Anthony Zavala v. Whitelocke and Associates, LLC
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Dolly M Gee |
Referred: | Michael R Wilner |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-06505 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question |
Case Filed: | Sep 01, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jan 12, 2018 |
Last checked: Wednesday Feb 28, 2018 1:11 AM PST |
Defendant
Whitelocke and Associates, LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Anthony Zavala
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Friday, January 12, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
judgmentCV
Judgment
Fri 01/12 1:06 PM
JUDGMENT by Judge Dolly M. Gee. IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that judgment is entered in favor of Plaintiff Anthony Zavala and against Defendant Whitelocke and Associates, LLC in the amount of $25,000 in statutory damages and $495 in litigation costs, (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (bp) |
|
20 | 20
order
Default Judgment
Fri 01/12 1:01 PM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT19 by Judge Dolly M. Gee: Plaintiff's motion for default judgment is GRANTED. The Court will enter judgment in favor of Plaintiff Anthony Zavala and against Defendant Whitelocke & Associates, LLC, in the total amount of $25,000 in statutory damages under California Penal Code section 637.2(a)(1), and costs in the amount of $495. (bp) |
|
Friday, December 08, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
motion
Default Judgment
Fri 12/08 6:50 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Default Judgment against Defendant Whitelocke & Associates, LLC filed by Plaintiff Anthony Zavala. (Amini, Mona) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Default Judgment and Award of Costs, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration of Mona Amini in Support of Motion for Default Judgment and Award of Costs, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 4 Proof of Service | ||
Thursday, November 09, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Thu 11/09 2:32 PM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee. On November 9, 2017, the clerk entered default as to Defendant17 . The Order to Show Cause dated September 29, 201711 is hereby DISCHARGED. Plaintiff shall move for default judgment within 30 days of this order. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kti) |
|
17 | 17
order
Clerks Entry of Default (CV-37) - optional html form
Thu 11/09 11:35 AM
DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to Whitelocke & Associates, LLC. (gk) |
|
Tuesday, November 07, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Clerk to Enter Default
Tue 11/07 10:46 PM
Amended REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Whitelocke and Associates, LLC filed by Plaintiff Anthony Zavala. (Amini, Mona) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Mona Amini, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A (Complaint), | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B (Amended Proof of Service), | ||
Att: 4 Proposed Order Clerk's Entry of Default, | ||
Att: 5 Proof of Service | ||
Monday, November 06, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Mon 11/06 11:16 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Anthony Zavala, upon Defendant Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Adrianne Thomas, Authorized Person for Service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. Amended Proof of Service (Amini, Mona) |
|
Tuesday, October 24, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Tue 10/24 10:01 AM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee. The Court sua sponte continues the Order to Show Cause11 deadline to November 7, 2017. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kti) |
|
Monday, October 23, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Deficiency - Default /Default Judgment (CV-52b) - optional html form
Mon 10/23 1:36 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY Re: REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Whitelocke and Associates, LLC12 . The Clerk cannot enter the requested relief as: Proof of Service is lacking required information. Requesting party shall file a new Request/Application with noted deficiencies corrected in order to have default reconsidered. Proof of Service is lacking the State and/or Federal Statute. (lom) |
|
Friday, October 20, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Clerk to Enter Default
Fri 10/20 6:08 PM
REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Whitelocke and Associates, LLC filed by Plaintiff Anthony Zavala. (Amini, Mona) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Mona Amini, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Complaint, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B - Proof of Service of Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Proposed Order Clerk's Entry of Default, | ||
Att: 5 Proof of Service | ||
Friday, September 29, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
1
pgs
order
Order to Show Cause
Fri 09/29 12:06 PM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS)- ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Dolly M. Gee.The Court, on its own motion, orders plaintiff(s) to show cause in writing on or before October 20, 2017 why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. No oral argument of this matter will be heard unless ordered by the Court. The Order will stand submitted upon the filing of a responsive pleading or motion on or before the date upon which a response by plaintiff(s) is due. This action will be dismissed if the above-mentioned document(s) are not filed by the date indicated above. (iv) |
|
Tuesday, September 12, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Tue 09/12 6:39 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Anthony Zavala, upon Defendant Whitelocke and Associates, LLC served on 9/6/2017, answer due 9/27/2017. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Adrianne Thomas, Authorized Person of Service for Whitelocke & Associates, LLC in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Amini, Mona) |
|
Friday, September 08, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Fri 09/08 8:17 AM
INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (iv) |
|
Tuesday, September 05, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Tue 09/05 1:25 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Whitelocke and Associates, LLC. (et) |
|
7 | 7
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Tue 09/05 1:21 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Tue 09/05 1:21 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (et) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Appearance
Tue 09/05 9:44 AM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Mona Amini on behalf of Plaintiff Anthony Zavala (Attorney Mona Amini added to party Anthony Zavala(pty:pla))(Amini, Mona) |
|
Friday, September 01, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Summons Request
Fri 09/01 5:31 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Anthony Zavala. (Kazerounian, Seyed) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Fri 09/01 5:27 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Anthony Zavala, identifying Whitelocke & Associates, LLC. (Kazerounian, Seyed) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Fri 09/01 5:22 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Anthony Zavala. (Kazerounian, Seyed) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 09/01 5:20 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-20450169 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Anthony Zavala. (Attorney Seyed Abbas Kazerounian added to party Anthony Zavala(pty:pla))(Kazerounian, Seyed) |