Hawaii District Court
Judge:Helen Gillmor
Referred: Richard L Puglisi
Case #: 1:17-cv-00444
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Cause42:12101 Violation of Americans with Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Sep 06, 2017
Last checked: Sunday Mar 04, 2018 11:16 PM HST
Defendant
Blood Bank of Hawaii
Represented By
Ashley C. Chinen
Goodsill Anderson Quinn & Stifel LLP
contact info
Trisha C. Gibo
Es&a, Inc.
contact info
Barbara A. Petrus
Goodsill Anderson Quinn & Stifel Lllp
contact info
Anna M. Elento-Sneed
Es&a, Inc.
contact info
Defendant
Does 1-5, inclusive
Plaintiff
U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Represented By
Lorena Garcia-Bautista
U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
contact info
Sue J. Noh
Us Equal Employment Opportunity Commission Los Angeles
contact info
Eric Yau
Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
contact info
Anna Y. Park
Us Equal Employment Opportunity Commission Los Angeles
contact info
Rumduol Vuong
U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
contact info

Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Friday, June 15, 2018
31 31 service Certificate of Service Fri 3:19 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Blood Bank of Hawaii Re: Defendant Blood Bank of Hawaii's Response to Plaintiff EEOC's First Set of Interrogatories to Defendant Blood Bank of Hawaii (Chinen, Ashley)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 14, 2018
30 30 service Certificate of Service Mon 6:20 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission Re: Plaintiff EEOC's Initial Disclosures (Garcia-Bautista, Lorena)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 11, 2018
29 29 service Certificate of Service Fri 4:02 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Blood Bank of Hawaii Certificate of Service Re: Defendant Blood Bank of Hawaii's Initial Disclosures (Chinen, Ashley)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 03, 2018
28 28 6 pgs order Order Thu 11:15 AM
ORDER SETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI on 5/3/2018. Participants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (emt, )
Related: [-]
27 27 order Scheduling Order Thu 11:11 AM
RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI on 5/3/2018. Participants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (emt, )
Related: [-]
26 26 minutes 1 - Terminate Hearings Rule 16 Scheduling Conference Thu 10:06 AM
EP: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference held on 5/3/2018. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference Order to be issued. Jury Selection/Trial is set for 09:00 AM on 10/22/2019 before JUDGE HELEN GILLMOR. Final Pretrial Conference is set for 10/11/2019 at 10:30 AM before JUDGE HELEN GILLMOR. Final Pretrial Conference is set for 9/10/2019 at 09:00 AM in Chambers of Magistrate Judge Richard L. Puglisi before MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI. Settlement Conference is set for 10/31/2018 at 10:00 AM in Chambers of Magistrate Judge Richard L. Puglisi before MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI. Settlement Conference statements by 10/24/2018. Dispositive Motions filed by 5/22/2019. Discovery due by 8/23/2019. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI)(mrf)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 26, 2018
25 25 misc Scheduling Conference Statement Thu 3:54 PM
Scheduling Conference Statement Defendant Blood Bank of Hawaii's Rule 16 Scheduling Conference Statement; Certificate of Service . (Petrus, Barbara)
Related: [-]
24 24 misc Scheduling Conference Statement Thu 12:23 PM
Scheduling Conference Statement Joint Rule 26(f) Report of Meeting and Proposed Discovery Plan . (Garcia-Bautista, Lorena)
Related: [-]
23 23 misc Scheduling Conference Statement Thu 8:43 AM
Scheduling Conference Statement of Plaintiff EEOC . (Garcia-Bautista, Lorena)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 20, 2018
22 22 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 6:30 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by Blood Bank of Hawaii.(Petrus, Barbara)
Related: [-]
21 21 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 5:13 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Blood Bank of Hawaii. (Petrus, Barbara)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 27, 2018
20 20 order Stipulation and Order 2 - Set Deadlines Tue 9:50 AM
THIRD STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANT BLOOD BANK OF HAWAII TO ANSWER, PLEAD OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT, FILED ON 9/6/17 AND ORDER - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI on 3/27/2018. Blood Bank of Hawaii answer due 4/20/2018. (emt, ) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Participants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
19 19 minutes 2 - Set Hearings Tue 8:45 AM
EO: Based on counsel's request and agreement, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 4/18/2018 is CONTINUED to 5/3/2018 at 9:15AM in the Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference Statements are due by 04/26/2018. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI)(agh) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Participants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 24, 2018
18 18 minutes Link Order on Motion to Stay Order on Motion to Withdraw Wed 4:59 PM
EO: On January 22, 2018, Plaintiff filed: EX PARTE MOTION FOR STAY AND EXTENSION WITH REQUEST FOR EXPEDITED RULING; AND PROPOSED ORDER (ECF No.16 ) On January 23, 2018, Plaintiff filed: MOTION TO WITHDRAW EX PARTE MOTION FOR STAY AND EXTENSION WITH REQUEST FOR EXPEDITED RULING (ECF No.17 ) Plaintiff's Motion to Withdraw Ex Parte Motion for Stay and Extension with Request for Expedited Ruling is GRANTED. (JUDGE HELEN GILLMOR)(rls, ) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Participants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 23, 2018
17 17 motion Withdraw Tue 8:38 AM
MOTION to Withdraw16 Ex Parte MOTION to Stay Lorena Garcia-Bautista appearing for Plaintiff U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission(Garcia-Bautista, Lorena)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Monday, January 22, 2018
16 16 motion Stay Mon 9:39 AM
Ex Parte MOTION to Stay Lorena Garcia-Bautista appearing for Plaintiff U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission(Garcia-Bautista, Lorena)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Monday, December 11, 2017
15 15 order Stipulation and Order 2 - Set Deadlines Mon 2:58 PM
SECOND STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANT BLOOD BANK OF HAWAII TO ANSWER, PLEAD OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT, FILED ON 9/6/17 AND ORDER - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI on 12/11/2017. Blood Bank of Hawaii answer due 4/6/2018. (emt, ) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Participants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 08, 2017
14 14 minutes 2 - Set Hearings Fri 4:15 PM
EO: Based on counsel's request and agreement, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 01/12/2018 is CONTINUED to 4/18/2018 at 09:30AM in the Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference Statements are due by 04/11/2018. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI)(agh) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Participants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 07, 2017
13 13 order Stipulation and Order 2 - Set Deadlines Tue 9:45 AM
FIRST STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANT BLOOD BANK OF HAWAII TO ANSWER, PLEAD OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT, FILED ON 9/6/17 AND ORDER - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI on 11/7/2017. Blood Bank of Hawaii answer due 12/13/2017. (emt, ) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Participants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 23, 2017
12 12 minutes 2 - Set Hearings Mon 1:31 PM
EO: Based on counsel's request and agreement, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 12/13/2017 is CONTINUED to 01/12/2018 at 09:30AM in Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI before MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference Statements are due by 01/05/2018. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI)(mrf) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Participants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 16, 2017
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 11:39 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Lorena Garcia-Bautista on behalf of U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission on behalf of U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission.(Garcia-Bautista, Lorena)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Tuesday, September 26, 2017
10 10 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys Tue 11:58 AM
WITHDRAWAL AND SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL AND ORDER - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI on 9/26/2017. Barbara A. Petrus, Esq. and Ashley C. Chinen, Esq. of the law firm of Goodsill Anderson Quinn & Stifel, LLP added for Blood Bank of Hawaii. Anna M. Elento-Sneed, Esq. and Trisha C. Gibo, Esq. of the law firm ES&A, Inc. terminated. (emt, ) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Participants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 14, 2017
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 4:00 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Trisha C. Gibo on behalf of Blood Bank of Hawaii on behalf of Blood Bank of Hawaii. (Gibo, Trisha)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 3:59 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Anna M. Elento-Sneed on behalf of Blood Bank of Hawaii on behalf of Blood Bank of Hawaii. (Elento-Sneed, Anna)
Related: [-]
7 7 minutes 2 - Set Hearings Thu 3:11 PM
EO: Based on Plaintiff's counsel's request, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 11/01/2017 is CONTINUED to 12/13/2017 at 09:00AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference Statements are due by 12/06/2017. Counsel for Plaintiff shall notify Defendant of the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set by the Court. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI)(mrf) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Participants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 2:57 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Blood Bank of Hawaii. Blood Bank of Hawaii waiver sent on 9/14/2017, answer due 11/13/2017. (Gibo, Trisha)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 06, 2017
5 5 notice Notice of Case Assignment Wed 9:16 AM
NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil Case Number CIV NO. 17-00444 HG-RLP on all filings . (eps, ) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Participants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Issued Wed 9:13 AM
Summons Issued as to Blood Bank of Hawaii. (eps, )
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Civil Waiver of Service Packet Wed 9:12 AM
CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet (eps, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 A0 398 Notice of a Lawsuit,
Att: 2 A0 399 Waiver of Service of Summons
2 2 1 pgs order Order Setting Rule 16 Wed 9:11 AM
Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 09:00AM on 11/1/2017 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI.. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 09/06/2017. (eps, ) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Participants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO: Re CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THIS DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memo re: Corporate Disclosures
1 1 11 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 7:38 AM
COMPLAINT against Blood Bank of Hawaii, filed by U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission.(Park, Anna)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons