SCG Atlas Ashton, LLC v. Isidro Lazaro et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Stephen V Wilson |
Referred: | Jacqueline Chooljian |
Case #: | 5:17-cv-01763 |
Nature of Suit | 371 Torts - Personal Property - Truth in Lending |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Aug 31, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 01, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 27, 2018 12:32 AM PST |
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
Yolanda Hernandez
|
|
Defendant
Isidro Lazaro
661 Stoneybrook Drive No 16
Corona, CA 92879 |
|
Plaintiff
SCG Atlas Ashton, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12 hours ago |
Thursday, September 14, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Receipt
Thu 09/14 9:58 AM
Receipt of Order of Remand filed. (mrgo) |
|
Friday, September 01, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Letter of Transmittal - Remand to Superior Court (CV-103) - optional html form
Fri 09/01 2:51 PM
TRANSMITTAL of documents to Superior Court State of CA for Riverside. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Superior Court State of CA for Riverside. (mrgo) |
|
6 | 6
order
Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60)
Fri 09/01 2:44 PM
ORDER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: denying2 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this case is hereby REMANDED. MD JS-6, Case Terminated. (mrgo) |
|
Thursday, August 31, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
transfer
Reassignment of Eastern Division Removal Case (CV-106) - optional html form
Thu 08/31 12:39 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Eastern Division Removal Case. This case was initially assigned to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and referred to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian for discovery. Pursuant to General Order 16-05, this case has been randomly reassigned to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson. The case number on all documents filed with the Court in this case should read as follows: 5:17-cv-1763-SVW-JC. (ghap) |
|
4 | 4
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Thu 08/31 12:36 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Thu 08/31 12:35 PM
CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Isidro Lazaro. (ghap) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60)
Thu 08/31 12:35 PM
REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support filed by defendant Isidro Lazaro. (ghap) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Thu 08/31 12:33 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of the State of California for the County of Riverside, case number RIC1711260 with CONFORMED FILED copy of summons and complaint. Case assigned to Judge Stephen V. Wilson, Discovery to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian., filed by defendant Isidro Lazaro. (ghap) |
|
Att: 1 CV-71 | ||
reportrecommend
Report and Recommendation (Miscellaneous)
Thu 08/31 2:31 PM
RECOMMENDATION issued by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. Re REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support2 . Proposed Order forwarded to the District Judge for approval.(dml) |