wednesday, February 13, 2019 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice Of Attorney Appearance - ETHICON, INC. MDL CASE ONLY
Wed 02/13 1:45 PM
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Caroline L. Maida on behalf of Sharri Morrow. (Maida, Caroline) |
|
Thursday, November 08, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
1
pgs
order
Order
Thu 11/08 12:44 PM
ORDER granting the Motions filed in MDL 2327 by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Substitute Susan M. Robinson as Counsel in lieu of David B. Thomas, and to Substitute William M. Gage as Counsel in lieu of Christy D. Jones; the Clerk is directed to terminate Christy D. Jones and to substitute William M. Gage as counsel of record, both on the main master docket and for each individual member case in MDL 2327 with which Christy D. Jones is associated, and to terminate David B. Thomas and to substitute Susan M. Robinson as counsel of record, both on the main master docket and for each individual member case in MDL 2327 with which David B. Thomas is associated. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 5/24/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (lca) (ADI) |
|
Tuesday, June 26, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
order
MDL Order Moving Case To Inactive Docket
Tue 06/26 4:17 PM
INACTIVE DOCKET ORDER: The court has been advised that the plaintiff(s) and Ethicon, Inc. have reached a settlement with regard to Ethicon. All discovery deadlines are continued until further order of the court. Plaintiff(s) and Ethicon may submit an agreed order of dismissal with prejudice on or before 8/31/2018; if settlements are not finalized and dismissal orders are not submitted by then the Court will have a hearing to determine the appropriate action pertaining to any remaining cases on the inactive docket. Counsel for plaintiffs and defendant(s) are directed to provide quarterly reports as to their progress in dismissing cases on the inactive docket. This Order is related to the Proposed Inactive Docket Order filed at ECF No. 6010 in MDL Case No. 2327 Ethicon. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 6/26/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (brn) (ADI) |
|
Friday, April 06, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice Of Attorney Appearance - ETHICON, INC. MDL CASE ONLY
Fri 04/06 12:33 PM
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Halli D. Cohn on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Cohn, Halli) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Notice Of Attorney Appearance - ETHICON, INC. MDL CASE ONLY
Fri 04/06 12:12 PM
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by S. Eric Rumanek on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Rumanek, S.) |
|
Wednesday, March 28, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 03/28 12:38 PM
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of7 Notice of Videotaped Deposition (Gage, William) |
|
Thursday, February 08, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice To Take Or Amend Deposition
Thu 02/08 8:57 AM
NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Dr. Eric M. Hawes on 5/3/18 at 9:00 a.m. (Combs, Philip) |
|
Thursday, September 28, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice Of Attorney Appearance - ETHICON, INC. MDL CASE ONLY
Thu 09/28 5:01 PM
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Christy D. Jones on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Jones, Christy) |
|
Wednesday, September 20, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
ETHICON - Plaintiff Profile Form
Wed 09/20 12:15 PM
PLAINTIFF PROFILE FORM filed by Sharri Morrow. (Mostyn, J.) |
|
Thursday, September 14, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice Of Attorney Appearance - ETHICON, INC. MDL CASE ONLY
Thu 09/14 4:24 PM
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by David B. Thomas on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Thomas, David) |
|
Thursday, August 24, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
order
Pretrial Order 267 - ETHICON MDL MEMBER CASE ONLY
Thu 08/24 10:17 AM
TRANSMITTED PRETRIAL ORDER # 267 entered on 08/04/2017 in MDL 2327 to attorneys in member case. (crg) |
|
Tuesday, August 22, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 08/23 9:30 AM
SHORT FORM COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # 0425-5939139. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (tlg) |