In-N-Out Burgers v. Smashburger IP Holder LLC et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | James V Selna |
Referred: | Douglas F Mccormick |
Case #: | 8:17-cv-01474 |
Nature of Suit | 840 Property Rights - Trademark |
Cause | 15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act) |
Case Filed: | Aug 28, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 19, 2019 |
Last checked: Saturday Feb 24, 2018 1:53 AM PST |
Counter Claimant
Smashburger Franchising LLC
|
Represented By
|
Counter Claimant
Smashburger IP Holder LLC
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
In-N-Out Burgers
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Smashburger Franchising LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Smashburger IP Holder LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
In-N-Out Burgers
|
Represented By
|
1. | In-N-Out files trademark infringement lawsuit against Smashburger (eater.com) |
Submitted Tue 08/29/2017 | |
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Monday, December 02, 2019 | ||
236 | 236
2
pgs
order
Order
Tue 12/03 1:53 PM
ORDER ON JOINT STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE235 by Judge James V. Selna, it is hereby ORDERED that: (1) Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), all claims and counterclaims asserted by the parties in this action are hereby dismissed with prejudice; (2) each party shall bear its own attorneys fees, costs, and expenses; and (3) the Court shall retain jurisdiction for the purpose of enforcing the parties' settlement. (es) |
|
235 | 235
stip
Dismiss Case
Mon 12/02 2:49 PM
STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) filed by Plaintiff and counterdefendant In-N-Out Burgers.(Wexler, Jeffrey) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order |