Adams, et al v. Bayer Corp., et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | William Alsup |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-04985 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Aug 28, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 14, 2017 |
Last checked: Saturday Feb 24, 2018 1:15 AM PST |
Defendant
Bayer Corp.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Bayer Essure Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Bayer HealthCare LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sarah Garcia
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Vanessa Adams
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Terra Whalen
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lachelle Walker
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sarah Roberts
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Krystal Rivera
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sunceree Ravenell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Andrea Holland
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Nicole Elliott
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Maria Barnes
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Randi Aery
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dawn Adkins
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Wednesday, September 13, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice
Wed 09/13 8:48 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE Scheduling Initial CMC on Reassignment. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) Case Management Statement due by 11/9/2017. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/16/2017 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/whaorders. (dl, COURT STAFF) |
|
Friday, September 08, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Fri 09/08 9:52 AM
Case reassigned to Judge Hon. William Alsup. Judge Hon. Vince Chhabria no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2017) |
|
Wednesday, September 06, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
1
pgs
order
Order
Wed 09/06 2:45 PM
RELATED CASE ORDER re 11 Notice (Other) filed by Bayer Essure Inc., Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals Inc., Bayer HealthCare LLC, Bayer Corp.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 9/6/2017. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2017) |
|
18 | 18
service
Certificate/Proof of Service
Wed 09/06 10:07 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bayer Corp., Bayer Essure Inc., Bayer HealthCare LLC, Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals Inc. re13 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support ,14 Request for Judicial Notice,,,,15 Certificate of Service, (This is an Amended Certificate of Service) (Degen, Alycia) (Filed on 9/6/2017) |
|
17 | 17
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Wed 09/06 10:07 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Entire Action without prejudice by Vanessa Adams, Dawn Adkins, Randi Aery, Maria Barnes, Nicole Elliott, Sarah Garcia, Andrea Holland, Sunceree Ravenell, Krystal Rivera, Sarah Roberts, Lachelle Walker, Terra Whalen (Williams, Andrew) (Filed on 9/6/2017) |
|
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 09/06 8:47 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Scott Williams on Behalf of Plaintiffs (Williams, Andrew) (Filed on 9/6/2017) |
|
Tuesday, September 05, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
service
Certificate/Proof of Service
Tue 09/05 5:18 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bayer Corp., Bayer Essure Inc., Bayer HealthCare LLC, Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals Inc. re13 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support ,14 Request for Judicial Notice,,,, (Degen, Alycia) (Filed on 9/5/2017) |
|
14 | 14
oth_sup
Request for Judicial Notice
Tue 09/05 5:14 PM
Request for Judicial Notice re13 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support filed byBayer Corp., Bayer Essure Inc., Bayer HealthCare LLC, Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Degen, Alycia) (Filed on 9/5/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A to Request for Judicial Notice, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B to Request for Judicial Notice, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C to Request for Judicial Notice, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D to Request for Judicial Notice, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E to Request for Judicial Notice, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F to Request for Judicial Notice, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit G to Request for Judicial Notice, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit H to Request for Judicial Notice, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit I to Request for Judicial Notice, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit J to Request for Judicial Notice, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit K to Request for Judicial Notice, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit L to Request for Judicial Notice, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit M to Request for Judicial Notice, | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit N to Request for Judicial Notice, | ||
Att: 15 Exhibit O to Request for Judicial Notice, | ||
Att: 16 Exhibit P to Request for Judicial Notice, | ||
Att: 17 Exhibit Q to Request for Judicial Notice, | ||
Att: 18 Exhibit R to Request for Judicial Notice | ||
13 | 13
motion
Dismiss
Tue 09/05 4:54 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support filed by Bayer Corp., Bayer Essure Inc., Bayer HealthCare LLC, Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 10/12/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Vince Chhabria. Responses due by 9/19/2017. Replies due by 9/26/2017. (Degen, Alycia) (Filed on 9/5/2017) |
|
12 | 12
service
Certificate/Proof of Service
Tue 09/05 2:46 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bayer Corp., Bayer Essure Inc., Bayer HealthCare LLC, Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Degen, Alycia) (Filed on 9/5/2017) |
|
Thursday, August 31, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 08/31 4:25 PM
NOTICE by Bayer Corp., Bayer Essure Inc., Bayer HealthCare LLC, Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Notice of Lodging)(Degen, Alycia) (Filed on 8/31/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Wednesday, August 30, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
1
pgs
order
Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned
Wed 08/30 10:32 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Vince Chhabria for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Executive Committee on 8/30/17.(srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording | ||
Tuesday, August 29, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only
Tue 08/29 5:03 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2017) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Tue 08/29 10:53 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Bayer Corp., Bayer Essure Inc., Bayer HealthCare LLC, Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals Inc... (Dugan, Bradley) (Filed on 8/29/2017) |
|
Monday, August 28, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
Tue 08/29 2:43 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/21/2017. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/28/2017 10:00 AM. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2017) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 08/28 3:07 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley Dugan (Dugan, Bradley) (Filed on 8/28/2017) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 08/28 3:02 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Alycia Ann Degen (Degen, Alycia) (Filed on 8/28/2017) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities
Mon 08/28 3:00 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Bayer Corp., Bayer Essure Inc., Bayer HealthCare LLC, Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Bayer World Investments B.V., Other Affiliate Bayer Pharma AG, Other Affiliate Bayer Solution B.V., Other Affiliate Bayer Medical Care Inc., Other Affiliate NippoNex Inc., Other Affiliate Bayer West Coast Corporation, Other Affiliate Bayer Consumer Care Holdings LLC, Other Affiliate Dr. Scholl's LLC, Other Affiliate Coppertone LLC, Other Affiliate MiraLAX LLC, Other Affiliate Bayer HealthCare US Funding LLC, Other Affiliate Bayer East Coast LLC for Bayer HealthCare LLC; Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Bayer Corp.; Corporate Parent Bayer US Holding LP, Corporate Parent Bayer HealthCare Holdings LLC for Bayer Essure Inc.; Corporate Parent Schering Berlin Inc. for Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Degen, Alycia) (Filed on 8/28/2017) |
|
3 | 3
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Mon 08/28 2:22 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/11/2017. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2017) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 08/28 2:07 PM
NOTICE by Bayer Corp., Bayer Essure Inc., Bayer HealthCare LLC, Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals Inc. NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF OTHER ACTIONS AND PROCEEDINGS [L.R.3-13] (Degen, Alycia) (Filed on 8/28/2017) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Mon 08/28 1:07 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of the State of California for the County of Alameda. Their case number is RG17869043. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-11666987). Filed byBayer Corp., Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals Inc., Bayer Essure Inc., Bayer HealthCare LLC.(Degen, Alycia) (Filed on 8/28/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet |