Rotondo Weirich Enterprises, Inc. v. Premier Access Insurance Company
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:15-bk-16146
Lead BK case is: 2:15-bk-16146
Pennsylvania Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Eric L Frank |
Case #: | 2:17-ap-00253 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Aug 23, 2017 |
Terminated: | Dec 18, 2017 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Premier Access Insurance Company
|
|
Plaintiff
Rotondo Weirich Enterprises, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 1:10 PM EDT |
Monday, December 18, 2017 | ||
utility
Disposition of Adversary
Mon 12/18 8:55 AM
Disposition of Adversary 2:17-ap-253 WITHDRAWN. (S., Antoinette) |
||
court
Close Adversary Case
Mon 12/18 9:02 AM
Adversary Case 2:17-ap-253 Terminated for Statistical Purposes. (S., Antoinette) |
||
Friday, December 15, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Praecipe to Withdraw Document
Fri 12/15 4:30 PM
Praecipe to Withdraw Complaint Filed by ROBERT W. SEITZER on behalf of Rotondo Weirich Enterprises, Inc. . (SEITZER, ROBERT) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Sunday, December 10, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Mon 12/11 12:55 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. . No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 12/10/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, December 07, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
1
pgs
order
Order (Generic)
Fri 12/08 4:45 PM
ORDERED that the Plaintiff shall take appropriate action to prosecute this proceeding (e.g., a Motion under Fed. R. Bankr. P. 7055) on or before December 21, 2017. Upon failure to prosecute this adversary proceeding, the proceeding may be dismissed for lack of prosecution without further notice or opportunity for hearing. (J., Christina) |
|
Sunday, October 22, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Mon 10/23 12:59 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. . No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 10/22/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, October 20, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Stipulation
Fri 10/20 11:02 AM
Second Order entered granting Stipulation between Plaintiff and Defendant to file an answer or otherwise plead to the Plaintiff's complaint is extended to November 20, 2017. No further extensions shall be granted except for cause shown. . (S., Antoinette) |
|
Thursday, October 19, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Stipulation
Thu 10/19 4:51 PM
Stipulation By Rotondo Weirich Enterprises, Inc. and Between Defendant, Premier Access Insurance Company, to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead to the Complaint (Second) . Filed by ROBERT W. SEITZER on behalf of Rotondo Weirich Enterprises, Inc. . (SEITZER, ROBERT) |
|
Friday, September 22, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Sat 09/23 1:01 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. . No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 09/22/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, September 20, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Stipulation
Wed 09/20 9:28 AM
Order entered granting Stipulation between Plaintiff and Defendant to file an answer or otherwise plead to the Plaintiff's complaint is extended to October 23, 2017. . (S., Antoinette) |
|
Tuesday, September 19, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Stipulation
Tue 09/19 4:23 PM
Stipulation By Rotondo Weirich Enterprises, Inc. and Between Defendant, Premier Access Insurance Company, to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead to the Complaint . Filed by ROBERT W. SEITZER on behalf of Rotondo Weirich Enterprises, Inc. . (SEITZER, ROBERT) |
|
Thursday, August 24, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Thu 08/24 1:52 PM
Summons Service Executed on Premier Access Insurance Company 8/24/2017 . (SEITZER, ROBERT) |
|
2 | 2
court
Summons Issued
Thu 08/24 10:25 AM
1 Summons Issued to Plaintiff(s) to be served upon Defendant(s) Premier Access Insurance Company Date Issued 8/24/2017, Answer Due 9/23/2017. (G., Jennifer) |
|
Wednesday, August 23, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 08/23 1:25 PM
Adversary case 17-00253 Complaint by ARIS J. KARALIS, ROBERT W. SEITZER on behalf of Rotondo Weirich Enterprises, Inc. against Premier Access Insurance Company. Fee Amount $350 . (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) (SEITZER, ROBERT) |