Gee v. City of Phoenix Water Services Department et al
Arizona District Court | |
Judge: | David K Duncan |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02885 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal - Employment Discrimination |
Case Filed: | Aug 25, 2017 |
Terminated: | Feb 07, 2018 |
Last checked: Wednesday Feb 21, 2018 1:50 AM MST |
Defendant
City of Phoenix Water Services Department
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Unknown Parties
|
|
Plaintiff
Angela Gee
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM MST |
Wednesday, February 07, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
1
pgs
order
Order on Stipulation Order Dismissing Case
Wed 02/07 12:31 PM
ORDER pursuant to18 Stipulation of Dismissal: This matter is dismissed with prejudice, with each party being responsible for their own fees and costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge David K Duncan on 2/7/18. (DXD) |
|
Thursday, February 01, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Thu 02/01 3:21 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Angela Gee.(Virden, Natalie) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Friday, January 26, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Continue
Fri 01/26 10:26 AM
ORDER granting16 Motion to Continue Show Cause Hearing reset for 3/2/2018 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 305, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Magistrate Judge David K Duncan. If a Stipulation to Dismiss is received prior to the scheduled hearing, the hearing will be vacated. Signed by Magistrate Judge David K Duncan on 1/26/18. (DXD) |
|
16 | 16
motion
Continue
Fri 01/26 9:45 AM
First MOTION to Continue Order to Show Cause hearing of January 26, 2018 by City of Phoenix Water Services Department. (Torrilhon, Victoria) |
|
Friday, January 05, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
1
pgs
order
Order to Show Cause
Fri 01/05 11:43 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - Show Cause Hearing set for 1/26/2018 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 305, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Magistrate Judge David K Duncan. If a Stipulation to Dismiss is received prior to the scheduled hearing, the hearing will be vacated. Signed by Magistrate Judge David K Duncan on 1/5/18. (LAD) |
|
Friday, October 27, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Settlement
Fri 10/27 4:09 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by Angela Gee. (Petitti, Michael) |
|
Monday, October 02, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
MIDP - Order Ext MID Response Deadline Order Staying Case ~Util - Terminate Motions
Mon 10/02 3:17 PM
ORDER - IT IS ORDERED granting Plaintiff's Motion to Stay (Doc.8 ). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED granting the parties' Joint Motion to Defer Initial Discovery Responses and Vacate the October 27, 2017 Rule 16 Scheduling Conference (Doc.9 ). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if the October 24, 2017 Mediation is unsuccessful, Plaintiff will submit her initial discovery responses on November 23, 2017, and Defendants will submit their initial discovery responses on December 22, 2017. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if the October 24, 2017 Mediation is unsuccessful, Plaintiff shall file a Notice with the Court within five days indicating that the Mediation was unsuccessful, the Court will thereafter reschedule the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge David K Duncan on 10/2/17. (LAD) |
|
Tuesday, September 12, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
misc
25 Pct Mag - Text Order: Consent to Proceed before Mag Judge
Tue 09/12 11:38 AM
Minute Order: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c), all parties have voluntarily consented to have Magistrate Judge David K. Duncan conduct all further proceedings in this case, including trial and entry of final judgment, and conduct all post-judgment proceedings, with direct review by the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals, if an appeal is filed. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) |
|
Monday, September 11, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Vacate
Mon 09/11 3:56 PM
Joint MOTION to Vacate October 27, 2017 Rule 16 Scheduling Conference and Defer Initial Discovery Responses by Angela Gee.(Petitti, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 09/11 3:13 PM
NOTICE re: Pending Motion: Plaintiff's Motion to Stay by Angela Gee .(Petitti, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Motion to Stay | ||
Friday, September 08, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
misc
25 Pct Mag - Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction
Tue 09/12 11:34 AM
Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) |
|
Friday, September 01, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
25 Pct Mag - Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction
Fri 09/01 12:26 PM
Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) |
|
Thursday, August 31, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
6
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
Thu 08/31 2:42 PM
ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 10/27/2017 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 305, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Magistrate Judge David K Duncan. See document for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge David K Duncan on 8/31/2017. (REK) |
|
4 | 4
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 08/31 2:26 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by City of Phoenix Water Services Department.(Torrilhon, Victoria) |
|
Monday, August 28, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice re Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP)
Mon 08/28 2:52 PM
NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (REK) |
|
Friday, August 25, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
misc
New Case Opened
Mon 08/28 2:52 PM
Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-14584528. This case has been assigned to the Honorable David K. Duncan. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 17-02885 PHX-DKD. Magistrate Election form attached. PLEASE NOTE: Plaintiff(s) and defendants that have already appeared in this case are required to return the attached Magistrate Election form, in paper, within FOURTEEN (14) days of this filing. Please read attached instructions.(REK) |
|
Att: 1 Magistrate Consent Form | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Mon 08/28 2:46 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2017-006057. Filing fee received: $400.00, receipt number 0970-14584528 filed by City of Phoenix Water Services Department. (submitted by Victoria Torrilhon)(REK) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Supplemental Cover Sheet | ||
service
Service Executed
Mon 08/28 2:49 PM
*****State Court record received on 8/25/2017*****SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Angela Gee: Certificate of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Certificate of Arbitration, and Demand for Jury Trial upon City of Phoenix Water Services Department on 8/01/2017.*****Certificate of Service filed in State Court on 8/3/2017, docketed in U.S. District Court on 8/25/2017 for case management purposes.***** (REK) |