Yosi Samra, Inc.
New York Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Shelley C Chapman |
Case #: | 1:17-bk-12493 |
Case Filed: | Sep 05, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 02, 2021 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 50-99 |
Est. Assets | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Yosi Samra, Inc.
530 Fashion Ave Fl M1
New York, NY 10018-4878 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee U.S. Federal Office Building 201 Varick Street, Room 1006
New York, NY 10014 |
Docket last updated: 09/04/2017 8:00 PM EDT |
Tuesday, September 05, 2017 | ||
crditcrd
Auto - docket of credit card
Tue 09/05 5:54 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 17-12493 [misc,824] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 12069011. Fee amount 1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
1 | 1
12
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Tue 09/05 5:53 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individual. Order for Relief Entered. Chapter 11 Plan due by 1/3/2018, Disclosure Statement due by 1/3/2018, Initial Case Conference due by 10/5/2017, Filed by Vincent J. Roldan of Ballon Stoll Bader & Nadler P.C. on behalf of Yosi Samra, Inc.. (Roldan, Vincent) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Schedules
Tue 09/05 5:57 PM
Schedules filed: Schedule A/B - Non-Individual, Schedule C - Non-Individual, Schedule D - Non-Individual, Schedule E/F - Non-Individual, Schedule G - Non-Individual, Schedule H - Non-Individual Filed by Vincent J. Roldan on behalf of Yosi Samra, Inc.. (Roldan, Vincent) |
|
3 | 3
5
pgs
misc
Affidavit
Tue 09/05 6:01 PM
Affidavit of Yosi Samra Pursuant To Local Bankruptcy Rule 1007-2 Filed by Vincent J. Roldan on behalf of Yosi Samra, Inc..(Roldan, Vincent) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A 20 largest unsecured creditors | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B Secured creditors | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C Budget |