BOLD ALLIANCE et al v. FEDERAL ENERGY REGULATORY COMMISSION et al
District Of Columbia District Court | |
Judge: | Richard J Leon |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-01822 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question |
Case Filed: | Sep 05, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 28, 2018 |
Last checked: Sunday Mar 04, 2018 3:43 AM EST |
Defendant
ATLANTIC COAST PIPELINE LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
FEDERAL ENERGY REGULATORY COMMISSION
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
ROBERT POWELSON
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
MOUNTAIN VALLEY PIPELINE
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
NEIL CHATTERJEE
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
CHERYL A. LAFLEUR
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
SHAHIR KASSAM-ADAMS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
SUSAN LAZERSON
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
TODD RATH
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
KATHERINE A. QUINN
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
FRANK S. QUINN
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
WILLIAM S. MOORE
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JOE POLAND
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
KEN NORWOOD
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ANNE NORWOOD
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
NEWPORT DEVELOPMENT COMPANY, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
WADE A. NEELY
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ELIZABETH G. NEELY
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
KATHERINE MCLEAN
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JAMES MCLEAN
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
WILLIAM MAKI
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
EJ MAKI
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
CAROLYN MAKI
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JACQUELINE J. LUCKI
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
LYNN LIMPERT
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
BILL LIMPERT
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ANNE WAY
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JONATHAN ANSELL
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
CAROL M. MOORE
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
FRIENDS OF NELSON COUNTY
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
KAREN M. YOLTON
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
DAVID G. YOLTON
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
W. MARVIN WINSTEAD, JR.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
KEITH WILSON
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
BRENDA LYNN WILLIAMS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
DAVE J. WERNER
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
BETTY B. WERNER
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
LOUIS RAVINA
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ROBERT TURNER
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
HERSHEL SPEARS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
DARLENE SPEARS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
CLIFFORD A. SHAFFER
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
CLIFFORD SAVELL
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
MARY ELLEN RIVES
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
HAZEL RHAMES
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
IAN ELLIOTT REILLY
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
CAROLYN ELIZABETH REILLY
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
YVETTE RAVINA
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
BOLD EDUCATION FUND
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JANE EMBREY
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JERRY DEPLAZES
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JEROLYN DEPLAZES
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
REBECCA J. DAMERON
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
MIKE CRAIG
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
MARY E. COFFEY
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
BRUCE M. COFFEY
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
MARGARET S. BUFORD
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
GUY W. BUFORD
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
REINHARD BOUMAN
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ASHOFTEH BOUMAN
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
WALTER EMBREY
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
BOLD ALLIANCE
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JACQUELINE BISCARDI
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
FRANK BISCARDI
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
STEPHEN BERNARD
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
VICTOR BAUM
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
LORA BAUM
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
STEPHANIE BARTON
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
NANCY L. AVERY
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
RICHARD (DICK) AVERITT, III
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
DAWN AVERITT
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
RANDY FORBES
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
DEMIAN K JACKSON
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
BENNY L. HUFFMAN
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
HORIZONS VILLAGE PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
TAMARA HODSDEN
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
GEORGIA HAVERTY
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JAMES A. HARDEE
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
BRIDGET K HAMRE
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JAMES GORE
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
KAROLYN W. GIVENS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
CLARENCE B. GIVENS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
SERINA GARST
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
NANCY KASSAM-ADAMS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
KATHLEEN FORBES
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
WENDELL FLORA
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
STEPHANIE M. FLORA
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
MARY FLORA
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
CHARLES F. FLORA
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
CAROLYN FISCHER
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
WADE RAYMOND FINCH
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
PEARL L FINCH
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
HEATHER LOUISE FINCH
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
PAMELA FARNHAM
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Thursday, November 01, 2018 | ||
appeal
USCA Case Number
Thu 11/01 5:55 PM
USCA Case Number 18-5322 for35 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court, filed by HEATHER LOUISE FINCH, GUY W. BUFORD, KATHLEEN FORBES, BENNY L. HUFFMAN, STEPHANIE M. FLORA, CAROLYN ELIZABETH REILLY, W. MARVIN WINSTEAD, JR., BILL LIMPERT, CLARENCE B. GIVENS, LYNN LIMPERT, WADE A. NEELY, JAMES A. HARDEE, ANNE NORWOOD, WENDELL FLORA, RANDY FORBES, NEWPORT DEVELOPMENT COMPANY, LLC, KEITH WILSON, DEMIAN K JACKSON, RICHARD (DICK) AVERITT, III, JAMES MCLEAN, MARY E. COFFEY, NANCY KASSAM-ADAMS, WADE RAYMOND FINCH, CLIFFORD SAVELL, EJ MAKI, JAMES GORE, JANE EMBREY, DAVE J. WERNER, JOE POLAND, BRIDGET K HAMRE, CLIFFORD A. SHAFFER, STEPHANIE BARTON, DARLENE SPEARS, SHAHIR KASSAM-ADAMS, JONATHAN ANSELL, PEARL L FINCH, REINHARD BOUMAN, CHARLES F. FLORA, BETTY B. WERNER, HERSHEL SPEARS, DAWN AVERITT, YVETTE RAVINA, MARY ELLEN RIVES, BRENDA LYNN WILLIAMS, CAROLYN FISCHER, JACQUELINE J. LUCKI, NANCY L. AVERY, STEPHEN BERNARD, HAZEL RHAMES, CAROL M. MOORE, MIKE CRAIG, KATHERINE A. QUINN, BOLD EDUCATION FUND, DAVID G. YOLTON, VICTOR BAUM, KAREN M. YOLTON, KEN NORWOOD, FRIENDS OF NELSON COUNTY, ANNE WAY, LORA BAUM, LOUIS RAVINA, KATHERINE MCLEAN, JEROLYN DEPLAZES, JACQUELINE BISCARDI, ASHOFTEH BOUMAN, SUSAN LAZERSON, ROBERT TURNER, IAN ELLIOTT REILLY, FRANK BISCARDI, WALTER EMBREY, PAMELA FARNHAM, MARY FLORA, TAMARA HODSDEN, WILLIAM S. MOORE, BOLD ALLIANCE, WILLIAM MAKI, BRUCE M. COFFEY, CAROLYN MAKI, FRANK S. QUINN, ELIZABETH G. NEELY, MARGARET S. BUFORD, SERINA GARST, REBECCA J. DAMERON, GEORGIA HAVERTY, TODD RATH, KAROLYN W. GIVENS, HORIZONS VILLAGE PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION, JERRY DEPLAZES. (zrdj) |
||
Monday, October 29, 2018 | ||
36 | 36
appeal
Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA
Mon 10/29 2:44 PM
Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed (Memorandum Opinion), and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The Court of Appeals fee was paid this date re35 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court. (jf) |
|
Friday, October 26, 2018 | ||
35 | 35
appeal
Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit
Fri 10/26 10:15 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL TO DC CIRCUIT COURT by JONATHAN ANSELL, DAWN AVERITT, RICHARD (DICK) AVERITT, III, NANCY L. AVERY, STEPHANIE BARTON, LORA BAUM, VICTOR BAUM, STEPHEN BERNARD, FRANK BISCARDI, JACQUELINE BISCARDI, BOLD ALLIANCE, BOLD EDUCATION FUND, ASHOFTEH BOUMAN, REINHARD BOUMAN, GUY W. BUFORD, MARGARET S. BUFORD, BRUCE M. COFFEY, MARY E. COFFEY, MIKE CRAIG, REBECCA J. DAMERON, JEROLYN DEPLAZES, JERRY DEPLAZES, JANE EMBREY, WALTER EMBREY, PAMELA FARNHAM, HEATHER LOUISE FINCH, PEARL L FINCH, WADE RAYMOND FINCH, CAROLYN FISCHER, CHARLES F. FLORA, MARY FLORA, STEPHANIE M. FLORA, WENDELL FLORA, KATHLEEN FORBES, RANDY FORBES, FRIENDS OF NELSON COUNTY, SERINA GARST, CLARENCE B. GIVENS, KAROLYN W. GIVENS, JAMES GORE, BRIDGET K HAMRE, JAMES A. HARDEE, GEORGIA HAVERTY, TAMARA HODSDEN, HORIZONS VILLAGE PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION, BENNY L. HUFFMAN, DEMIAN K JACKSON, NANCY KASSAM-ADAMS, SHAHIR KASSAM-ADAMS, SUSAN LAZERSON, BILL LIMPERT, LYNN LIMPERT, JACQUELINE J. LUCKI, CAROLYN MAKI, EJ MAKI, WILLIAM MAKI, JAMES MCLEAN, KATHERINE MCLEAN, CAROL M. MOORE, WILLIAM S. MOORE, ELIZABETH G. NEELY, WADE A. NEELY, NEWPORT DEVELOPMENT COMPANY, LLC, ANNE NORWOOD, KEN NORWOOD, JOE POLAND, FRANK S. QUINN, KATHERINE A. QUINN, TODD RATH, LOUIS RAVINA, YVETTE RAVINA, CAROLYN ELIZABETH REILLY, IAN ELLIOTT REILLY, HAZEL RHAMES, MARY ELLEN RIVES, CLIFFORD SAVELL, CLIFFORD A. SHAFFER, DARLENE SPEARS, HERSHEL SPEARS, ROBERT TURNER, ANNE WAY, BETTY B. WERNER, DAVE J. WERNER, BRENDA LYNN WILLIAMS, KEITH WILSON, W. MARVIN WINSTEAD, JR, DAVID G. YOLTON, KAREN M. YOLTON. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0090-5761742. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Elefant, Carolyn) |
|
Friday, September 28, 2018 | ||
34 | 34
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
Fri 09/28 11:34 AM
ORDER. For the reasons stated in the accompanying Memorandum Opinion, Federal Defendants'20 Motion to Dismiss plaintiffs' Amended Complaint is GRANTED. Defendant Mountain Valley Pipeline's21 Motion to Dismiss plaintiff's Amended Complaint; defendant Atlantic Coast Pipeline's22 Motion to Dismiss plaintiff's Amended Complaint; Federal Defendants'11 Motion to Dismiss plaintiff's original Complaint; and Mountain Valley Pipeline's16 Motion to Dismiss plaintiff's original Complaint, are each DENIED as MOOT. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 9/27/2018. (jth) |
|
33 | 33
12
pgs
order
Memorandum & Opinion
Fri 09/28 11:23 AM
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 9/27/2018. (jth) |
|
Tuesday, September 11, 2018 | ||
32 | 32
notice
Notice of Supplemental Authority
Tue 09/11 1:11 PM
NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by BOLD ALLIANCE, BOLD EDUCATION FUND (Elefant, Carolyn) |
|
Wednesday, August 08, 2018 | ||
31 | 31
notice
Notice of Related Case
Wed 08/08 11:14 AM
NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by MOUNTAIN VALLEY PIPELINE. Case related to Case No. 18-1216 (McBride, Michael) |
|
Monday, July 30, 2018 | ||
30 | 30
notice
Notice of Supplemental Authority
Mon 07/30 1:33 PM
NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by NEIL CHATTERJEE, FEDERAL ENERGY REGULATORY COMMISSION, CHERYL A. LAFLEUR, ROBERT POWELSON (Viswanathan, Anand) |
|
Thursday, March 01, 2018 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Expedite Order on Motion for Hearing
Thu 03/01 10:06 AM
MINUTE ORDER denying29 Motion to Expedite; denying29 Motion for Hearing. Upon consideration of29 Plaintiffs' Request for an Oral Hearing and to Expedite Consideration of Defendants' Motions to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint, it is hereby ORDERED that the29 Motion to Expedite is DENIED and the29 Motion for Hearing is DENIED. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 3/1/2018. (lcrjl2) |
||
Friday, February 23, 2018 | ||
29 | 29
motion
Expedite
Fri 02/23 11:28 PM
MOTION to Expedite by BOLD ALLIANCE, BOLD EDUCATION FUND(Elefant, Carolyn) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support | ||
Monday, January 29, 2018 | ||
28 | 28
respm
Reply to opposition to motion
Mon 01/29 6:18 PM
REPLY to opposition to motion re22 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by ATLANTIC COAST PIPELINE LLC. (Stetson, Catherine) |
|
27 | 27
respm
Reply to opposition to motion
Mon 01/29 2:54 PM
REPLY to opposition to motion re20 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint filed by NEIL CHATTERJEE, FEDERAL ENERGY REGULATORY COMMISSION, CHERYL A. LAFLEUR, ROBERT POWELSON. (Viswanathan, Anand) |
|
26 | 26
respm
Reply to opposition to motion
Mon 01/29 11:42 AM
REPLY to opposition to motion re21 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by MOUNTAIN VALLEY PIPELINE. (McBride, Michael) |
|
Monday, January 22, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
30+
pgs
respm
Memorandum in opposition to motion
Mon 01/22 10:56 PM
Memorandum in opposition to re21 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint ,22 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ,20 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint filed by BOLD ALLIANCE, BOLD EDUCATION FUND. (Elefant, Carolyn) |
|
Wednesday, January 17, 2018 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Wed 01/17 4:12 PM
MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of24 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time for Filing Opposition as to21 Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint,22 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, and20 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint, it is hereby ORDERED that24 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time for Filing Opposition is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Opposition to the Motion(s) is due by January 22, 2018. Defendants' Reply(s) in support of the Motion(s) are due by January 29, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 1/17/2018.(lcrjl2) Modified on 1/17/2018 to indicated that this is a minute/paperless order, and that defendants' replies, not responses, are due on 1/29/2018. (jth) |
||
Tuesday, January 16, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Tue 01/16 3:18 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to21 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint ,22 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ,20 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint by BOLD ALLIANCE, BOLD EDUCATION FUND (Elefant, Carolyn) |
|
Wednesday, January 03, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
notice
LCvR 7.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests
Wed 01/03 10:40 AM
LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by ATLANTIC COAST PIPELINE LLC (Stetson, Catherine) |
|
22 | 22
motion
Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
Wed 01/03 10:39 AM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by ATLANTIC COAST PIPELINE LLC(Stetson, Catherine) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, January 02, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
motion
Dismiss
Tue 01/02 12:52 PM
MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint by MOUNTAIN VALLEY PIPELINE(McBride, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, December 21, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
motion
Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
Thu 12/21 11:32 AM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint by NEIL CHATTERJEE, FEDERAL ENERGY REGULATORY COMMISSION, CHERYL A. LAFLEUR, ROBERT POWELSON (Viswanathan, Anand) |
|
Thursday, November 09, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Scheduling Order Set/Reset Deadlines
Thu 11/09 11:35 AM
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of18 Unopposed Motion to Adopt Parties' Proposed Schedule for Amendment of Complaint and Dispositive Motions, and upon consideration of19 Amended Complaint, it is hereby ORDERED that the Amended Complaint is accepted as timely filed on November 3, 2017. It is further ORDERED that defendants' motion(s) to dismiss are due by January 3, 2018; that plaintiffs' opposition to the motion(s) is due by January 17, 2018; and that defendants' response(s) in support of the motion(s) are due by January 24, 2018. This schedule supersedes any earlier deadlines previously agreed to by the parties. All other deadlines in the case, including the Rule 26 conference, are suspended. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 11/09/2017. (lcrjl2) |
||
Friday, November 03, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
cmp
Amended Complaint
Fri 11/03 11:31 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs filed by CLIFFORD SAVELL, SUSAN LAZERSON, IAN ELLIOTT REILLY, HORIZONS VILLAGE PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION, KAREN M. YOLTON, JAMES MCLEAN, WENDELL FLORA, HEATHER LOUISE FINCH, VICTOR BAUM, CLARENCE B. GIVENS, PAMELA FARNHAM, HAZEL RHAMES, JEROLYN DEPLAZES, WADE RAYMOND FINCH, WALTER EMBREY, REINHARD BOUMAN, WILLIAM S. MOORE, TAMARA HODSDEN, STEPHANIE M. FLORA, BRIDGET K HAMRE, YVETTE RAVINA, W. MARVIN WINSTEAD, JR, LYNN LIMPERT, RICHARD (DICK) AVERITT, III, REBECCA J. DAMERON, ANNE WAY, MIKE CRAIG, MARGARET S. BUFORD, DAVE J. WERNER, KATHLEEN FORBES, GEORGIA HAVERTY, NANCY KASSAM-ADAMS, CAROLYN ELIZABETH REILLY, ROBERT TURNER, FRANK S. QUINN, SERINA GARST, MARY FLORA, CHARLES F. FLORA, CLIFFORD A. SHAFFER, BETTY B. WERNER, JOE POLAND, KAROLYN W. GIVENS, DEMIAN K JACKSON, JAMES GORE, GUY W. BUFORD, BENNY L. HUFFMAN, JERRY DEPLAZES, MARY E. COFFEY, DAVID G. YOLTON, BRUCE M. COFFEY, LORA BAUM, BOLD EDUCATION FUND, BOLD ALLIANCE, TODD RATH, FRANK BISCARDI, PEARL L FINCH, RANDY FORBES, JACQUELINE BISCARDI, JANE EMBREY, SHAHIR KASSAM-ADAMS, DARLENE SPEARS, KATHERINE A. QUINN, JACQUELINE J. LUCKI, CAROL M. MOORE, STEPHEN BERNARD, CAROLYN FISCHER, NEWPORT DEVELOPMENT COMPANY, LLC, KEITH WILSON, STEPHANIE BARTON, ANNE NORWOOD, DAWN AVERITT, HERSHEL SPEARS, KEN NORWOOD, EJ MAKI, ASHOFTEH BOUMAN, FRIENDS OF NELSON COUNTY, WADE A. NEELY, BRENDA LYNN WILLIAMS, LOUIS RAVINA, MARY ELLEN RIVES, NANCY L. AVERY, KATHERINE MCLEAN, CAROLYN MAKI, BILL LIMPERT, ELIZABETH G. NEELY, JAMES A. HARDEE, WILLIAM MAKI.(Elefant, Carolyn) |
|
Att: 1 MarkUpComplaint, | ||
Att: 2 Cover Letter | ||
Friday, October 27, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Scheduling Order
Fri 10/27 5:18 PM
MOTION for Scheduling Order by JONATHAN ANSELL, DAWN AVERITT, RICHARD (DICK) AVERITT, III, NANCY L. AVERY, STEPHANIE BARTON, LORA BAUM, VICTOR BAUM, STEPHEN BERNARD, FRANK BISCARDI, JACQUELINE BISCARDI, BOLD ALLIANCE, BOLD EDUCATION FUND, ASHOFTEH BOUMAN, REINHARD BOUMAN, GUY W. BUFORD, MARGARET S. BUFORD, BRUCE M. COFFEY, MARY E. COFFEY, MIKE CRAIG, REBECCA J. DAMERON, JEROLYN DEPLAZES, JERRY DEPLAZES, JANE EMBREY, WALTER EMBREY, PAMELA FARNHAM, HEATHER LOUISE FINCH, PEARL L FINCH, WADE RAYMOND FINCH, CAROLYN FISCHER, CHARLES F. FLORA, MARY FLORA, STEPHANIE M. FLORA, WENDELL FLORA, KATHLEEN FORBES, RANDY FORBES, FRIENDS OF NELSON COUNTY, SERINA GARST, CLARENCE B. GIVENS, KAROLYN W. GIVENS, JAMES GORE, BRIDGET K HAMRE, JAMES A. HARDEE, GEORGIA HAVERTY, TAMARA HODSDEN, HORIZONS VILLAGE PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION, BENNY L. HUFFMAN, DEMIAN K JACKSON, NANCY KASSAM-ADAMS, SHAHIR KASSAM-ADAMS, SUSAN LAZERSON, BILL LIMPERT, LYNN LIMPERT, JACQUELINE J. LUCKI, CAROLYN MAKI, EJ MAKI, WILLIAM MAKI, JAMES MCLEAN, KATHERINE MCLEAN, CAROL M. MOORE, WILLIAM S. MOORE, ELIZABETH G. NEELY, WADE A. NEELY, NEWPORT DEVELOPMENT COMPANY, LLC, ANNE NORWOOD, KEN NORWOOD, JOE POLAND, FRANK S. QUINN, KATHERINE A. QUINN, TODD RATH, LOUIS RAVINA, YVETTE RAVINA, CAROLYN ELIZABETH REILLY, IAN ELLIOTT REILLY, HAZEL RHAMES, MARY ELLEN RIVES, CLIFFORD SAVELL, CLIFFORD A. SHAFFER, DARLENE SPEARS, HERSHEL SPEARS, ROBERT TURNER, ANNE WAY, BETTY B. WERNER, DAVE J. WERNER, BRENDA LYNN WILLIAMS, KEITH WILSON, W. MARVIN WINSTEAD, JR, DAVID G. YOLTON, KAREN M. YOLTON(Elefant, Carolyn) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, October 26, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Set/Reset Deadlines
Thu 10/26 10:18 AM
MINUTE ORDER granting17 Unopposed Motion to Suspend Deadline for Response. It is hereby ORDERED that Bold Alliance, et al.'s deadline to respond to defendant Mountain Valley Pipeline's motion to dismiss, now set for October 25, 2017, is temporarily suspended nunc pro tunc ; and it is further ORDERED that the parties shall jointly submit a proposed schedule to govern this case by October 31, 2017. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 10/26/2017. (lcrjl2) |
||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Thu 10/26 2:58 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Schedule due by 10/31/2017. (tb) |
||
Monday, October 23, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Mon 10/23 8:03 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to11 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss by FRANK BISCARDI, JACQUELINE BISCARDI, BOLD ALLIANCE, BOLD EDUCATION FUND, ASHOFTEH BOUMAN, REINHARD BOUMAN, GUY W. BUFORD, MARGARET S. BUFORD, BRUCE M. COFFEY, MARY E. COFFEY, MIKE CRAIG, REBECCA J. DAMERON, JEROLYN DEPLAZES, JERRY DEPLAZES, JANE EMBREY, WALTER EMBREY, PAMELA FARNHAM, HEATHER LOUISE FINCH, PEARL L FINCH, WADE RAYMOND FINCH, CAROLYN FISCHER, CHARLES F. FLORA, MARY FLORA, STEPHANIE M. FLORA, WENDELL FLORA, KATHLEEN FORBES, RANDY FORBES, FRIENDS OF NELSON COUNTY, SERINA GARST, CLARENCE B. GIVENS, KAROLYN W. GIVENS, JAMES GORE, BRIDGET K HAMRE, JAMES A. HARDEE, GEORGIA HAVERTY, TAMARA HODSDEN, HORIZONS VILLAGE PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION, BENNY L. HUFFMAN, DEMIAN K JACKSON, NANCY KASSAM-ADAMS, SHAHIR KASSAM-ADAMS, SUSAN LAZERSON, BILL LIMPERT, LYNN LIMPERT, JACQUELINE J. LUCKI, CAROLYN MAKI, EJ MAKI, WILLIAM MAKI, JAMES MCLEAN, KATHERINE MCLEAN, CAROL M. MOORE, WILLIAM S. MOORE, ELIZABETH G. NEELY, WADE A. NEELY, NEWPORT DEVELOPMENT COMPANY, LLC, ANNE NORWOOD, KEN NORWOOD, JOE POLAND, FRANK S. QUINN, KATHERINE A. QUINN, TODD RATH, LOUIS RAVINA, YVETTE RAVINA, CAROLYN ELIZABETH REILLY, IAN ELLIOTT REILLY, HAZEL RHAMES, MARY ELLEN RIVES, CLIFFORD SAVELL, CLIFFORD A. SHAFFER, DARLENE SPEARS, HERSHEL SPEARS, ROBERT TURNER, ANNE WAY, BETTY B. WERNER, DAVE J. WERNER, BRENDA LYNN WILLIAMS, KEITH WILSON, W. MARVIN WINSTEAD, JR, DAVID G. YOLTON, KAREN M. YOLTON(Elefant, Carolyn) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Suspension | ||
Friday, October 20, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
Fri 10/20 3:15 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by NEIL CHATTERJEE, FEDERAL ENERGY REGULATORY COMMISSION, CHERYL A. LAFLEUR, ROBERT POWELSON (Viswanathan, Anand) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Fri 10/20 10:10 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer/Response to plaintiff's original complaint due by 11/1/2017. (gdf) |
||
Thursday, October 19, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
order
Standing Order
Thu 10/19 6:43 PM
STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 10/19/2017. (lcrjl2) |
|
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Thu 10/19 10:00 AM
MINUTE ORDER granting14 Defendant Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC's Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Original Complaint. It is hereby ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. Atlantic Coast Pipeline's time to respond to plaintiffs' original complaint is extended to and includes November 1, 2017. If plaintiffs file an amended complaint, the parties' time to respond will be governed by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15(a)(3). SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 10/19/2017. (lcrjl2, ) |
||
Wednesday, October 18, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Wed 10/18 3:21 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Complaint by ATLANTIC COAST PIPELINE LLC(Stetson, Catherine) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, October 17, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 10/17 2:34 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Anand Ram Viswanathan on behalf of FEDERAL ENERGY REGULATORY COMMISSION (Viswanathan, Anand) |
|
Friday, October 13, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Fri 10/13 10:55 AM
MINUTE ORDER granting9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. It is hereby ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. Attorney Wade W. Massie may appear as counsel for defendant Mountain Valley Pipeline, LLC in this case. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 10/13/2017. (lcrjl2) |
||
Wednesday, October 11, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 10/11 3:29 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas Monroe Gladd on behalf of NEIL CHATTERJEE, FEDERAL ENERGY REGULATORY COMMISSION, CHERYL A. LAFLEUR, ROBERT POWELSON (Gladd, Nicholas) |
|
11 | 11
motion
Dismiss
Wed 10/11 2:45 PM
MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss by MOUNTAIN VALLEY PIPELINE(McBride, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
10 | 10
notice
LCvR 7.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests
Wed 10/11 2:37 PM
LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by MOUNTAIN VALLEY PIPELINE (McBride, Michael) |
|
9 | 9
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 10/11 2:31 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Wade Wallihan Massie, :Firm- Penn, Stuart & Eskridge, :Address- P.O. Box 2288, Abington, Virginia 24212. Phone No. - 276-623-4409. Fax No. - 276-628-5621 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5154295. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by MOUNTAIN VALLEY PIPELINE(McBride, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 10/11 2:10 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Flynn McBride on behalf of MOUNTAIN VALLEY PIPELINE (McBride, Michael) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 10/11 2:03 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Dennis O'Neill on behalf of MOUNTAIN VALLEY PIPELINE (O'Neill, Brian) |
|
Thursday, September 28, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 09/28 2:06 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Sean Marotta on behalf of ATLANTIC COAST PIPELINE LLC (Marotta, Sean) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 09/28 2:03 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Benjamin Wolinsky on behalf of ATLANTIC COAST PIPELINE LLC (Wolinsky, Robert) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 09/28 2:00 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Catherine Emily Stetson on behalf of ATLANTIC COAST PIPELINE LLC (Stetson, Catherine) |
|
Friday, September 08, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
service
Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG
Fri 09/08 5:55 PM
SUMMONS (8) Issued Electronically as to ATLANTIC COAST PIPELINE LLC, NEIL CHATTERJEE, FEDERAL ENERGY REGULATORY COMMISSION, CHERYL A. LAFLEUR, MOUNTAIN VALLEY PIPELINE, ROBERT POWELSON, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General(sth) |
|
Att: 1 Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Summons, | ||
Att: 5 Summons, | ||
Att: 6 Summons, | ||
Att: 7 Summons, | ||
Att: 8 Summons | ||
Tuesday, September 05, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
notice
LCvR 7.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests
Fri 09/08 5:18 PM
LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JONATHAN ANSELL, DAWN AVERITT, RICHARD (DICK) AVERITT, III, NANCY L. AVERY, STEPHANIE BARTON, LORA BAUM, VICTOR BAUM, STEPHEN BERNARD, FRANK BISCARDI, JACQUELINE BISCARDI, BOLD ALLIANCE, BOLD EDUCATION FUND, ASHOFTEH BOUMAN, REINHARD BOUMAN, GUY W. BUFORD, MARGARET S. BUFORD, BRUCE M. COFFEY, MARY E. COFFEY, MIKE CRAIG, REBECCA J. DAMERON, JEROLYN DEPLAZES, JERRY DEPLAZES, JANE EMBREY, WALTER EMBREY, PAMELA FARNHAM, HEATHER LOUISE FINCH, PEARL L FINCH, WADE RAYMOND FINCH, CAROLYN FISCHER, CHARLES F. FLORA, MARY FLORA, STEPHANIE M. FLORA, WENDELL FLORA, KATHLEEN FORBES, RANDY FORBES, FRIENDS OF NELSON, SERINA GARST, CLARENCE B. GIVENS, KAROLYN W. GIVENS, JAMES GORE, BRIDGET K HAMRE, JAMES A. HARDEE, GEORGIA HAVERTY, TAMARA HODSDEN, HORIZONS VILLAGE PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION, BENNY L. HUFFMAN, DEMIAN K JACKSON, NANCY KASSAM-ADAMS, SHAHIR KASSAM-ADAMS, SUSAN LAZERSON, BILL LIMPERT, LYNN LIMPERT, JACQUELINE J. LUCKI, CAROLYN MAKI, EJ MAKI, WILLIAM MAKI, JAMES MCLEAN, KATHERINE MCLEAN, ELIZABETH G. NEELY, WADE A. NEELY, NEWPORT DEVELOPMENT COMPANY, LLC, ANNE NORWOOD, KEN NORWOOD, JOE POLAND, FRANK S. QUINN, KATHERINE A. QUINN, TODD RATH, LOUIS RAVINA, YVETTE RAVINA, CAROLYN ELIZABETH REILLY, IAN ELLIOTT REILLY, HAZEL RHAMES, MARY ELLEN RIVES, CLIFFORD SAVELL, CLIFFORD A. SHAFFER, DARLENE SPEARS, HERSHEL SPEARS, THE MOORE REVOCABLE TRUST, ROBERT TURNER, ANNE WAY, BETTY B. WERNER, DAVE J. WERNER, BRENDA LYNN WILLIAMS, KEITH WILSON, W. MARVIN WINSTEAD, JR, DAVID G. YOLTON, KAREN M. YOLTON (sth) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 09/05 5:32 PM
COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5102854) filed by CLIFFORD SAVELL, SUSAN LAZERSON, IAN ELLIOTT REILLY, HORIZONS VILLAGE PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION, KAREN M. YOLTON, JAMES MCLEAN, WENDELL FLORA, HEATHER LOUISE FINCH, VICTOR BAUM, CLARENCE B. GIVENS, PAMELA FARNHAM, HAZEL RHAMES, JEROLYN DEPLAZES, WADE RAYMOND FINCH, WALTER EMBREY, REINHARD BOUMAN, TAMARA HODSDEN, STEPHANIE M. FLORA, BRIDGET K HAMRE, YVETTE RAVINA, W. MARVIN WINSTEAD, JR, LYNN LIMPERT, RICHARD (DICK) AVERITT, III, REBECCA J. DAMERON, ANNE WAY, MIKE CRAIG, MARGARET S. BUFORD, DAVE J. WERNER, KATHLEEN FORBES, GEORGIA HAVERTY, NANCY KASSAM-ADAMS, CAROLYN ELIZABETH REILLY, ROBERT TURNER, THE MOORE REVOCABLE TRUST, FRANK S. QUINN, JONATHAN ANSELL, SERINA GARST, MARY FLORA, CHARLES F. FLORA, CLIFFORD A. SHAFFER, BETTY B. WERNER, JOE POLAND, KAROLYN W. GIVENS, DEMIAN K JACKSON, JAMES GORE, GUY W. BUFORD, BENNY L. HUFFMAN, JERRY DEPLAZES, MARY E. COFFEY, DAVID G. YOLTON, BRUCE M. COFFEY, LORA BAUM, BOLD EDUCATION FUND, BOLD ALLIANCE, TODD RATH, FRANK BISCARDI, PEARL L FINCH, RANDY FORBES, JACQUELINE BISCARDI, JANE EMBREY, SHAHIR KASSAM-ADAMS, DARLENE SPEARS, KATHERINE A. QUINN, JACQUELINE J. LUCKI, STEPHEN BERNARD, CAROLYN FISCHER, NEWPORT DEVELOPMENT COMPANY, LLC, KEITH WILSON, STEPHANIE BARTON, ANNE NORWOOD, DAWN AVERITT, HERSHEL SPEARS, KEN NORWOOD, EJ MAKI, ASHOFTEH BOUMAN, FRIENDS OF NELSON, WADE A. NEELY, BRENDA LYNN WILLIAMS, LOUIS RAVINA, MARY ELLEN RIVES, NANCY L. AVERY, KATHERINE MCLEAN, CAROLYN MAKI, BILL LIMPERT, ELIZABETH G. NEELY, JAMES A. HARDEE, WILLIAM MAKI.(Elefant, Carolyn) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Certificate Rule LCvR 7.1, | ||
Att: 3 Summons FERC, | ||
Att: 4 Summons Chairman Chatterjee, | ||
Att: 5 Summons Comm'r. LaFleur, | ||
Att: 6 Summons Comm'r. Powelson, | ||
Att: 7 Summons Atlantic Coast Pipeline LLC, | ||
Att: 8 Summons Mountain Valley Pipeline, | ||
Att: 9 Summons U.S. Attorney General, | ||
Att: 10 Summons U.S. Attorney's Office | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Fri 09/08 5:22 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Richard J. Leon. (sth) |