BOBO et al v. BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Pennsylvania Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Juan R Sanchez |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-03968 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Sep 05, 2017 |
Re-opened: | Apr 17, 2023 |
Terminated: | Apr 17, 2023 |
Last checked: Sunday Mar 04, 2018 4:39 AM EST |
Defendant
BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
CARMINA REYES
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ROSENA PATTERSON
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
DAVID OATES
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
TIFFANY MESSENGER
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
STEPHANIE LOUCKS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
DUSTIN LOUCKS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
HAROLD KIRKHAM
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
CHIMENE KIRKHAM
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
RONALD HUGHES
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
SHELLY HOWARD
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
RONNINE HERNANDEZ
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JESSICA HERNANDEZ
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
MISCHELL HALL
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
WEINA SAMPSON
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
CRYSTAL THORNTON
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
GREG THORNTON
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
CHRISTY TURNER
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
MICHELLE VAUGHN
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
DARLENE VERNO
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
CASAUNDRA WIGGINS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ELISHA WILBORN
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
MARC WISE
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JACLYN GERLACH
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ELLEN BALL
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
MIKESHA BARNETT
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
MADLYNE BOBO
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
CYNTHIA BOYD
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
TITIANA BROOKS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
DANIEL BURKE
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
MAUREEN BURTON
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
SHAREKA CARLEY
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
DAWN CARPENTER
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
RICHARD CARPENTER
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
MARCUS CHANDLER
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
THERESA CHANDLER
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
EMA HERNANDEZ
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
SABRINA COLDING
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
CATHERINE COOPER
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JANE CUEVAS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
DOMONIQUE DANTZLER
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
RECO DAVIS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
KEANUA FELTON
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JARMAIN FRANKLIN
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
KATIE FRYE
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
MICHAEL GOLDEN
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
SHANNON GOLDEN
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JACQUELINE GOSE
|
Represented By
|
Unrepresented Party
BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
100 BAYER BOULEVARD
WHIPPANY, NJ 07981 |
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Plaintiff
MONIQUE QUEVEDO
Terminated: 02/07/2018
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
VANESSA OATES
Terminated: 02/07/2018
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
DYANNA LUCAS
Terminated: 11/14/2017
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
DENEACE WALKER
Terminated: 02/07/2018
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ANDREA WILKSINSON
Terminated: 11/14/2017
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JENNIFER WISE
Terminated: 02/07/2018
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
MICHELLE BURKE
Terminated: 02/07/2018
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ODESSA CHARBONEAU
Terminated: 11/14/2017
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
GEORGIA BENJAMIN
Terminated: 02/07/2018
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
AMANDA BURNS
Terminated: 02/07/2018
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
SHANIA CLARKE
Terminated: 02/07/2018
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
EUGENA DAVIS
Terminated: 02/07/2018
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
DARYALE FRANKLIN
Terminated: 02/07/2018
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |