Moralez v. Surjan Sons Inc et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Saundra Brown Armstrong |
Case #: | 4:17-cv-04958 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:12101 Americans w/ Disabilities Act (ADA) |
Case Filed: | Aug 25, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Feb 21, 2018 12:37 AM PST |
Defendant
Century Plaza Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Surjan Sons Inc
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Francisca Moralez
4136 Amargosa Drive
Antioch, CA 94531 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Thursday, September 06, 2018 | ||
32 | 32
misc
Stipulation without Proposed Order
Thu 09/06 5:01 PM
STIPULATION for dismissal of entire action filed by Francisca Moralez. (Best, Zachary) |
|
Friday, August 03, 2018 | ||
31 | 31
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice
Fri 08/03 9:57 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE. You are hereby notified that the Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 8/9/2018 is continued to 9/19/2018 at 3:00 pm. An updated joint case management statement is due by 9/12/2018. Call-in instructions are contained in Entry9 . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (dtmS, COURT STAFF) |
|
Thursday, August 02, 2018 | ||
30 | 30
misc
Case Management Statement
Thu 08/02 4:37 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Century Plaza Corporation, Surjan Sons Inc. (Neilson, Bruce) |
|
Friday, June 15, 2018 | ||
29 | 29
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice
Fri 06/15 12:52 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE. You are hereby notified that the Case Management Conference set for 6/20/2018 is continued to 8/9/2018 at 2:45 pm. An updated joint case management statement is due by 8/2/2018. Call-in instructions are contained in Entry9 . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (dtmS, COURT STAFF) |
|
28 | 28
misc
Case Management Statement
Fri 06/15 8:57 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (Joint) filed by Francisca Moralez. (Best, Zachary) |
|
Tuesday, May 22, 2018 | ||
27 | 27
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 05/22 4:02 PM
NOTICE by Francisca Moralez of contingent settlement of action (Best, Zachary) |
|
Friday, May 11, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
adr
ADR Remark
Fri 05/11 3:32 PM
ADR Remark: Mediation Hearing set for 5/14/2018 at 10:00 AM is off calendar. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2018) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) |
|
Monday, May 07, 2018 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Hearings
Mon 05/07 8:18 AM
Set/Reset Hearing Mediation Hearing set for 5/14/2018 at 10:00 AM at the Oakland Courthouse, 1301 Clay Street. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2018) |
||
Wednesday, March 21, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice
Wed 03/21 11:58 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE. You are hereby notified that the Case Management Conference set for 3/21/2018 is continued to 6/20/2018 at 2:45 pm. An updated joint case management statement is due 6/13/2018. Call-in instructions are contained in Order9 . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2018) |
|
Thursday, March 15, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
misc
Case Management Statement
Thu 03/15 5:23 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Francisca Moralez.(Best, Zachary) (Filed on 3/15/2018) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Zachary M. Best | ||
utility
Electronic Filing Error
Thu 03/15 2:26 PM
Electronic filing error. The case management statement is unsigned. Please re-file in its entirety. Re:22 Case Management Statement filed by Francisca Moralez (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2018) |
||
Wednesday, March 14, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
misc
Case Management Statement
Wed 03/14 4:12 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Century Plaza Corporation, Surjan Sons Inc. (Neilson, Bruce) (Filed on 3/14/2018) |
|
22 | 22
misc
Case Management Statement
Wed 03/14 3:41 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Francisca Moralez.(Best, Zachary) (Filed on 3/14/2018) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Zachary M. Best | ||
Wednesday, February 28, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
adr
ADR Clerk's Notice Appointing Mediator
Wed 02/28 9:47 AM
ADR Clerk's Notice Appointing Julia Campins as Mediator. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2018) |
|
Tuesday, February 20, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
adr
Notice of Need for Mediation - ADA Cases Only
Tue 02/20 12:16 PM
Notice of Need for Mediation by Zachary Manning Best (Best, Zachary) (Filed on 2/20/2018) |
|
utility
Case Referred to Mediation
Tue 02/20 12:26 PM
CASE REFERRED to Mediation20 . Deadline to complete mediation is 5/21/2018. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2018) |
||
Tuesday, February 06, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
3
pgs
order
Order on Stipulation
Tue 02/06 12:57 PM
Order by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong granting 18 Stipulation to Continue Last Date to File Notice of Need for Mediation.(dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2018) |
|
18 | 18
motion
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Tue 02/06 9:19 AM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to continue last date to file notice of need for mediation filed by Francisca Moralez. (Best, Zachary) (Filed on 2/6/2018) |
|
Wednesday, January 17, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 01/17 4:47 PM
ANSWER to Complaint byCentury Plaza Corporation, Surjan Sons Inc. (Neilson, Bruce) (Filed on 1/17/2018) |
|
Friday, December 22, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
3
pgs
order
Order on Stipulation
Fri 12/22 1:09 PM
Order by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong granting 15 Stipulation to Continue Last Date to Meet and Confer.(dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2017) |
|
15 | 15
motion
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Fri 12/22 12:12 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER extending deadline to meet and confer filed by Francisca Moralez, Surjan Sons Inc and Century Plaza Corporation. (Best, Zachary) (Filed on 12/22/2017) Modified on 12/22/2017 (jmlS, COURT STAFF) |
|
Thursday, September 21, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Stipulation without Proposed Order
Thu 09/21 2:42 PM
STIPULATION for extension of time filed by Century Plaza Corporation, Surjan Sons Inc. (Neilson, Bruce) (Filed on 9/21/2017) |
|
Thursday, September 14, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
service
Certificate/Proof of Service
Thu 09/14 10:21 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Francisca Moralez re9 Order,, Set Deadlines/Hearings, (Best, Zachary) (Filed on 9/14/2017) |
|
12 | 12
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 09/14 9:58 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Francisca Moralez. Surjan Sons Inc served on 9/14/2017, answer due 10/5/2017. (Best, Zachary) (Filed on 9/14/2017) |
|
Friday, September 08, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
service
Certificate/Proof of Service
Fri 09/08 9:21 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Francisca Moralez re9 Order,, Set Deadlines/Hearings, (Best, Zachary) (Filed on 9/8/2017) |
|
10 | 10
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 09/08 9:01 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Francisca Moralez. Century Plaza Corporation served on 9/1/2017, answer due 9/22/2017. (Best, Zachary) (Filed on 9/8/2017) |
|
Thursday, September 07, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
3
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 09/07 1:24 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 9/7/17. Joint Case Management Statement due by 3/14/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/21/2018 02:30 PM. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2017) |
|
8 | 8
1
pgs
order
Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 09/07 11:37 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by the Executive Committee on 9/7/17. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2017) |
|
Friday, August 25, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Proposed Summons
Fri 08/25 1:00 PM
Proposed Summons. (Best, Zachary) (Filed on 8/25/2017) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 08/25 12:59 PM
COMPLAINT ASSERTING DENIAL OF RIGHT OF ACCESS UNDER THE AMERICANS WITH DISABILITIES ACT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-11662722.). Filed byFrancisca Moralez.(Best, Zachary) (Filed on 8/25/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |