Santos et al v. Camden Military Academy, Inc. et al
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Mary Geiger Lewis |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-02281 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Aug 25, 2017 |
Terminated: | Nov 13, 2018 |
Last checked: Wednesday Feb 21, 2018 3:39 AM EST |
Defendant
Camden Military Academy, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
John Heflin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Amanda Santos
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Deryck Santos
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Plaintiff
Jane Doe
Terminated: 10/24/2017
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Doe
Terminated: 10/24/2017
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM EDT |