Milner Distribution Alliance, Inc.
Colorado Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Joseph G Rosania Jr |
Case #: | 1:17-bk-18249 |
Case Filed: | Sep 05, 2017 |
Converted: | Apr 18, 2018 |
Terminated: | Dec 21, 2020 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 50-99 |
Est. Assets | $500,001 to $1 million |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Milner Distribution Alliance, Inc.
738 Synthes Ave
Monument, CO 80132-8102 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
Lynn Martinez
1123 N. Elizabeth St.
Pueblo, CO 81003 |
|
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
Byron G. Rogers Federal Building 1961 Stout St. Ste. 12-200
Denver, CO 80294 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/03/2023 7:15 PM MDT |
Tuesday, September 05, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
5
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Tue 09/05 10:17 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individual. Total Number of Creditors Uploaded: 74. Chapter 11 Plan due by 01/3/2018. Disclosure Statement due by 01/3/2018. (Weinman, Jeffrey) |
|
2 | 2
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card
Tue 09/05 10:21 AM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition- Chapter 11 17-18249 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 25144622. Fee amount 1717.00 (U.S. Treasury) |
|
3 | 3
3
pgs
misc
20 Largest Unsecured Creditors
Tue 09/05 10:30 AM
Non-Individual List of Creditors Who Have 20 Largest Unsecured Claims Against You and Are Not Insiders Filed by Jeffrey Weinman on behalf of Milner Distribution Alliance, Inc.. (Weinman, Jeffrey) |
|
4 | 4
1
pgs
misc
List of Equity Security Holders
Tue 09/05 10:36 AM
List of Equity Security Holders Filed by Jeffrey Weinman on behalf of Milner Distribution Alliance, Inc.. (Weinman, Jeffrey) |
|
5 | 5
1
pgs
misc
Corporate Ownership Statement (Rule 7007.1)
Tue 09/05 10:39 AM
Corporate Ownership Statement Filed Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 7007.1. Filed by Jeffrey Weinman on behalf of Milner Distribution Alliance, Inc.. (Weinman, Jeffrey) |
|
6 | 6
1
pgs
misc
Corporate Resolution
Tue 09/05 10:44 AM
Corporate Resolution Filed by Jeffrey Weinman on behalf of Milner Distribution Alliance, Inc.. (Weinman, Jeffrey) |
|
7 | 7
1
pgs
misc
Disclosure Regarding Receivers (Chapter 11)
Tue 09/05 10:49 AM
Disclosure Regarding Receivers Filed by Jeffrey Weinman on behalf of Milner Distribution Alliance, Inc.. (Weinman, Jeffrey) |
|
8 | 8
3
pgs
motion
Employ
Tue 09/05 3:01 PM
Application to Employ Weinman & Associates, P.C. as Counsel for Debtor-in-Possession Filed by Jeffrey Weinman on behalf of Milner Distribution Alliance, Inc.. (Weinman, Jeffrey) |
|
Att: 1 2 pgs Affidavit | ||
Att: 2 1 pgs Proposed/Unsigned Order | ||
9 | 9
3
pgs
notice
9013-1.1 Notice
Tue 09/05 3:02 PM
9013-1.1 Notice Filed by Jeffrey Weinman on behalf of Milner Distribution Alliance, Inc. .. 9013 Objections due by 9/19/2017 for8 ,. (Weinman, Jeffrey) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
10 | 10
6
pgs
motion
XOther Motion
Tue 09/05 3:06 PM
Motion For Order Establishing an Interim Compensation Procedure for All Professionals and Approving Retainer to Weinman & Associates, P.C. Filed by Jeffrey Weinman on behalf of Milner Distribution Alliance, Inc.. (Weinman, Jeffrey) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed/Unsigned Order | ||
11 | 11
notice
9013-1.1 Notice
Tue 09/05 3:07 PM
9013-1.1 Notice Filed by Jeffrey Weinman on behalf of Milner Distribution Alliance, Inc. .. 9013 Objections due by 9/19/2017 for10 ,. (Weinman, Jeffrey) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Tue 09/05 3:59 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Daniel J. Morse on behalf of US Trustee... (Morse, Daniel) |
|
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Tue 09/05 4:20 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Matthew T. Faga on behalf of CoBiz Bank d/b/a/ Colorado Business Bank... (Faga, Matthew) |