Geegieh v. Cooper et al
Arizona District Court | |
Judge: | G Murray Snow |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02950 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Aug 31, 2017 |
Terminated: | Feb 22, 2018 |
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 27, 2018 2:20 AM MST |
Defendant
Arizona Court of Appeals
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Arizona Supreme Court
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Arizona, State of
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Katherine Cooper
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Maricopa County Superior Court
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Shebli Geegieh
4572 E Desert Sands Dr.
Chandler, AZ 85249 |
GPO
Feb 22 2018
ORDER granting 25 Motion to Dismiss. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 2/22/18. (EJA) |
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM MST |
Thursday, February 22, 2018 | ||
35 | 35
order
Clerks Judgment
Thu 02/22 10:40 AM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that pursuant to the Court's order filed February 22, 2018, Plaintiff to take nothing, and the complaint and action are dismissed. (EJA) |
|
34 | 34
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
Thu 02/22 10:38 AM
ORDER granting25 Motion to Dismiss. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 2/22/18. (EJA) |
|
Friday, February 09, 2018 | ||
33 | 33
notice
Notice of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery
Fri 02/09 3:23 PM
NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendants Arizona Court of Appeals, Arizona Supreme Court, Arizona, State of, Katherine Cooper, Maricopa County Superior Court. (Ross, Dwayne) |
|
32 | 32
misc
Rule 26(f) Report re MIDP
Fri 02/09 2:27 PM
Rule 26(f) Report for Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) filed by Defendants Arizona Court of Appeals, Arizona Supreme Court, Arizona, State of, Katherine Cooper, Maricopa County Superior Court. (Ross, Dwayne) |
|
Thursday, January 11, 2018 | ||
31 | 31
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 01/11 10:45 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by Arizona Court of Appeals, Arizona Supreme Court, Arizona, State of, Katherine Cooper, Maricopa County Superior Court.(Ross, Dwayne) |
|
Tuesday, January 09, 2018 | ||
30 | 30
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Tue 01/09 4:15 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re:25 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Arizona Court of Appeals, Arizona Supreme Court, Arizona, State of, Katherine Cooper, Maricopa County Superior Court. (Ross, Dwayne) |
|
Tuesday, December 26, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
misc
Response
Tue 12/26 1:46 PM
RESPONSE TO MOTION TO DISMISS by Plaintiff Shebli Geegieh. (Geegieh, Shebli) |
|
Wednesday, December 13, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
order
MIDP - Order of Extension of Time to Answer
Wed 12/13 10:15 AM
ORDER granting a one-time extension of time to respond to complaint. The parties' obligations to produce the information called for in the MIDP will be triggered by Defendant's answer to the complaint after the extension. The parties should be aware that the filing of a motion to dismiss under Rule 12(b)(6) will not postpone the time for compliance with the MIDP. General Order 17-08 provides that compliance may be deferred only for motions to dismiss based on lack of subject-matter jurisdiction, lack of personal jurisdiction, sovereign immunity, or absolute or qualified immunity of a public official. No further extensions will be granted. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 12/13/17. (EJA) |
|
Tuesday, December 12, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
misc
Stipulation For Extension of Time To Answer Complaint
Tue 12/12 3:04 PM
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT by Arizona Court of Appeals, Arizona Supreme Court, Arizona, State of, Katherine Cooper, Maricopa County Superior Court.(Ross, Dwayne) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
26 | 26
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 12/12 2:58 PM
NOTICE re: of Certification of Conferral by Arizona Court of Appeals, Arizona Supreme Court, Arizona, State of, Katherine Cooper, Maricopa County Superior Court re:25 MOTION to Dismiss Case . (Ross, Dwayne) |
|
25 | 25
motion
Dismiss Case
Tue 12/12 2:56 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Case by Arizona Court of Appeals, Arizona Supreme Court, Arizona, State of, Katherine Cooper, Maricopa County Superior Court. (Ross, Dwayne) |
|
Tuesday, November 28, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
service
Service Executed
Tue 11/28 2:38 PM
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Shebli Geegieh: Proof of Service re: Summon, Civil Action, Notice of Challenge rule 5.1, Orders upon Arizona Supreme Court on 11/21/2017. (Geegieh, Shebli) |
|
23 | 23
service
Service Executed
Tue 11/28 2:38 PM
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Shebli Geegieh: Proof of Service re: Summon, Civil Action, Notice of Challenge rule 5.1, Orders upon Arizona Court Of Appeals on 11/21/2017. (Geegieh, Shebli) |
|
22 | 22
service
Service Executed
Tue 11/28 2:37 PM
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Shebli Geegieh: Proof of Service re: Summon, Civil Action, Notice of Challenge rule 5.1, Orders upon The State Of Arizona on 11/21/2017. (Geegieh, Shebli) |
|
21 | 21
service
Service Executed
Tue 11/28 2:35 PM
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Shebli Geegieh: Proof of Service re: Summon, Civil Action, Notice of Challenge rule 5.1, Orders upon Maricopa County Superior Court on 11/27/2017. (Geegieh, Shebli) |
|
20 | 20
service
Service Executed
Tue 11/28 2:32 PM
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Shebli Geegieh: Proof of Service re: Summon, Civil Action, Notice of Challenge rule 5.1, Orders upon Hon. Katherine Cooper on 11/27/2017. (Geegieh, Shebli) |
|
Thursday, November 16, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
1
pgs
order
Order
Thu 11/16 10:41 AM
ORDERED that the Clerk of Court strike the Affidavits of Service (Docs. 10-17). Plaintiff is directed to properly and timely serve the Defendants and file notice pursuant to Rule 4(l) and (m). Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 11/16/17. (EJA) |
|
Wednesday, November 15, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Request
Wed 11/15 1:46 PM
REQUEST re: Request For Entry of Default by Plaintiff Shebli Geegieh.(Geegieh, Shebli) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF Request For Entry of Default | ||
17 | 17
service
Service Executed
Wed 11/15 12:29 PM
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Shebli Geegieh: Certificate of Service re: Order Dated 09/01/2017 (Rule 12-B) upon Arizona Court Of Appeals on 09/14/2017. (Geegieh, Shebli) |
|
16 | 16
service
Service Executed
Wed 11/15 12:28 PM
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Shebli Geegieh: Certificate of Service re: Order Dated 09/01/2017 (Rule 12-B) upon Arizona Supreme Court on 09/14/2017. (Geegieh, Shebli) |
|
15 | 15
service
Service Executed
Wed 11/15 12:26 PM
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Shebli Geegieh: Certificate of Service re: Order Dated 09/01/2017 (Rule 12-B) upon The State Of Arizona on 09/14/2017. (Geegieh, Shebli) |
|
14 | 14
service
Service Executed
Wed 11/15 12:25 PM
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Shebli Geegieh: Certificate of Service re: Order Dated 09/01/2017 (Rule 12-B) upon Hon. Katherine Cooper on 09/14/2017. (Geegieh, Shebli) |
|
13 | 13
service
Service Executed
Wed 11/15 12:19 PM
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Shebli Geegieh: Certificate of Service re: Pleadings, Notice of Challenge to Statue, summon upon Arizona Court Of Appeals on 09/05/2017. (Geegieh, Shebli) |
|
12 | 12
service
Service Executed
Wed 11/15 12:17 PM
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Shebli Geegieh: Certificate of Service re: Pleadings, Notice of Challenge to Statue, summon upon Arizona Supreme Court on 09/05/2017. (Geegieh, Shebli) |
|
11 | 11
service
Service Executed
Wed 11/15 12:16 PM
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Shebli Geegieh: Certificate of Service re: Pleadings, Notice of Challenge to Statue, summon upon The State Of Arizona on 09/05/2017. (Geegieh, Shebli) |
|
10 | 10
service
Service Executed
Wed 11/15 12:14 PM
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Shebli Geegieh: Certificate of Service re: Pleadings, Notice of Challenge to Statue, summon upon Hon. Katherine Cooper on 09/02/2017. (Geegieh, Shebli) |
|
Friday, September 01, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
2
pgs
order
Order
Fri 09/01 4:45 PM
ORDER that a motion pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) is discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. Therefore, the parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of a motion to dismiss to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED directing Plaintiff familiarize himself with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rules for the District of Arizona. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) shall serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file notice of service. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 9/1/2017. (KFZ) |
|
8 | 8
2
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines
Fri 09/01 4:44 PM
ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on 11/30/2017. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 9/1/2017. (KFZ) |
|
7 | 7
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Fri 09/01 2:13 PM
ORDER granting2 Motion to Allow Electronic Filing by a Party Appearing Without an Attorney. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 8/31/2017. (REK) |
|
Thursday, August 31, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice re Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP)
Thu 08/31 10:46 AM
NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (JJH) |
|
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Thu 08/31 10:37 AM
Summons Issued in person at customer service intake counter as to Arizona Court of Appeals, Arizona Supreme Court, Arizona, State of, Katherine Cooper, Maricopa County Superior Court on August 31, 2017. (JJH) |
|
4 | 4
misc
New Case Opened
Thu 08/31 10:33 AM
Filing fee paid, receipt number PHX188760. This case has been assigned to the Honorable G Murray Snow. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 17-2950 PHX-GMS. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (JJH) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Request by Non-Prisoner Pro Se Party for Electronic Noticing
Thu 08/31 10:31 AM
REQUEST BY NON-PRISONER PRO SE PARTY FOR ELECTRONIC NOTICING filed by Shebli Geegieh. Pro se parties must promptly notify the Clerks Office, in writing, if there is a change in designated e-mail address or mailing address. (JJH) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Thu 08/31 10:30 AM
MOTION Motion to Allow Electronic Filing by a Party Appearing Without an Attorney and Supporting Information by Shebli Geegieh. (JJH) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 08/31 10:27 AM
COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number PHX188760 filed by Shebli Geegieh.(JJH) |