GEICO General Insurance Company v. Bethea et al
Mississippi Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Louis Guirola, Jr |
Referred: | Robert H Walker |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-00243 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1442 Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Sep 07, 2017 |
Terminated: | Oct 30, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 06, 2018 2:32 AM CST |
Defendant
Jack Bethea
|
|
Defendant
Boyington Health Care Facility
|
|
Defendant
Humana Insurance Company
|
|
Defendant
Medicare & Medicaid Services/United States of America
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Memorial Hospital at Gulfport
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
RevClaims, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Woodland Village Nursing Center
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
GEICO General Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Wednesday, November 01, 2017 | ||
misc
Docket Annotation
Wed 11/01 10:54 AM
Disregard the letter17 filed 10/31/2017. It was not sent. The Clerk has been advised that the funds referenced in the Agreed Order and Judgment16 were not deposited in the Registry of the Chancery Court of Harrison County, Mississippi but rather were retained by plaintiff GEICO. Counsel for GEICO has further advised that GEICO will make the disbursements as ordered in Agreed Order and Judgment16 . (JCH) |
||
Tuesday, October 31, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Letter
Wed 11/01 8:14 AM
**DISREGARD**Letter from Arthur Johnston, Clerk of Court to John McAdams, Chancery Clerk of Harrison County. (JCH) Modified on 11/1/2017 (JCH) |
|
Monday, October 30, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
order
Judgment
Mon 10/30 11:46 AM
AGREED ORDER AND JUDGMENT APPROVING DISTRUBUTION OF SETTLEMENT FUNDS: Ordered that the uninsured/underinsured policy limits of GEICO in the amount of $50,000 shall be distributed as follows: Mack Bethea - $16,666.66, Humana Insurance Company - $ 5,000, Medicare & Medicaid Services/United States of America - $ 28,333.34. See Order for more details. Signed by Chief District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr on 10/30/2017. (JCH) |
|
15 | 15
order
Judgment
Mon 10/30 9:38 AM
DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of GEICO General Insurance Company against Boyington Health Care Facility. Signed by Chief District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr., on 10/30/2017. (BR) |
|
14 | 14
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Default Judgment
Mon 10/30 9:36 AM
ORDER granting13 Motion for Default Judgment as to Boyington Health Care Facility. Signed by Chief District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr., on 10/30/2017. (BR) |
|
Friday, October 20, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Default Judgment
Fri 10/20 2:16 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment as to by GEICO General Insurance Company(Brown, Kristi) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Service of Process for Boyington Health Care Facility, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Harrison County Chancery Court Docket | ||
12 | 12
order
Clerks Entry of Default
Fri 10/20 9:01 AM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Boyington Health Care Facility (ASJ) |
|
11 | 11
motion
Entry of Default
Fri 10/20 8:46 AM
MOTION for Entry of Default by GEICO General Insurance Company(Brown, Kristi) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Service of Process for Boyington Health Care Facility, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Harrison County Chancery Court Docket | ||
Tuesday, October 17, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Tue 10/17 10:07 AM
TEXT ONLY ORDER granting10 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to1 Notice of Removal. Medicare & Medicaid Services/United States of America's response is due by 10/30/2017. No further written order will issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on October 17, 2017 (King, Steve) |
||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Tue 10/17 10:08 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Medicare & Medicaid Services/United States of America answer due 10/30/2017. (King, Steve) |
||
Monday, October 16, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Mon 10/16 9:37 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to1 Notice of Removal,, Complaint for Interpleader and Other Relief by Medicare & Medicaid Services/United States of America (Graben-Federal Gov, Stephen) |
|
Monday, September 25, 2017 | ||
misc
Docket Annotation
Mon 09/25 8:25 AM
DOCKET ANNOTATION as to # 9. Attorney is advised that this Answer should have been filed as an "Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)", which can be found under the "Other Answers" category. Attorney does not need to re-file. (JCH) |
||
Friday, September 22, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 09/22 2:48 PM
ANSWER to Complaint for Interpleader and its Claim to Interplead Funds by Woodland Village Nursing Center.(Mueller, Randi) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Admission Agreement | ||
Thursday, September 14, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 09/14 1:48 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen J. Buccola on behalf of Memorial Hospital at Gulfport, RevClaims, LLC (Buccola, Stephen) |
|
7 | 7
misc
State Court Record
Thu 09/14 1:31 PM
State Court Record by Defendant Medicare & Medicaid Services/United States of America Volumes 1 (Graben-Federal Gov, Stephen) |
|
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Thu 09/14 9:34 AM
TEXT ONLY ORDER granting6 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to Complaint for Interpleader and Other Relief. Medicare & Medicaid Services/United States of America response due by 10/16/2017. No further written order will issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on September 14, 2017 (King, Steve) |
||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Thu 09/14 9:35 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Medicare & Medicaid Services/United States of America answer due 10/16/17. (King, Steve) |
||
Wednesday, September 13, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Wed 09/13 3:44 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to1 Notice of Removal,, Complaint for Interpleader and Other Relief by Medicare & Medicaid Services/United States of America (Graben-Federal Gov, Stephen) |
|
Tuesday, September 12, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Tue 09/12 4:41 PM
ORDER granting2 unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to answer. Woodland Village Nursing Center, LLC answer to GEICO General Insurance Company Complaint for Interpleader due by 9/22/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on September 12, 2017. (Joffe, Scherry) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS OR DISCOVERY
Tue 09/12 3:39 PM
NOTICE of Disclaimer by Memorial Hospital at Gulfport (Buccola, Stephen) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS OR DISCOVERY
Tue 09/12 3:39 PM
NOTICE of Disclaimer by RevClaims, LLC (Buccola, Stephen) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Tue 09/12 1:51 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Complaint for Interpleader and Other Relief by Woodland Village Nursing Center (Mueller, Randi) |
|
utility
Set Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 09/12 4:44 PM
Set Deadlines/Hearings: Woodland Village Nursing Center, LLC answer to GEICO General Insurance Company Complaint for Interpleader due by 9/22/2017. (Joffe, Scherry) |
||
Thursday, September 07, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Thu 09/07 10:57 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Medicare & Medicaid Services/United States of America If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (JCH) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 - Lower Court Complaint |