Faber v. Carey et al
Michigan Western District Court | |
Judge: | Gordon J Quist |
Referred: | Phillip J Green |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-00784 |
Nature of Suit | 555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Aug 28, 2017 |
Terminated: | Oct 24, 2017 |
defendant
Amanda Terburg
|
|
defendant
Elizabeth Carey
|
|
plaintiff
Robert Andrew Faber
|
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, October 25, 2017 | ||
utility
Copies Mailed
Wed 10/25 4:41 PM
Copy of Order on Motion to Serve the Complaint12 , Opinion (Screening)10 and certified copy of Judgment - Frivolous, Malicious, or for Failure to State a Claim (Prisoner Civil Rights Case)11 sent via U.S. Mail to Robert Andrew Faber #86204-004, Miami (FCI), Federal Correctional Institution, P.O. Box 779800, Miami, FL 33177 (clw) |
||
Tuesday, October 24, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Serve the Complaint
Tue 10/24 4:10 PM
ORDER denying4 motion to serve the complaint; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt) |
|
11 | 11
order
Judgment - Frivolous, Malicious, or for Failure to State a Claim (Prisoner Civil Rights Case)
Tue 10/24 4:09 PM
JUDGMENT that the action is dismissed for failure to state a claim; the Court discerns no good-faith basis for an appeal; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt) |
|
10 | 10
8
pgs
order
Opinion (Screening)
Tue 10/24 4:08 PM
OPINION; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt) |
|
Monday, October 23, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Letter
Mon 10/23 1:32 PM
LETTER from Robert Andrew Faber #86204-004 regarding copies (ns) |
|
Att: 1 Response from Clerk | ||
Monday, October 16, 2017 | ||
utility
Copies Mailed
Mon 10/16 4:28 PM
Copy of Order on Motion to Submit Initial Partial Filing Fee8 sent via U.S. Mail to Robert Andrew Faber #86204-004 (clw) |
||
Friday, October 13, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Extend Time to Submit Initial Partial Filing Fee
Fri 10/13 11:04 AM
ORDER granting7 motion to extend time to submit initial partial filing fee; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green, jkw) |
|
Tuesday, October 10, 2017 | ||
misc
Receipt (Prisoner Litigation - Initial Payment)
Tue 10/10 12:43 PM
RECEIPT (Prisoner Litigation): initial filing fee installment in the amount of $1.00, receipt number GR057576; amount paid to date $1.00 (mkc) |
||
Monday, September 25, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Extension of Time to Submit Initial Partial Filing Fee
Wed 09/27 10:11 AM
MOTION for extension of time to submit initial partial filing fee by plaintiff Robert Andrew Faber; (clw) |
|
Friday, September 15, 2017 | ||
utility
Copies Mailed
Fri 09/15 11:27 AM
Copy of Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel6 , Order to Proceed IFP - Initial Fee Due in 28 Days - Prisoner,5 sent via U.S. Mail to Robert Andrew Faber #86204-004 (clw) |
||
Thursday, September 14, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel
Thu 09/14 3:16 PM
ORDER denying3 motion to appoint counsel; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green, jkw) |
|
5 | 5
4
pgs
order
Order to Proceed IFP - Initial Fee Due in 28 Days - Prisoner
Thu 09/14 3:14 PM
ORDER TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS and FOR PAYMENT OF FILING FEE: plaintiff to pay an initial partial fee of $1.00 within 28 days; plaintiff to make interim payments until the full fee is paid;(initial partial filing fee to be submitted by 10/12/2017); signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green, jkw) |
|
Monday, August 28, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Serve the Complaint
Wed 08/30 3:16 PM
MOTION to serve the complaint (named as, motion to seek certificate of service) by plaintiff Robert Andrew Faber; (clw) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Appoint Counsel
Wed 08/30 3:14 PM
MOTION to appoint counsel by plaintiff Robert Andrew Faber; (clw) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 08/30 3:12 PM
MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis by plaintiff Robert Andrew Faber; (clw) |
|
Att: 1 Financial Documents | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 08/30 3:07 PM
COMPLAINT against Elizabeth Carey, Amanda Terburg filed by Robert Andrew Faber (clw) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A |